EP3713755 - SOFT MATERIAL SEPARATOR WITH FILL-LEVEL-DEPENDENT ADJUSTMENT OF SPEED, AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SUCH A SOFT MATERIAL SEPARATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Modernpack Hoppe Gmbh Hoffnungsthaler Strasse 43 51491 Overath / DE | [2020/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GÜNTHER, Hoppe Löhr Straße 23 51491 Overath / DE | [2020/40] | Representative(s) | Straubel, Dirk Am Jungstück 17 55130 Mainz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/40] | Müller, Eckhard Mühlstrasse 9a 65597 Hünfelden-Dauborn / DE | Application number, filing date | 18796006.7 | 30.10.2018 | [2020/40] | WO2018EP79679 | Priority number, date | DE201810101985 | 30.01.2018 Original published format: DE102018101985 | [2020/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019149397 | Date: | 08.08.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3713755 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3713755 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B30B9/24, A22C17/04 | [2020/40] | CPC: |
B30B9/241 (EP,US);
A22C17/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WEICHSEPARATOR MIT FÜLLZUSTANDSABHÄNGIGER ANPASSUNG DER GESCHWINDIGKEIT UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES SOLCHEN WEICHSEPARATORS | [2020/40] | English: | SOFT MATERIAL SEPARATOR WITH FILL-LEVEL-DEPENDENT ADJUSTMENT OF SPEED, AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SUCH A SOFT MATERIAL SEPARATOR | [2020/40] | French: | SÉPARATEUR DE SUBSTANCES MOLLES AYANT UNE ADAPTATION DE LA VITESSE DÉPENDANTE DU NIVEAU DE REMPLISSAGE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN TEL SÉPARATEUR DE SUBSTANCES MOLLES | [2020/40] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/40] | 23.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
03.02.2023
06.02.2023
ADMISSIBLE Nordischer Maschinenbau Rud. Baader GmbH + Co. KG Geniner Strasse 249 23560 Lübeck / DE Opponent's representative Stork Bamberger Patentanwälte PartmbB Meiendorfer Strasse 89 22145 Hamburg / DE | [2023/11] | 22.02.2023 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.06.2023 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.03.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 04.05.2022 | CY | 04.05.2022 | EE | 04.05.2022 | HR | 04.05.2022 | LT | 04.05.2022 | LV | 04.05.2022 | MC | 04.05.2022 | MK | 04.05.2022 | RO | 04.05.2022 | RS | 04.05.2022 | SI | 04.05.2022 | SM | 04.05.2022 | BG | 04.08.2022 | LU | 30.10.2022 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/21] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
CY | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
LU | 30.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
LU | 30.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | EE | 04.05.2022 | |
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | HR | 04.05.2022 | |
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | HR | 04.05.2022 | |
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | LT | 04.05.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE2548980 ; | [XDI]EP0375876 (MODERNPACK HOPPE GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | EP0375876 | DE19637640 | Opposition | DE2548980 | EP0375876 | DE4223346 | DE19637640 | DE19859930 | DE20319293U | DE102009031943 |