blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3730132

EP3730132 - COMPOSITION FOR USE IN A METHOD OF TREATING OVERWEIGHT AND OBESITY IN PATIENTS WITH HIGH CARDIOVASCULAR RISK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.03.2023
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.04.2022
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.11.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  30.04.2021
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  28.09.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 30.10.2024  [2024/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nalpropion Pharmaceuticals LLC
155 Franklin Rd, Suite 450
Brentwood, TN 37027 / US
[2022/16]
Former [2020/44]For all designated states
Nalpropion Pharmaceuticals LLC
10 North Place Park, Suite 201
Morristown, NJ 07960 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KLASSEN, Preston
7762 Lookout Drive
La Jolla, CA 92037 / US
02 / TAYLOR, Kristin
15023 Palomino Mesa Road
San Diego, CA 92127 / US
 [2020/44]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2022/18]
Former [2020/44]Holland, David Christopher
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
Application number, filing date20165284.905.06.2013
[2020/44]
Priority number, dateUS201261656451P06.06.2012         Original published format: US 201261656451 P
[2020/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3730132
Date:28.10.2020
Language:EN
[2020/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3730132
Date:04.05.2022
Language:EN
[2022/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.07.2020
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/137, A61K31/485, A61P3/04, A61P9/00, A61P9/04, A61P9/10, A61K9/20, G01G19/414, G09B5/06, G09B19/00, G16H20/10
[2020/44]
CPC:
G16H20/10 (EP,IL,US); A61K31/485 (EP,IL,KR,US); A61K31/137 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P3/04 (EP,IL,KR,US); A61P9/00 (EP,IL,US); A61P9/04 (EP,IL,US);
A61P9/10 (EP,IL,US); G01G19/4146 (EP,IL,US); G09B19/0092 (IL,US);
G09B5/065 (IL,US); A61K2300/00 (IL,KR) (-)
C-Set:
A61K31/137, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/485, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/22]
Former [2020/44]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG IN EINEM VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ÜBERGEWICHT UND FETTLEIBIGKEIT BEI PATIENTEN MIT HOHEM KARDIOVASKULÄREM RISIKO[2020/44]
English:COMPOSITION FOR USE IN A METHOD OF TREATING OVERWEIGHT AND OBESITY IN PATIENTS WITH HIGH CARDIOVASCULAR RISK[2020/44]
French:COMPOSITION À UTILISER DANS UNE MÉTHODE DE TRAITEMENT DE LA SURCHARGE PONDÉRALE ET DE L'OBÉSITÉ CHEZ DES PATIENTS PRÉSENTANT UN RISQUE CARDIOVASCULAIRE ÉLEVÉ[2020/44]
Examination procedure28.04.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.04.2021Examination requested  [2021/22]
28.04.2021Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.11.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.03.2022Fee for grant paid
23.03.2022Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.03.2022Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP13800883.4  / EP2858640
Divisional application(s)EP22170364.8  / EP4104824
Opposition(s)07.02.2023No opposition filed within time limit [2023/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
24.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
24.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 05
24.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 06
24.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 07
24.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 08
14.06.2021Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL04.05.2022
HR04.05.2022
MC04.05.2022
MK04.05.2022
MT04.05.2022
RO04.05.2022
SI04.05.2022
SM04.05.2022
IS04.09.2022
[2024/44]
Former [2024/23]AL04.05.2022
HR04.05.2022
MC04.05.2022
MK04.05.2022
RO04.05.2022
SI04.05.2022
SM04.05.2022
IS04.09.2022
Former [2023/25]AL04.05.2022
HR04.05.2022
MC04.05.2022
RO04.05.2022
SI04.05.2022
SM04.05.2022
IS04.09.2022
Former [2023/17]AL04.05.2022
HR04.05.2022
MC04.05.2022
RO04.05.2022
SM04.05.2022
IS04.09.2022
Former [2023/11]HR04.05.2022
MC04.05.2022
RO04.05.2022
SM04.05.2022
IS04.09.2022
Former [2023/09]HR04.05.2022
RO04.05.2022
SM04.05.2022
IS04.09.2022
Former [2022/51]HR04.05.2022
IS04.09.2022
Former [2022/49]HR04.05.2022
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2007145863  (OREXIGEN THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al);
by applicantUS2007117827
 US2007128298
 US2007129283
 US2007179168
 US2007270450
 US2007275970
 US2007281021
 US2008113026
 US2008110792
 US7375111
 US2008214592
 US7462626
 WO2009158114
 US19860611674
 US19440612938
 US20100751970
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.