blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3762009

EP3762009 - TOXIN-DERIVED DELIVERY CONSTRUCTS FOR ORAL DELIVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.03.2023
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.04.2022
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.11.2021
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.05.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.12.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  14.09.2019
Formerunknown
Status updated on  19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2024Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): BG
published on 18.12.2024  [2024/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Applied Molecular Transport Inc.
450 East Jamie Court
South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US
[2022/17]
Former [2021/02]For all designated states
Applied Molecular Transport Inc.
1 Tower Place, Suite 850
South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MRSNY, Randall J.
1 Tower Place, Suite 850 South
San Francisco, California 94080 / US
02 / LIU, Keyi
1 Tower Place, Suite 850 South
San Francisco, California 94080 / US
03 / MACKAY, Julia Dawn
1 Tower Place, Suite 850 South
San Francisco, California 94080 / US
04 / FENG, Weijun
1 Tower Place, Suite 850 South
San Francisco, California 94080 / US
05 / HUNTER, Thomas Carl
1 Tower Place, Suite 850 South
San Francisco, California 94080 / US
06 / MAHMOOD, Tahir
1 Tower Place, Suite 850 South
San Francisco, California 94080 / US
07 / TAVERNER, Alistair
1 Tower Place, Suite 850 South
San Francisco, California 94080 / US
 [2021/29]
Former [2021/02]01 / MRSNY, Randall J.
1 Tower Place, Suite 850 South
San Francisco, California 94080 / US
02 / LIU, Keyi
1 Tower Place, Suite 850 South
San Francisco, California 94080 / US
03 / MACKAY, Julia Dawn
1 Tower Place, Suite 850 South
San Francisco, California 94080 / US
04 / FENG, Weijun
1 Tower Place, Suite 850 South
San Francisco, California 94080 / US
05 / HUNTER, Thomas Carl
1 Tower Place, Suite 850 South
San Francisco, California 94080 / US
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2022/19]
Former [2021/02]Marshall, Cameron John
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
Application number, filing date19717013.708.03.2019
[2021/02]
WO2019US21474
Priority number, dateUS201862640188P08.03.2018         Original published format: US 201862640188 P
US201862640194P08.03.2018         Original published format: US 201862640194 P
US201862640168P08.03.2018         Original published format: US 201862640168 P
US201862756889P07.11.2018         Original published format: US 201862756889 P
[2021/32]
Former [2021/02]US201862640188P08.03.2018
US201862640194P08.03.2018
US201862640168P08.03.2018
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2019173787
Date:12.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3762009
Date:13.01.2021
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2021/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3762009
Date:11.05.2022
Language:EN
[2022/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.09.2019
ClassificationIPC:C12N9/10, C07K14/21, C07K14/28, A61K38/00, A61K38/16, A61K47/64, A61K47/65
[2021/49]
CPC:
A61K38/21 (EP,US); C07K14/28 (EP,IL,KR); A61K47/64 (KR);
A61K47/6415 (EP,IL,KR,US); A61K38/00 (EP,IL); A61K38/19 (KR);
A61K38/27 (US); A61K47/65 (EP,IL,KR,US); A61K9/0043 (EP,US);
A61K9/007 (US); A61P1/00 (EP); A61P1/16 (KR);
A61P29/00 (KR); A61P3/00 (KR); A61P35/00 (KR);
A61P37/00 (KR); C07K14/21 (EP,IL,KR); C07K14/5428 (KR);
C07K14/62 (KR); C07K16/241 (KR); C12N9/1077 (EP,IL);
C12Y204/02036 (EP,IL); A61K2039/505 (KR); A61K9/0053 (KR);
A61K9/0073 (EP); C07K2319/60 (KR) (-)
Former IPC [2021/02]A61K38/16, C07K14/21, C07K14/28, A61K47/64, C12N9/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/02]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VON TOXINEN ABGELEITETE KONSTRUKTE ZUR ORALEN VERABREICHUNG[2021/02]
English:TOXIN-DERIVED DELIVERY CONSTRUCTS FOR ORAL DELIVERY[2021/02]
French:CONSTRUCTIONS D'ADMINISTRATION DÉRIVÉES DE TOXINES POUR ADMINISTRATION ORALE[2021/02]
Entry into regional phase08.10.2020National basic fee paid 
08.10.2020Designation fee(s) paid 
08.10.2020Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.10.2020Examination requested  [2021/02]
08.10.2020Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.02.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.05.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.09.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.04.2022Fee for grant paid
04.04.2022Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.04.2022Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP22165874.3  / EP4082558
EP23192492.9  / EP4316586
Opposition(s)14.02.2023No opposition filed within time limit [2023/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2022Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL11.05.2022
BG11.05.2022
EE11.05.2022
HR11.05.2022
LT11.05.2022
LV11.05.2022
MC11.05.2022
RO11.05.2022
RS11.05.2022
SM11.05.2022
IS11.09.2022
[2024/51]
Former [2023/48]AL11.05.2022
EE11.05.2022
HR11.05.2022
LT11.05.2022
LV11.05.2022
MC11.05.2022
RO11.05.2022
RS11.05.2022
SM11.05.2022
BG11.08.2022
IS11.09.2022
Former [2023/17]AL11.05.2022
EE11.05.2022
HR11.05.2022
LT11.05.2022
LV11.05.2022
RO11.05.2022
RS11.05.2022
SM11.05.2022
BG11.08.2022
IS11.09.2022
Former [2023/09]EE11.05.2022
HR11.05.2022
LT11.05.2022
LV11.05.2022
RO11.05.2022
RS11.05.2022
SM11.05.2022
BG11.08.2022
IS11.09.2022
Former [2022/51]HR11.05.2022
LT11.05.2022
LV11.05.2022
RS11.05.2022
BG11.08.2022
IS11.09.2022
Former [2022/50]HR11.05.2022
LT11.05.2022
LV11.05.2022
RS11.05.2022
BG11.08.2022
Former [2022/49]HR11.05.2022
LT11.05.2022
LV11.05.2022
BG11.08.2022
Former [2022/47]LT11.05.2022
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2012036746  (MRSNY RANDALL J [US], et al);
 [XI]WO2015171965  (APPLIED MOLECULAR TRANSP LLC [US]);
by applicantUS4414148
 US4458066
 US4569789
 US4589071
 US4659839
 US4671958
 US4680338
 US4683195
 US4699784
 US5272065
 US5807832
 US5917021
 US5922680
 US5997856
 US6007791
 US6086918
 US6133229
 US6174529
 US6255284
 US6391296
 US6525102
 US6573237
 US6592847
 US6613332
 US6673574
 US6759207
 US8877161
 WO2014US56177
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.