EP3578547 - SULFONYLUREAS AND RELATED COMPOUNDS AND USE OF SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Queensland St. Lucia Queensland 4072 / AU | For all designated states The Provost, Fellows, Foundation Scholars, and the other members of Board, of the College of the Holy& Undiv. Trinity of Queen Elizabeth near Dublin College Green Dublin 2 / IE | [2020/40] |
Former [2019/50] | For all designated states The University of Queensland St. Lucia Queensland 4072 / AU | ||
For all designated states The Provost, Fellows, Foundation Scholars, and The Other Members of Board, of The College of The Holy and Undivided Trinity of College Green Dublin 2 / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'NEILL, Luke Trinity Biomedical Sciences Institute Trinity College Dublin 152-160 Pearse Street Dublin 2 / IE | 02 /
COLL, Rebecca 56 Stranmillis Wharf 2A Lockview Road Belfast, BT9 5GN / GB | 03 /
COOPER, Matthew 29 Camborne Place Chapel Hill Queensland 4049 / AU | 04 /
ROBERTSON, Avril 44 Maryland Street Kenmore Queensland 4069 / AU | 05 /
SCHRODER, Kate 7 Love Street Fairfield Queensland 4103 / AU | [2021/38] |
Former [2021/21] | 01 /
O'NEILL, Luke Trinity Biomedical Sciences Institute Trinity College Dublin 152-160 Pearse Street Dublin 2 / IE | ||
02 /
* * * | |||
03 /
COOPER, Matthew 29 Camborne Place Chapel Hill Queensland 4049 / AU | |||
04 /
ROBERTSON, Avril 44 Maryland Street Kenmore Queensland 4069 / AU | |||
05 /
SCHRODER, Kate 7 Love Street Fairfield Queensland 4103 / AU | |||
Former [2020/03] | 01 /
O'NEILL, Luke Trinity Biomedical Sciences Institute Trinity College Dublin 152-160 Pearse Street Dublin 2 / IE | ||
02 /
COLL, Rebecca 56 Stranmillis Wharf 2A Lockview Road Belfast, BT9 5GN / GB | |||
03 /
COOPER, Matthew 29 Camborne Place Chapel Hill Queensland 4049 / AU | |||
04 /
ROBERTSON, Avril 44 Maryland Street Kenmore Queensland 4069 / AU | |||
05 /
SCHRODER, Kate 7 Love Street Fairfield Queensland 4103 / AU | |||
Former [2019/50] | 01 /
O'NEILL, Luke Trinity Biomedical Sciences Institute Trinity College Dublin 152-160 Pearse Street Dublin 2 / IE | ||
02 /
COLL, Rebecca 18 Forbes Street West End Queensland 4101 / AU | |||
03 /
COOPER, Matthew 29 Camborne Place Chapel Hill Queensland 4049 / AU | |||
04 /
ROBERTSON, Avril 44 Maryland Street Kenmore Queensland 4069 / AU | |||
05 /
SCHRODER, Kate 7 Love Street Fairfield Queensland 4103 / AU | Representative(s) | Elend, Almut Susanne, et al Venner Shipley LLP 406 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0WW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/50] | Elend, Almut Susanne, et al Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 0WZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19187141.7 | 16.02.2016 | [2019/50] | Priority number, date | AU20150900507 | 16.02.2015 Original published format: AU 2015900507 | [2019/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3578547 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3578547 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D231/18, C07D307/64, C07D311/60, C07D407/12, C07D405/12, C07D403/12, C07D213/71, C07D217/22, C07D249/12, C07D271/12, C07D333/34, C07D277/36, C07D333/62, C07D249/04, C07D417/12, C07D307/82, C07C311/54, C07C311/56, C07D307/18, C07D309/08 | [2020/36] | CPC: |
C07C311/56 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/64 (KR,RU);
C07D309/08 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61P1/00 (EP,CN,IL,US);
A61P11/00 (CN);
A61P13/12 (CN);
A61P17/00 (EP,CN,IL,US);
A61P17/02 (CN);
A61P17/06 (CN);
A61P17/10 (CN);
A61P19/02 (CN);
A61P19/06 (CN);
A61P25/00 (EP,CN,IL,RU,US);
A61P25/24 (CN);
A61P27/02 (CN);
A61P29/00 (CN);
A61P3/00 (EP,IL,US);
A61P3/10 (CN);
A61P31/04 (CN);
A61P31/12 (CN);
A61P31/14 (CN);
A61P31/16 (CN);
A61P33/10 (CN);
A61P35/00 (EP,CN,IL,RU,US);
A61P35/02 (CN);
A61P37/00 (EP,CN,IL,US);
A61P37/06 (CN);
A61P5/00 (EP,CN,IL,US);
A61P9/00 (CN);
A61P9/10 (CN);
A61P9/12 (CN);
C07C311/60 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07D207/38 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
C07D213/71 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07D213/74 (RU);
C07D215/36 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07D217/02 (EP,IL,US);
