blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3722276

EP3722276 - PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF PURIFIED CANNABIDIOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2020/42]PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF CANNABIDIOL AND PURIFIED CANNABIDIOL
[2024/15]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.12.2024
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.08.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.07.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.03.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.05.2022
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.04.2021
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  11.09.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip06.12.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 08.01.2025  [2025/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Purisys LLC
1550 Olympic Drive
Athens, GA 30601 / US
[2020/42]
Inventor(s)01 / DIALER, Lukas
Cilag AG
Hochstrasse 201
8200 Schaffhausen / CH
02 / PETROVIC, Denis
Hochstrasse 201
8200 Schaffhausen / CH
03 / WEIGL, Ulrich
Hochstrasse 201
8200 Schaffhausen / CH
 [2020/42]
Representative(s)Murgitroyd & Company
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2025/02]Murgitroyd & Company
Murgitroyd House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Former [2020/42]Murgitroyd & Company
Murgitroyd House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date20155338.501.07.2016
[2020/42]
Priority number, dateUS201562191097P10.07.2015         Original published format: US 201562191097 P
US20161519952830.06.2016         Original published format: US201615199528
[2020/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3722276
Date:14.10.2020
Language:EN
[2020/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3722276
Date:08.01.2025
Language:EN
[2025/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.07.2020
ClassificationIPC:C07D311/04, C07D311/80, C07C39/19, C07D205/04, A61P3/10, A61P25/08, C07D311/78
[2024/15]
CPC:
C07D311/78 (EP,US); A61P25/08 (EP); A61P3/10 (EP);
C07C37/11 (US); C07C37/14 (US); C07D205/04 (EP,US);
C07D311/04 (EP,US); C07D311/80 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2020/42]C07C39/19, C07D311/04, C07D311/80
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/20]  
Former [2020/42]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GEREINIGTEM CANNABIDIOL[2024/15]
English:PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF PURIFIED CANNABIDIOL[2024/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE CANNABIDIOL PURIFIÉ[2024/15]
Former [2020/42]VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CANNABIDIOL UND GEREINIGTEM CANNABIDIOL
Former [2020/42]PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF CANNABIDIOL AND PURIFIED CANNABIDIOL
Former [2020/42]PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE CANNABIDIOL ET DE CANNABIDIOL PURIFIÉ
Examination procedure14.04.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.04.2021Examination requested  [2021/20]
14.04.2021Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.05.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.11.2022Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2023Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.11.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.03.2024Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.07.2024Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
05.08.2024Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.12.2024Fee for grant paid
03.12.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.12.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP16741447.3  / EP3319952
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.02.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
04.02.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 05
15.07.2021Renewal fee patent year 06
15.06.2022Renewal fee patent year 07
29.06.2023Renewal fee patent year 08
18.07.2024Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO0103690  (UNIV VIRGINIA COMMONWEALTH [US], et al);
 [XI]WO03063847  (GW PHARMA LTD [GB], et al);
 [XI]WO2004026802  (GW PHARMA LTD [GB], et al);
 [E]WO2016153347  (ECHO PHARMACEUTICALS BV [NL]);
 [E]WO2016191651  (INSYS DEV CO INC [US]);
by applicantUS3562312
 US5227537
 US7674922
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.