EP3653223 - DEVICE FOR THE ORAL DELIVERY OF THERAPEUTIC COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.07.2021 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2025 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rani Therapeutics, LLC 2051 Ringwood Avenue San Jose, CA 95131 / US | [2020/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IMRAN, Mir 12894 Brendel Drive Los Altos Hills, CA California 94022 / US | [2021/34] |
Former [2020/21] | 01 /
IMRAN, Mir 12894 Brendel Drive Los Altos Hills, CA 94022 / US | Representative(s) | Potter, Julian Mark, et al WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/21] | Forrest, Stuart, et al WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 19203957.6 | 27.06.2012 | [2020/21] | Priority number, date | US201161571641P | 29.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161571641 P | [2020/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3653223 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3653223 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/28, A61B1/04, A61B5/07, A61K9/48 | [2020/21] | CPC: |
A61M31/002 (EP,AU);
A61B5/14539 (EP,AU);
A61B5/4839 (EP,AU);
A61B5/073 (EP,AU)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/51] |
Former [2020/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ORALEN VERABREICHUNG VON THERAPEUTISCHEN VERBINDUNGEN | [2020/21] | English: | DEVICE FOR THE ORAL DELIVERY OF THERAPEUTIC COMPOUNDS | [2020/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR L'ADMINISTRATION ORALE DE COMPOSÉS THÉRAPEUTIQUES | [2020/21] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2020 | Examination requested [2020/51] | 09.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12804668.7 / EP2726141 | Divisional application(s) | EP21192893.2 / EP3973983 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.05.2022
27.05.2022
ADMISSIBLE Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK Opponent's representative Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.05.2022
27.05.2022
ADMISSIBLE Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK Opponent's representative Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | 10.06.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.10.2022 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.10.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.11.2023 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 15.11.2023 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 12.01.2024 | Appeal received No. T0081/24 | 12.01.2024 | Payment of appeal fee | 15.03.2024 | Statement of grounds filed | 12.01.2024 | Appeal received No. T0081/24 | 12.01.2024 | Payment of appeal fee | 14.03.2024 | Statement of grounds filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.06.2012 | AL | 25.08.2021 | CY | 25.08.2021 | CZ | 25.08.2021 | EE | 25.08.2021 | HR | 25.08.2021 | LT | 25.08.2021 | LV | 25.08.2021 | MC | 25.08.2021 | MK | 25.08.2021 | MT | 25.08.2021 | RO | 25.08.2021 | RS | 25.08.2021 | SI | 25.08.2021 | SK | 25.08.2021 | SM | 25.08.2021 | BG | 25.11.2021 | GR | 26.11.2021 | IS | 25.12.2021 | LU | 27.06.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/25] | HU | 27.06.2012 | |
AL | 25.08.2021 | ||
CY | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
MK | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
LU | 27.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
CY | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
MK | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
LU | 27.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
CY | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
LU | 27.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
LU | 27.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | CZ | 25.08.2021 | |
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | CZ | 25.08.2021 | |
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | HR | 25.08.2021 | |
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | LT | 25.08.2021 | |
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | LT | 25.08.2021 | |
BG | 25.11.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006077528 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [A]EP1980290 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]); | [A]US2008275430 (BELSKY ZIV [IL], et al) | by applicant | US20100978233 | US20100978301 | Opposition | US2004253304 | US2006167339 | US2007010709 | EP1980290 | WO2011079302 |