C07D217/22 (EP,IL,US);
C07D217/24 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07D221/04 (CN,KR);
C07D221/18 (EP,IL,US);
C07D231/18 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
C07D235/02 (EP,IL,RU,US);
C07D241/24 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
C07D241/42 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07D241/44 (EP,IL,US);
C07D249/04 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07D249/06 (EP,CN,IL,US);
C07D249/12 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
C07D261/18 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
C07D271/08 (KR);
C07D271/12 (EP,CN,IL,RU,US);
C07D277/36 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
C07D307/18 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07D307/64 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
C07D307/68 (EP,IL,US);
C07D307/77 (CN);
C07D307/82 (EP,CN,IL,US);
C07D311/16 (EP,IL,US);
C07D311/18 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07D311/60 (EP,IL,RU,US);
C07D317/62 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07D333/34 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
C07D333/52 (EP,IL,US);
C07D333/54 (CN,KR);
C07D333/62 (EP,IL,US);
C07D401/06 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
C07D407/12 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
C07D413/12 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
C07D417/12 (EP,IL,US);
C07D487/04 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07D493/04 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07D495/04 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07D495/06 (EP,IL,RU,US);
C07D498/04 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
C07C2601/02 (IL,US);
C07C2601/08 (EP,CN,IL,US);
C07C2601/14 (CN,IL,US);
C07C2601/16 (EP,IL,US);
C07C2602/08 (EP,CN,IL,US);
C07C2602/10 (EP,CN,IL,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/50] | C07D231/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/14] |
Former [2019/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 18.07.2019 | ME | 18.07.2019 | Validation states | MA | 18.07.2019 | MD | 18.07.2019 | Title | German: | SULFONYLHARNSTOFFE UND VERWANDTE VERBINDUNGEN UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2019/50] | English: | SULFONYLUREAS AND RELATED COMPOUNDS AND USE OF SAME | [2019/50] | French: | SULFONYLURÉES, COMPOSÉS APPARENTÉS, ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2019/50] | Examination procedure | 24.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/14] | 24.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 13.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16751821.6 / EP3259253 | Divisional application(s) | EP21152421.0 / EP3888749 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/18] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 13.04.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 13.04.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.04.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 26.05.2021 | CY | 26.05.2021 | EE | 26.05.2021 | LV | 26.05.2021 | MC | 26.05.2021 | MK | 26.05.2021 | MT | 26.05.2021 | SM | 26.05.2021 | IS | 26.09.2021 | LU | 16.02.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
CY | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
MK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
LU | 16.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
CY | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
LU | 16.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
LU | 16.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | EE | 26.05.2021 | |
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | EE | 26.05.2021 | |
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
IS | 29.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LV | 26.05.2021 | |
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | LV | 26.05.2021 | |
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | LV | 26.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9208694 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]); | [I]WO9832733 (PFIZER [US], et al); | [I]WO0119390 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al); |