blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Dates prévues pour la maintenance

Interruptions régulières:
entre 5 h 00 et 5 h 15 HEC, du lundi au dimanche.

Autres interruptions
Accessibilité

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

Flash Info

La Lettonie participe au Registre fédéré
Cliquez ici pour plus d'informations sur le Registre fédéré.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3708120

EP3708120 - BOBINES D'ANCRAGE DE VALVULE CARDIAQUE ET SYSTÈMES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.07.2024
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.03.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.03.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.11.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.03.2021
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  14.08.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2025Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): EE
published on 28.05.2025 [2025/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Edwards Lifesciences Corporation
One Edwards Way
Irvine, CA 92614 / US
[2020/38]
Inventor(s)01 / PATEL, Darshin S.
Edwards Lifesciences
One Edwards Way
IRVINE, CA 92614 / US
02 / MANASH, Boaz
Edwards Lifesciences
One Edwards Way
IRVINE, CA 92614 / US
03 / PERLMUTTER, Khen
Edwards Lifesciences
One Edwards Way
IRVINE, CA 92614 / US
04 / LEIBA, Eyal
Edwards Lifesciences
One Edwards Way
IRVINE, CA 92614 / US
05 / ROZEN, Yoav
Edwards Lifesciences
One Edwards Way
IRVINE, CA 92614 / US
06 / SIRIMANNE, Dinesh L.
Edwards Lifesciences
One Edwards Way
IRVINE, CA 92614 / US
07 / AXELROD, Noa
Edwards Lifesciences
One Edwards Way
IRVINE, CA 92614 / US
08 / KIBLITSKI, Zohar
75 Yakinton Street
34792 Haifa / IL
 [2020/38]
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 31 02 60
80102 München / DE
[2020/38]
Application number, filing date20168273.925.08.2017
[2020/38]
Priority number, dateUS201662380117P26.08.2016         Original published format: US 201662380117 P
US201662395940P16.09.2016         Original published format: US 201662395940 P
US20171568228721.08.2017         Original published format: US201715682287
US20171568483623.08.2017         Original published format: US201715684836
[2020/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3708120
Date:16.09.2020
Language:EN
[2020/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3708120
Date:28.08.2024
Language:EN
[2024/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.08.2020
ClassificationIPC:A61F2/24
[2020/38]
CPC:
A61F2/2409 (EP,CN,IL,US); A61F2/2412 (EP,CN,IL,US); A61F2/2418 (EP,CN,IL,US);
A61F2/2427 (EP,CN,IL,US); A61F2/2436 (CN,IL,US); A61F2/2466 (CN,IL,US);
A61B2017/00243 (IL,US); A61B2017/0649 (IL,US); A61F2230/0008 (EP,CN,IL,US);
A61F2230/0091 (EP,CN,IL,US); A61F2250/0036 (EP,CN,IL,US); A61F2250/0039 (EP,CN,IL,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/16]
Former [2020/38]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:HERZKLAPPENANDOCKSPULEN UND -SYSTEME[2020/38]
English:HEART VALVE DOCKING COILS AND SYSTEMS[2020/38]
French:BOBINES D'ANCRAGE DE VALVULE CARDIAQUE ET SYSTÈMES[2020/38]
Examination procedure15.03.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.03.2021Examination requested  [2021/16]
16.03.2021Date on which the examining division has become responsible
06.11.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.03.2024Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
22.03.2024Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.07.2024Fee for grant paid
19.07.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.07.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP17844506.0  / EP3451974
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.08.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
19.08.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
13.08.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
18.07.2022Renewal fee patent year 06
05.07.2023Renewal fee patent year 07
04.07.2024Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipEE28.08.2024
LV28.08.2024
SM28.08.2024
RS28.11.2024
[2025/22]
Former [2025/21]LV28.08.2024
SM28.08.2024
RS28.11.2024
Former [2025/10]LV28.08.2024
RS28.11.2024
Former [2025/09]LV28.08.2024
Documents cited:Search[A]WO03020179  (MITRAL INTERVENTIONS [US], et al);
 [A]US2013006352  (YARON IRA [IL]);
 [Y]WO2015023862  (MITRAL VALVE TECHNOLOGIES SA [CH]);
 [Y]WO2015023579  (MITRAL VALVE TECHNOLOGIES SA [CH], et al);
 [XYI]US2016228247  (MAIMON DAVID [IL], et al);
 [E]WO2018118717  (EDWARDS LIFESCIENCES CORP [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.