blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3648841

EP3648841 - APPARATUS FOR INTERNAL ORGAN, INJURY AND PAIN TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2020/20]INTERNAL ORGAN, INJURY AND PAIN TREATMENT
[2023/36]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.12.2024
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.01.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.12.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.11.2023
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.08.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  29.07.2022
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.04.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  12.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.02.2025Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 12.03.2025  [2025/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
B.R.H. Medical Ltd.
1 Agudat Sport Hapoel St.
9695101 Jerusalem / IL
[2020/20]
Inventor(s)01 / FEFERBERG, Ilan
Harafsoda 46
7541710 Rishon LeZion / IL
 [2020/20]
Representative(s)Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton
West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2020/20]Schlich, George, et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
Application number, filing date18828731.204.07.2018
[2020/20]
WO2018IL50727
Priority number, dateIL2017025330104.07.2017         Original published format: IL 25330117
US201862657944P16.04.2018         Original published format: US 201862657944 P
[2020/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2019008582
Date:10.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3648841
Date:13.05.2020
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2020/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3648841
Date:14.02.2024
Language:EN
[2024/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:IL10.01.2019
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.02.2021
ClassificationIPC:A61N7/00, A61N1/06, A61B18/18, A61B17/42, A61N1/04, A61N1/32, A61N1/36
[2023/36]
CPC:
A61N1/0468 (EP,KR); A61N7/00 (EP,KR,US); A61B5/053 (KR);
A61B8/08 (KR); A61B8/085 (EP); A61N1/06 (US);
A61N1/323 (EP); A61N1/36014 (EP); A61N1/36021 (KR);
A61N1/36031 (KR); A61B2018/00559 (EP); A61B2018/00791 (EP);
A61B2018/00875 (EP); A61B2090/378 (EP); A61N1/0456 (EP);
A61N2007/0017 (EP,US); A61N2007/0021 (EP); A61N2007/0026 (EP);
A61N2007/0047 (KR); A61N2007/0052 (KR,US); A61N2007/0073 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2021/13]A61N7/00, A61B18/18, A61B17/42, A61N1/06
Former IPC [2020/20]A61N7/00, A61B18/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/20]  
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON INNEREN ORGANEN, VERLETZUNGEN UND SCHMERZEN[2023/36]
English:APPARATUS FOR INTERNAL ORGAN, INJURY AND PAIN TREATMENT[2023/36]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR TRAITEMENT D'ORGANE INTERNE, LÉSION ET LA DOULEUR[2023/36]
Former [2020/20]BEHANDLUNG VON INNEREN ORGANEN, VERLETZUNGEN UND SCHMERZEN
Former [2020/20]INTERNAL ORGAN, INJURY AND PAIN TREATMENT
Former [2020/20]ORGANE INTERNE, LÉSION ET TRAITEMENT DE LA DOULEUR
Entry into regional phase24.01.2020National basic fee paid 
24.01.2020Search fee paid 
24.01.2020Designation fee(s) paid 
24.01.2020Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.05.2019Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: IL
24.01.2020Examination requested  [2020/20]
10.09.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.07.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.11.2022Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.08.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.11.2023Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
12.12.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.01.2024Fee for grant paid
05.01.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.01.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)15.11.2024No opposition filed within time limit [2025/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
20.07.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
28.07.2022Renewal fee patent year 05
26.07.2023Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ14.02.2024
HR14.02.2024
MC14.02.2024
RO14.02.2024
SK14.02.2024
SM14.02.2024
RS14.05.2024
GR15.05.2024
IS14.06.2024
[2025/11]
Former [2024/49]CZ14.02.2024
HR14.02.2024
RO14.02.2024
SK14.02.2024
SM14.02.2024
RS14.05.2024
GR15.05.2024
IS14.06.2024
Former [2024/48]CZ14.02.2024
HR14.02.2024
SM14.02.2024
RS14.05.2024
GR15.05.2024
IS14.06.2024
Former [2024/47]HR14.02.2024
SM14.02.2024
RS14.05.2024
GR15.05.2024
IS14.06.2024
Former [2024/34]HR14.02.2024
RS14.05.2024
GR15.05.2024
IS14.06.2024
Former [2024/32]IS14.06.2024
Documents cited:Search[A]US6217530  (MARTIN ROY W [US], et al);
 [A]US2004236268  (MITRAGOTRI SAMIR S [US], et al);
 [Y]US2013289416  (FEFERBERG ILAN [IL]);
 [Y]US2017050019  (RON EDOUTE ODED [IL], et al)
International search[Y]US5859527  (COOK ALAN [AU]);
 [Y]US7494488  (WEBER PAUL JOSEPH [US]);
 [Y]US2010228126  (EMERY CHARLES D [US], et al);
 [Y]US2013289416  (FEFERBERG ILAN [IL]);
 [Y]US2015148712  (LOVEN ROSS [US], et al);
by applicantUS2009171138
 US2017050019
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.