blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3608337

EP3608337 - BISPECIFIC T CELL ACTIVATING ANTIGEN BINDING MOLECULES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.02.2025
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.03.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.11.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.03.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.08.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  10.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.02.2025No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.03.2025  [2025/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
[2020/07]
Inventor(s)01 / AST, Oliver
c/o Roche Glycart AG
Wagistrasse 10
8952 Schlieren / CH
02 / BACAC, Marina
c/o Roche Glycart AG
Wagistrasse 10
8952 Schlieren / CH
03 / IMHOF-JUNG, Sabine
c/o Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Nonnenwald 2
82377 Penzberg / DE
04 / NEUMANN (formally JAEGER), Christiane
c/o Roche Glycart AG
Wagistrasse 10
8952 Schlieren / CH
05 / KLEIN, Christian
c/o Roche Glycart AG
Wagistrasse 10
8952 Schlieren / CH
06 / KLOSTERMANN, Stefan
c/o Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Nonnenwald 2
82377 Penzberg / DE
07 / MOLHOJ, Michael
c/o Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Nonnenwald 2
82377 Penzberg / DE
08 / REGULA, Joerg Thomas
c/o Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Nonnenwald 2
82377 Penzberg / DE
09 / SCHAEFER, Wolfgang
c/o Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Nonnenwald 2
82377 Penzberg / DE
10 / UMAÑA, Pablo
c/o Roche Glycart AG
Wagistrasse 10
8952 Schlieren / CH
 [2024/16]
Former [2020/07]01 / AST, Oliver
c/o Roche Glycart AG Wagistrasse 10
8952 Schlieren / CH
02 / BACAC, Marina
c/o Roche Glycart AG Wagistrasse 10
8952 Schlieren / CH
03 / IMHOF-JUNG, Sabine
c/o Roche Diagnostics GmbH Nonnenwald 2
82377 Penzberg / DE
04 / NEUMANN (formally JAEGER), Christiane
c/o Roche Glycart AG Wagistrasse 10
8952 Schlieren / CH
05 / KLEIN, Christian
c/o Roche Glycart AG Wagistrasse 10
8952 Schlieren / CH
06 / KLOSTERMANN, Stefan
c/o Roche Diagnostics GmbH Nonnenwald 2
82377 Penzberg / DE
07 / MOLHOJ, Michael
c/o Roche Diagnostics GmbH Nonnenwald 2
82377 Penzberg / DE
08 / REGULA, Joerg Thomas
c/o Roche Diagnostics GmbH Nonnenwald 2
82377 Penzberg / DE
09 / SCHAEFER, Wolfgang
c/o Roche Diagnostics GmbH Nonnenwald 2
82377 Penzberg / DE
10 / UMAÑA, Pablo
c/o Roche Glycart AG Wagistrasse 10
8952 Schlieren / CH
Representative(s)Winkler, Thomas
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Patent Department
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
[2020/07]
Application number, filing date19172443.403.08.2015
[2020/07]
Priority number, dateEP2014017976404.08.2014         Original published format: EP 14179764
EP2015017086605.06.2015         Original published format: EP 15170866
[2020/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3608337
Date:12.02.2020
Language:EN
[2020/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3608337
Date:17.04.2024
Language:EN
[2024/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.01.2020
ClassificationIPC:C07K16/28, C07K16/30, C07K16/32, A61P35/00
[2023/49]
CPC:
C07K16/2809 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US); A61P35/00 (EP,KR); C07K16/2878 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K16/2887 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US); C07K16/3053 (EP,CN,US); C07K16/32 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K2039/505 (KR); C07K2317/14 (EP,CN,US); C07K2317/21 (EP,CN,US);
C07K2317/31 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US); C07K2317/33 (EP,CN,US); C07K2317/51 (EP,CN,US);
C07K2317/515 (EP,CN,US); C07K2317/526 (EP,CN,US); C07K2317/54 (EP,CN,US);
C07K2317/55 (EP,CN,KR,US); C07K2317/64 (EP,CN,IL,US); C07K2317/66 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K2317/71 (KR); C07K2317/732 (EP,CN,KR,US); C07K2317/92 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K2317/94 (EP,CN,US) (-)
Former IPC [2020/07]C07K16/28, C07K16/30, C07K16/32
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/38]
Former [2020/07]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Validation statesMA12.08.2020
TitleGerman:BISPEZIFISCHE ANTIGENBINDENDE MOLEKÜLE ZUR T-ZELLEN-AKTIVIERUNG[2020/07]
English:BISPECIFIC T CELL ACTIVATING ANTIGEN BINDING MOLECULES[2020/07]
French:MOLÉCULES BISPÉCIFIQUES DE LIAISON À L'ANTIGÈNE ACTIVANT DES LYMPHOCYTES T[2020/07]
Examination procedure12.08.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.08.2020Examination requested  [2020/38]
12.08.2020Date on which the examining division has become responsible
16.03.2023Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.07.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.09.2023Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
14.09.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.03.2024Fee for grant paid
07.03.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.03.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP15742329.4  / EP3177643
Opposition(s)20.01.2025No opposition filed within time limit [2025/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
03.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
08.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
17.08.2020Renewal fee patent year 06
09.08.2021Renewal fee patent year 07
09.08.2022Renewal fee patent year 08
22.08.2023Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL17.04.2024
[2025/10]
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2009089004  (AMGEN INC [US], et al);
 [Y]EP2647707  (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]);
 [Y]WO2014081955  (AMGEN INC [US]);
 [T]WO2015150447  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al);
by applicantUS4186567
 EP0404097
 WO9301161
 WO9316185
 US5500362
 WO9627011
 US5565332
 US5571894
 US5587458
 US5731168
 US5821337
 WO9850431
 US5869046
 US5959177
 US5969108
 US6040498
 US6054297
 US6248516
 US6417429
 US6420548
 US6737056
 WO2005100402
 US6982321
 WO2006029879
 US7087409
 WO2006082515
 US7125978
 WO2007110205
 EP1870459
 WO2007147901
 US7332581
 US7527791
 WO2009080251
 WO2009080252
 WO2009080253
 WO2009080254
 WO2009089004
 US7695936
 WO2010129304
 WO2011090754
 WO2011090762
 WO2011143545
 WO2012058768
 WO2012130831
 WO2013096291
 WO2013157954
 WO2013157953
 WO2015EP57165
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.