blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3810201

EP3810201 - GIP/GLP1 AGONIST COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.05.2023
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.03.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.03.2022
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.02.2022
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.11.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.03.2021
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  27.12.2019
Formerunknown
Status updated on  23.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.02.2025New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eli Lilly and Company
Lilly Corporate Center
Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US
[2021/17]
Inventor(s)01 / CORVARI, Vincent John
c/o Eli Lilly and Company P.O. Box 6288
Indianapolis, Indiana 46206-6288 / US
02 / MINIE, Christopher Sears
c/o Eli Lilly and Company P.O. Box 6288
Indianapolis, Indiana 46206-6288 / US
03 / MISHRA, Dinesh Shyandeo
c/o Eli Lilly and Company P.O. Box 6288
Indianapolis, Indiana 46206-6288 / US
04 / QIAN, Ken Kangyi
c/o Eli Lilly and Company P.O. Box 6288
Indianapolis, Indiana 46206-6288 / US
 [2021/17]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2021/17]Bassinder, Emma Marie
Eli Lilly and Company Limited
8 Arlington Square West Downshire Way
Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 1PU / GB
Application number, filing date19739766.414.06.2019
[2021/17]
WO2019US37146
Priority number, dateUS201862688632P22.06.2018         Original published format: US 201862688632 P
[2021/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2019245893
Date:26.12.2019
Language:EN
[2019/52]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3810201
Date:28.04.2021
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2021/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3810201
Date:07.06.2023
Language:EN
[2023/23]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP3810201
Date:02.08.2023
[2023/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.03.2020
ClassificationIPC:A61K47/02, A61K47/10, A61K38/26, A61P3/10
[2021/46]
CPC:
A61K47/02 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US); A61K38/16 (IL,US); A61K9/0021 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K38/26 (EP,CN,IL,KR); A61K47/10 (EP,IL,US); A61K9/0019 (EP,IL,US);
A61M5/20 (IL,US); A61P3/04 (CN); A61P3/10 (EP,CN,IL,KR) (-)
Former IPC [2021/17]A61K47/02, A61K47/10, A61K38/00, A61K38/16, A61P3/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/17]
Extension statesBA22.01.2021
ME22.01.2021
Validation statesMA22.01.2021
MD22.01.2021
TN22.01.2021
TitleGerman:GIP/GLP1-AGONIST-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2021/17]
English:GIP/GLP1 AGONIST COMPOSITIONS[2021/17]
French:COMPOSITIONS AGONISTES GIP/GLP1[2021/17]
Entry into regional phase22.01.2021National basic fee paid 
22.01.2021Designation fee(s) paid 
22.01.2021Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.12.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.01.2021Examination requested  [2021/17]
22.01.2021Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.11.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.02.2022Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
23.03.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.05.2022Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.04.2023Fee for grant paid
26.04.2023Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.04.2023Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP23176507.4  / EP4257185
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.02.2024  06.03.2024  ADMISSIBLE
Sandoz AG
Centralbahnstrasse 4
4051 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
 02  05.03.2024  06.03.2024  ADMISSIBLE
Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
 03  06.03.2024  07.03.2024  ADMISSIBLE
STRAWMAN LIMITED
Orchard Lea
Horns Lane
Combe
Witney, Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 04  06.03.2024  07.03.2024  ADMISSIBLE
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks Kent TN 13 1XR / GB
Opponent's representative
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 05  07.03.2024  08.03.2024  ADMISSIBLE
Bülle Dr., Jan
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Waidmarkt 11
50676 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Waidmarkt 11
50676 Köln / DE
 06  07.03.2024  08.03.2024  ADMISSIBLE
Galenicum Health S.L.U.
CL Sant Gabriel n°50
08950 Esplugues de Llobregat / ES
Opponent's representative
Galenicum Health S.L.U.
