EP3790877 - TETRAHYDRO-IMIDAZO[4,5-C]PYRIDINE DERIVATIVES AS PD-L1 IMMUNOMODULATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/11] | TETRAHYDRO-IMIDAZO[4,5-C]PYRIDINE DERIVATIVES AS PD-L1 IMMUNOMODULATORS | ||
[2022/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: AL | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Incyte Corporation 1801 Augustine Cut-Off Wilmington, DE 19803 / US | [2021/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Liangxing 1801 Augustine Cut-Off Wilmington, Delaware 19803 / US | 02 /
XIAO, Kaijiong 1801 Augustine Cut-Off Wilmington, Delaware 19803 / US | 03 /
YAO, Wenqing 1801 Augustine Cut-Off Wilmington, Delaware 19803 / US | [2021/11] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2023/09] |
Former [2021/11] | Warner, James Alexander Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 19725627.4 | 10.05.2019 | [2021/11] | WO2019US31728 | Priority number, date | US201862670249P | 11.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862670249 P | US201862688164P | 21.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862688164 P | [2021/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019217821 | Date: | 14.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3790877 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3790877 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, A61P35/00, A61P37/00, A61K31/437 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
C07D519/00 (CN,IL,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K31/437 (IL,KR);
A61P25/28 (IL,KR);
A61P29/00 (IL,KR);
A61P31/00 (CN,IL,KR);
A61P31/04 (CN);
A61P31/10 (CN);
A61P35/02 (CN);
A61P37/00 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P37/02 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] | Extension states | BA | 10.12.2020 | ME | 10.12.2020 | Validation states | KH | 10.12.2020 | MA | 10.12.2020 | MD | 10.12.2020 | TN | 10.12.2020 | Title | German: | TETRAHYDRO-IMIDAZO[4,5-C]PYRIDIN-DERIVATIVE ALS PD-L1 IMMUNOMODULATOREN | [2022/02] | English: | TETRAHYDRO-IMIDAZO[4,5-C]PYRIDINE DERIVATIVES AS PD-L1 IMMUNOMODULATORS | [2022/42] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE TÉTRAHYDRO-IMIDAZO[4,5-C]PYRIDINE EN TANT QU'IMMUNOMODULATEURS DE PD-L1 | [2021/11] |
Former [2021/11] | TETRAHYDRO-IMIDAZO[4,5-C]PYRIDIN-DERIVATE ALS PD-L1-IMMUNOMODULATOREN | ||
Former [2021/11] | TETRAHYDRO-IMIDAZO[4,5-C]PYRIDINE DERIVATIVES AS PD-L1 IMMUNOMODULATORS | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 10.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23152736.7 / EP4219492 | EP24213778.4 | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2024/31] |
Former [2023/50] | AL | 01.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2017222976 (INCYTE CORP [US]); | [A]WO2018026971 (ARISING INT LLC [US]); | [IP]WO2018119224 (INCYTE CORP [US]) | by applicant | WO0200196 |