EP4031451 - SEPARATION SYSTEM FOR A SATELLITE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 07.05.2025 | ||
Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2025 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SM | published on 21.05.2025 [2025/21] |
Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXOLAUNCH GmbH Kemperplatz 1 10785 Berlin / DE | ||
[2024/27] | |||
Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWARZ, Peter Seitenbachweg 14/35 5023 Salzburg / AT | ||
02 /
GRUBER, Johannes Wilhelm-Erben-Strasse 3/18 5020 Salzburg / AT | |||
03 /
WIMMER, Peter Imlau 39 5452 Pfarrwerfen / AT | |||
[2022/30] | |||
Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | ||
[2022/30] | |||
Application number, filing date | 19801831.9 | 07.11.2019 | |
[2022/30] | |||
WO2019EP80619 | |||
Filing language | EN | ||
Procedural language | EN | ||
Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | |
No.: | WO2021089167 | ||
Date: | 14.05.2021 | ||
Language: | EN | ||
[2021/19] | |||
Type: | A1 Application with search report | ||
No.: | EP4031451 | ||
Date: | 27.07.2022 | ||
Language: | EN | ||
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | |||
[2022/30] | |||
Type: | B1 Patent specification | ||
No.: | EP4031451 | ||
Date: | 03.07.2024 | ||
Language: | EN | ||
[2024/27] | |||
Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2021 |
Classification | IPC: | B64G1/64 | [2022/30] |
CPC: |
B64G1/641 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B64G1/6457 (EP,IL,KR,US)
| ||
Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/30]
![]() | ||
Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | |
ME | Not yet paid | ||
Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | |
MA | Not yet paid | ||
MD | Not yet paid | ||
TN | Not yet paid | ||
Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR TRENNUNG EINES SATELLITEN | [2022/30] |
English: | SEPARATION SYSTEM FOR A SATELLITE | [2022/30] | |
French: | SYSTÈME DE SÉPARATION POUR SATELLITE | [2022/30] | |
Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | |
12.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | ||
12.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | ||
Examination procedure | 12.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/30] | |
12.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | ||
30.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | ||
19.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | ||
10.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | ||
12.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | ||
20.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | ||
15.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | ||
23.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | ||
23.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | ||
23.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | ||
Divisional application(s) | EP24177443.9 / EP4397593 | ||
EP24177445.4 / EP4397594 | |||
Fees paid | Renewal fee | ||
12.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | ||
28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | ||
29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | ||
Penalty fee | |||
Additional fee for renewal fee | |||
30.11.2023 | 05 M06 Fee paid on 29.01.2024 | ||
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 03.07.2024 | |
SM | 03.07.2024 | ||
RS | 03.10.2024 | ||
IS | 03.11.2024 | ||
[2025/21] | |||
Cited in | International search | [A]US6354540 (LEWIS JAMES L [US], et al); | |
[XI]EP2711300 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]); | |||
[A]US2015097085 (HOLEMANS WALTER [US]); | |||
[XI]CN106742081 (AEROSPACE DONGFANGHONG SATELLITE CO LTD) |