blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3699198

EP3699198 - METHODS FOR TUMOR TREATMENT USING CD3XCD20 BISPECIFIC ANTIBODY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.02.2025
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.11.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.02.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.02.2021
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  24.07.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.02.2025(Expected) grantpublished on 26.03.2025  [2025/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US
[2020/35]
Inventor(s)01 / SMITH, Eric
c/o Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc.
777 Old Saw Mill, River Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US
02 / DAVIS, Samuel
c/o Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc.
777 Old Saw Mill, River Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US
03 / VARGHESE, Bindu
c/o Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc.
777 Old Saw Mill, River Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US
04 / KIRSHNER, Jessica R.
c/o Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc.
777 Old Saw Mill, River Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US
05 / THURSTON, Gavin
c/o Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc.
777 Old Saw Mill, River Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US
06 / LOWY, Israel
c/o Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc.
777 Old Saw Mill, River Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US
07 / BROWNSTEIN, Carrie
c/o Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc.
777 Old Saw Mill, River Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US
 [2020/35]
Representative(s)J A Kemp LLP
80 Turnmill Street
London EC1M 5QU / GB
[2025/13]
Former [2020/35]J A Kemp LLP
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date20167215.117.11.2015
[2020/35]
Priority number, dateUS201462080716P17.11.2014         Original published format: US 201462080716 P
US201562160788P13.05.2015         Original published format: US 201562160788 P
[2020/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3699198
Date:26.08.2020
Language:EN
[2020/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3699198
Date:26.03.2025
Language:EN
[2025/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.07.2020
ClassificationIPC:C07K16/28, G01N33/50, A61K39/00, A61P35/02
[2020/35]
CPC:
C07K16/2809 (EP,IL,KR,US); A61K39/395 (IL,KR); A61K39/39566 (IL,US);
A61P35/02 (EP,IL,US); C07K16/2887 (EP,IL,KR,US); A61K2039/505 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/545 (EP,IL,KR,US); C07K2317/31 (EP,IL,KR,US); C07K2317/53 (IL,KR);
C07K2317/73 (IL,KR); C07K2317/92 (IL,KR) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/13]
Former [2020/35]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR TUMORBEHANDLUNG MIT BISPEZIFISCHEM CONCURRENT IMAGE-ANTIKÖRPER[2020/35]
English:METHODS FOR TUMOR TREATMENT USING CD3XCD20 BISPECIFIC ANTIBODY[2020/35]
French:PROCÉDÉS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE TUMEURS À L'AIDE D'ANTICORPS BISPÉCIFIQUES CD3XCD20[2020/35]
Examination procedure24.02.2021Examination requested  [2021/13]
24.02.2021Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.03.2021Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
28.05.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.02.2023Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.06.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.11.2024Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.02.2025Fee for grant paid
17.02.2025Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.02.2025Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP15801637.8  / EP3221359
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
28.05.2021Request for further processing filed
28.05.2021Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
09.06.2021Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2020Renewal fee patent year 05
19.11.2020Renewal fee patent year 06
18.11.2021Renewal fee patent year 07
22.11.2022Renewal fee patent year 08
22.11.2023Renewal fee patent year 09
21.11.2024Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2014047231  (REGENERON PHARMA [US]);
 [Y]WO2014121087  (REGENERON PHARMA [US]);
 [YP]WO2015143079  (REGENERON PHARMA [US]);
by applicantUS4361549
 US5500362
 US5736137
 US5821337
 WO2005103081
 US7087411
 US2007280945
 US2009142354
 US7879984
 US2011027286
 US2011195454
 WO2013166236
 WO2014121087
 WO2013US60511
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.