blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3498265

EP3498265 - SOLID COMPOSITION COMPRISING IRON FOR USE IN IRON DEFICIENT CONDITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.08.2021
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.08.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.05.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2024Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: AL
published on 31.07.2024  [2024/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alesco S.r.l.
Via delle Lenze 216/B
56122 Pisa / IT
[2019/25]
Inventor(s)01 / LACORTE, Andrea
c/o PHARMANUTRA S.P.A.
Via delle Lenze 216/B
56122 Pisa / IT
02 / TARANTINO, Germano
c/o PHARMANUTRA S.P.A.
Via delle Lenze 216/B
56122 Pisa / IT
 [2019/25]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Hoffmann Eitle S.R.L.
Piazza Sigmund Freud 1
20154 Milano / IT
[2019/25]
Application number, filing date19151902.430.07.2013
[2019/25]
Priority number, dateIT2012MI0135031.07.2012         Original published format: IT MI20121350
[2019/25]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3498265
Date:19.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3498265
Date:30.09.2020
Language:EN
[2020/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.05.2019
ClassificationIPC:A61K9/16, A61K33/26, A61K47/14, A61K9/00, A61K47/24, A61K33/42, A61P3/02, A61P7/06
[2020/23]
CPC:
A61K47/24 (EP,IL,US); A61K33/26 (EP,IL,US); A61K33/42 (EP,IL,US);
A61K47/14 (EP,IL,US); A61K9/0095 (EP,IL,US); A61K9/1617 (EP,IL,US);
A61K9/1623 (EP,IL,US); A61K9/1652 (EP,IL,US); A61P3/02 (EP,IL);
A61P7/06 (EP,IL) (-)
Former IPC [2019/25]A61K9/16, A61K33/26
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/25]
TitleGerman:FESTSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT EISEN ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI LEIDEN AUFGRUND VON EISENMANGEL[2019/25]
English:SOLID COMPOSITION COMPRISING IRON FOR USE IN IRON DEFICIENT CONDITIONS[2019/25]
French:COMPOSITION SOLIDE COMPRENANT DU FER DESTINÉE À ÊTRE UTILISÉE DANS DES MALADIES LIÉES À UNE DÉFICIENCE EN FER[2019/25]
Examination procedure15.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/25]
19.12.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.05.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.08.2020Fee for grant paid
21.08.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.08.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP13777110.1  / EP2879667
Opposition(s)01.07.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
15.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
15.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
15.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
26.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
14.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2024/31]
Former [2021/26]AL30.09.2020
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2005082167  (TAIYO KAGAKU KK [JP], et al);
 [XI]WO2006137133  (TAIYO KAGAKU KK [JP], et al);
 [A]US2007148259  (GUPTA AJAY [US]);
 [A]US2010008865  (FAYET MARYLENE [FR], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.