EP3656373 - SYRINGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.01.2022 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.09.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 18.12.2024 [2024/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2022/07] |
Former [2020/22] | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIGG, Juergen Novartis Pharma AG Postfach 4002 Basel / CH | 02 /
ROYER, Christophe Novartis Pharma AG Postfach 4002 Basel / CH | 03 /
BRYANT, Andrew Mark Novartis Pharma AG Postfach 4002 Basel / CH | 04 /
BUETTGEN, Heinrich Martin Novartis Pharma AG Postfach 4002 Basel / CH | 05 /
PICCI, Marie Novartis Pharma AG Postfach 4002 Basel / CH | [2020/22] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2020/22] | Application number, filing date | 19210117.8 | 25.01.2013 | [2020/22] | Priority number, date | EP20120174860 | 03.07.2012 Original published format: EP 12174860 | EP20120189649 | 23.10.2012 Original published format: EP 12189649 | DE20122011016U | 16.11.2012 Original published format: DE 202012011016 U | AU20120101677 | 16.11.2012 Original published format: AU 2012101677 | AU20120101678 | 16.11.2012 Original published format: AU 2012101678 | DE20122011260U | 23.11.2012 Original published format: DE 202012011260 U | DE20122011259U | 23.11.2012 Original published format: DE 202012011259 U | EP20120195360 | 03.12.2012 Original published format: EP 12195360 | DE20132000688U | 23.01.2013 Original published format: DE 202013000688 U | AU20130100071 | 23.01.2013 Original published format: AU 2013100071 | AU20130100070 | 23.01.2013 Original published format: AU 2013100070 | [2020/22] | Previously filed application, date | WO2013EP51491 | 25.01.2013 | [2020/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3656373 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3656373 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61J9/00, A61M5/31, A61M5/315, A61M5/28, A61F9/00, A61K9/00, A61K38/17, A61M5/178, A61P9/00, A61P9/10, A61P27/02, A61P35/00, A61P43/00 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
A61F9/0008 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61M5/28 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K38/179 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/0048 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61M5/002 (IL,US);
A61M5/178 (EP,IL,US);
A61M5/31 (EP,IL,US);
A61M5/3129 (KR);
A61M5/315 (EP,IL,US);
A61M5/31505 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61M5/31513 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61M2005/3104 (EP,IL,US);
A61M2005/3131 (KR);
A61M2005/3139 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61M2005/31508 (KR);
A61M2210/0612 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/22] | A61K9/00, A61M5/28, A61M5/31, A61M5/315 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/34] |
Former [2020/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SPRITZE | [2020/22] | English: | SYRINGE | [2020/22] | French: | SERINGUE | [2020/22] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/34] | 14.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2020 | Observations by third parties | 25.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2021 | Observations by third parties | 04.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13701276.1 / EP2869813 | EP18162017.0 / EP3381444 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.11.2022
05.03.2024
WITHDRAWN Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Friedrichstraße 2-6 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Bockenheimer Landstraße 25 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02
15.11.2022
25.09.2023
WITHDRAWN Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Arabellastr. 30 81925 München / DE Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | 03
16.11.2022
19.12.2023
WITHDRAWN Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE | [2024/15] |
Former [2024/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.11.2022
15.11.2022
ADMISSIBLE Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Friedrichstraße 2-6 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Friedrichstraße 2-6 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
02
15.11.2022
25.09.2023
WITHDRAWN Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Arabellastr. 30 81925 München / DE Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | |||
03
16.11.2022
19.12.2023
WITHDRAWN Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2023/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.11.2022
15.11.2022
ADMISSIBLE Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Friedrichstraße 2-6 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Friedrichstraße 2-6 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
02
15.11.2022
25.09.2023
WITHDRAWN Hoffman Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Arabellastr. 30 81925 München / DE Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | |||
03
16.11.2022
17.11.2022
ADMISSIBLE Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2022/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.11.2022
15.11.2022
ADMISSIBLE Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Friedrichstraße 2-6 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Friedrichstraße 2-6 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
02
15.11.2022
16.11.2022
ADMISSIBLE Hoffman Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Arabellastr. 30 81925 München / DE Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | |||
03
16.11.2022
17.11.2022
ADMISSIBLE Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE | 28.11.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.04.2023 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 15.03.2024 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 16.02.2022 | MC | 16.02.2022 | RO | 16.02.2022 | RS | 16.02.2022 | SM | 16.02.2022 | BG | 25.01.2023 | CY | 25.01.2023 | FI | 25.01.2023 | HR | 25.01.2023 | LT | 25.01.2023 | LV | 25.01.2023 | HU | 26.01.2023 | EE | 31.01.2023 | NO | 31.01.2023 | GB | 10.08.2023 | [2024/51] |
Former [2024/29] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
CY | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
HU | 26.01.2023 | ||
EE | 31.01.2023 | ||
NO | 31.01.2023 | ||
GB | 10.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
CY | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
HU | 26.01.2023 | ||
EE | 31.01.2023 | ||
NO | 31.01.2023 | ||
GB | 10.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
CY | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 31.01.2023 | ||
NO | 31.01.2023 | ||
GB | 10.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
CY | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 31.01.2023 | ||
NO | 31.01.2023 | ||
GB | 10.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
CY | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 31.01.2023 | ||
NO | 31.01.2023 | ||
GB | 10.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
GB | 10.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | RS | 16.02.2022 | |
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | RS | 16.02.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006293270 (ADAMIS ANTHONY P [US], et al); | [XI]WO2007035621 (OSI EYETECH INC [US], et al); | [A]DE102008005938 (VETTER & CO APOTHEKER [DE]); | [X]US2011257601 (FURFINE ERIC [US], et al) | Examination | US2011276005 | other | US6090081 | WO2007035621 | WO2011059823 | WO2014005728 | Opposition | WO2004075958 | WO2007035621 | WO2009030976 | WO2011006877 | US2012091026 | DE202012011016U | AU2012101677 | AU2012101678 | DE202012011260U | DE202012011259U | DE202013000688U | AU2013100071 | AU2013100070 | US31789 | WO9744068 | WO2009099641 | WO2009158613 | US2012078224 | US4946441 | US5405326 | JPH0725963Y | JP2001340455 | EP0738517 | JP2002177388 | US6688252 | JP2004313369 | US2007250017 | WO2008154630 | EP2047877 | JP2012045046 | WO2012117837 |