blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3494116

EP3494116 - ESTROGEN RECEPTOR MODULATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.08.2020
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.09.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.09.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.06.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.04.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.08.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  27.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2020No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.09.2020  [2020/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Astrazeneca AB
151 85 Södertälje / SE
[2019/24]
Inventor(s)01 / SCOTT, James, Stewart
AstraZeneca, Darwin Building
Cambridge Science Park
Milton Road
Cambridgeshire CB4 0WG / GB
02 / MOSS, Thomas, Andrew
AstraZeneca
Darwin Building, Cambridge Science Park
Milton Road
Cambridgeshire CB4 0WG / GB
03 / HUGHES, Samantha, Jayne
AstraZeneca
Darwin Building, Cambridge Science Park
Milton Road
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 0WG / GB
04 / NISSINK, Johannes, Wilhelmus, Maria
AstraZeneca
Darwin Building, Cambridge Science Park
Milton Road
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 0WG / GB
05 / BARLAAM, Bernard, Christophe
AstraZeneca
Darwin Building, Cambridge Science Park
Milton Road
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 0WG / GB
06 / YANG, Bin
AstraZeneca
35 Gatehouse Drive
Waltham, MA 02451 / US
 [2019/43]
Former [2019/34]01 / SCOTT, James, Stewart
AstraZeneca, Darwin Building
Cambridge Science Park
Milton Road
Cambridgeshire CB4 0WG / GB
02 / MOSS, Thomas, Andrew
AstraZeneca
Darwin Building, Cambridge Science Park
Milton Road
Cambridgeshire CB4 0WG / GB
03 / HUGHES, Samantha, Jayne
AstraZeneca
Darwin Building, Cambridge Science Park
Milton Road
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 0WG / GB
04 / NISSINK, Johannes, Wilhelmus, Maria
AstraZeneca
Darwin Building, Cambridge Science Park
Milton Road
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 0WG / GB
05 / BARLAAM, Bernard, Christophe
AstraZeneca
Darwin Building, Cambridge Science Park
Milton Road
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 0WG / GB
06 / YANG, Bin
AstraZeneca
35 Gatehouse Drive
Waltham, MA 02451 / US
Former [2019/26]01 / SCOTT, James, Stewart
AstraZeneca, Darwin Building
Cambridge Science Park
Milton Road
Cambridge/Cambridgeshire CB4 0WG / GB
02 / MOSS, Thomas, Andrew
AstraZeneca, Darwin Building
Cambridge Science Park
Milton Road
Cambridge/Cambridgeshire CB4 0WG / GB
03 / HUGHES, Samantha, Jayne
AstraZeneca, Darwin Building
Cambridge Science Park
Milton Road
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 0WG / GB
04 / NISSINK, Johannes, Wilhelmus, Maria
AstraZeneca
Darwin Building, Cambridge Science Park
Milton Road
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 0WG / GB
05 / BARLAAM, Bernard, Christophe
AstraZeneca
Darwin Building, Cambridge Science Park
Milton Road
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 0WG / GB
06 / YANG, Bin
AstraZeneca
35 Gatehouse Drive
Waltham MA 02451 / US
Former [2019/24]01 / SCOTT, James, Stewart
AstraZeneca Darwin Building
Cambridge Science Park
Milton Road
Cambridge CB4 0WG / GB
02 / MOSS, Thomas, Andrew
AstraZeneca Darwin Building
Cambridge Science Park
Milton Road
Cambridgeshire CB4 0WG / GB
03 / HUGHES, Samantha, Jayne
AstraZeneca Darwin Building
Cambridge Science Park
Milton Road
Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 0WG / GB
04 / NISSINK, Johannes, Wilhelmus, Maria
AstraZeneca
Darwin Building Cambridge Science Park
Milton Road
Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 0WG / GB
05 / BARLAAM, Bernard, Christophe
AstraZeneca
Darwin Building Cambridge Science Park
Milton Road
Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 0WG / GB
06 / YANG, Bin
AstraZeneca 35 Gatehouse Drive
Waltham MA 02451 / US
Representative(s)AstraZeneca Intellectual Property
Eastbrook House
Shaftesbury Road
Cambridge CB2 8BF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/24]AstraZeneca
Milstein Building
Granta Park
Cambridge CB21 6GH / GB
Application number, filing date18705097.629.01.2018
[2019/24]
WO2018EP52040
Priority number, dateUS201762451971P30.01.2017         Original published format: US 201762451971 P
US201762523695P22.06.2017         Original published format: US 201762523695 P
US201762560304P19.09.2017         Original published format: US 201762560304 P
US201762592485P30.11.2017         Original published format: US 201762592485 P
[2019/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018138303
Date:02.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3494116
Date:12.06.2019
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2019/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3494116
Date:23.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.08.2018
ClassificationIPC:C07D471/04, A61P35/00, A61K31/437, A61K31/506, A61K31/501
[2019/24]
CPC:
C07D471/04 (EP,IL,KR,US); A61K31/407 (EP,KR,US); A61K31/437 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/24]
Extension statesBA07.03.2019
ME07.03.2019
Validation statesMA07.03.2019
MD07.03.2019
TN07.03.2019
TitleGerman:ÖSTROGEN-REZEPTOR-MODULATOREN[2019/24]
English:ESTROGEN RECEPTOR MODULATORS[2019/24]
French:MODULATEURS DU RÉCEPTEUR DES OESTROGÈNES[2019/24]
Entry into regional phase07.03.2019National basic fee paid 
07.03.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
07.03.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.03.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.03.2019Examination requested  [2019/24]
07.03.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
21.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.06.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.08.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
02.08.2019Fee for grant paid
02.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.09.2019Information about intention to grant a patent
17.09.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19203383.5  / EP3689873
Opposition(s)24.07.2020No opposition filed within time limit [2020/40]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]US2012157402  (CAO LIANGXIAN [US], et al);
 [I]US2014357661  (BRADBURY ROBERT HUGH [GB], et al);
 [I]US2016175289  (LABADIE SHARADA [US], et al);
 [IP]US2018021316  (SCOTT JAMES STEWART [GB], et al)
by applicantUS4683195
 US4683202
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.