CL Sant Gabriel n°50
08950 Esplugues de Llobregat / ES
 07  07.03.2024  08.03.2024  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
Building 4, Trident Place
Mosquito Way
Hatfield
Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB
Opponent's representative
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 [2025/10]
Former [2025/03]
Opponent(s)01  23.02.2024  06.03.2024  ADMISSIBLE
Sandoz AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
 02  05.03.2024  06.03.2024  ADMISSIBLE
Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
 03  06.03.2024  07.03.2024  ADMISSIBLE
STRAWMAN LIMITED
Orchard Lea
Horns Lane
Combe
Witney, Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 04  06.03.2024  07.03.2024  ADMISSIBLE
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks Kent TN 13 1XR / GB
Opponent's representative
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 05  07.03.2024  08.03.2024  ADMISSIBLE
Bülle Dr., Jan
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Waidmarkt 11
50676 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Waidmarkt 11
50676 Köln / DE
 06  07.03.2024  08.03.2024  ADMISSIBLE
Galenicum Health S.L.U.
CL Sant Gabriel n°50
08950 Esplugues de Llobregat / ES
Opponent's representative
Galenicum Health S.L.U.
CL Sant Gabriel n°50
08950 Esplugues de Llobregat / ES
 07  07.03.2024  08.03.2024  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
Building 4, Trident Place
Mosquito Way
Hatfield
Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB
Opponent's representative
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2024/16]
Opponent(s)01  23.02.2024  06.03.2024  ADMISSIBLE
Sandoz AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
 02  05.03.2024  06.03.2024  ADMISSIBLE
Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
 03  06.03.2024  07.03.2024  ADMISSIBLE
STRAWMAN LIMITED
Orchard Lea
Horns Lane
Combe
Witney, Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 04  06.03.2024  07.03.2024  ADMISSIBLE
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks Kent TN 13 1XR / GB
Opponent's representative
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 05  07.03.2024  08.03.2024  ADMISSIBLE
Bülle Dr., Jan
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Waidmarkt 11
50676 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Waidmarkt 11
50676 Köln / DE
 06  07.03.2024  08.03.2024  ADMISSIBLE
Galenicum Health S.L.U.
CL Sant Gabriel n°50
08950 Esplugues de Llobregat / ES
Opponent's representative
Torrejón-Nieto, Javier
Galenicum Health S.L.U.
CL Sant Gabriel nº50
08950 Esplugues de Llobregat / ES
 07  07.03.2024  08.03.2024  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
Building 4, Trident Place
Mosquito Way
Hatfield
Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB
Opponent's representative
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2024/15]
Opponent(s)01  23.02.2024  06.03.2024  ADMISSIBLE
Sandoz AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
 02  05.03.2024  06.03.2024  ADMISSIBLE
Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
 03  06.03.2024  07.03.2024  ADMISSIBLE
STRAWMAN LIMITED
Orchard Lea
Horns Lane
Combe
Witney, Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 04  06.03.2024  07.03.2024  ADMISSIBLE
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks Kent TN 13 1XR / GB
Opponent's representative
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2024/14]
Opponent(s)01  23.02.2024   
Sandoz AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
20.03.2024Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.09.2024Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
25.11.2025Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2022Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSM07.06.2023
[2024/08]
Cited inInternational search[A]US2012329708  (DIMARCHI RICHARD D [US], et al);
 [A]US9474780  (BOKVIST BENGT KRISTER [US], et al)
by applicantUS8734394
 US9474780
OppositionWO2004105790
 US8114833
 US8734394
 US9474780
 US2017136092
 WO2019245893
 EP0619322
 WO03002136
 WO2008019147
 WO2014005858
 CN103893744
 WO2015104311
 WO2018103868
 US2012329708
 WO2005049061
 WO2006051103
 WO2012177443
 WO2014081849
 WO2014202780
 WO2015022400
 WO2015071355
 WO2013164483
 WO2006051110
 WO2014166836
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.