blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3756681

EP3756681 - COMPOSITION FOR CONTROLLED OVARIAN STIMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.03.2024
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.03.2023
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.11.2022
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.08.2022
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.04.2022
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.11.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.06.2021
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  27.11.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.03.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 17.04.2024  [2024/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ferring B.V.
Polaris Avenue
144
2132 JX Hoofddorp / NL
[2021/01]
Inventor(s)01 / ARCE, Joan-Carles
Soevej 100
2791 Dragoer / DK
 [2021/01]
Representative(s)Bates, Philip Ian
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[2021/01]
Application number, filing date20186935.108.08.2012
[2021/01]
Priority number, dateEP2011017680308.08.2011         Original published format: EP 11176803
[2021/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3756681
Date:30.12.2020
Language:EN
[2020/53]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3756681
Date:03.05.2023
Language:EN
[2023/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.11.2020
ClassificationIPC:A61K38/24, A61P5/06, A61P5/00, A61P15/08, A61P43/00
[2022/18]
CPC:
A61K38/24 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US); A61K38/00 (RU); A61P15/08 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P43/00 (EP,IL); A61P5/00 (EP,IL); A61P5/06 (EP,IL,KR,RU);
G01N33/74 (RU) (-)
Former IPC [2021/01]A61K38/24, A61P5/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/30]
Former [2021/01]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR KONTROLLIERTE EIERSTOCKSTIMULATION[2021/01]
English:COMPOSITION FOR CONTROLLED OVARIAN STIMULATION[2021/01]
French:COMPOSITION DE STIMULATION OVARIENNE CONTRÔLÉE[2021/01]
Examination procedure21.06.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.06.2021Examination requested  [2021/30]
21.06.2021Date on which the examining division has become responsible
26.11.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.12.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.04.2022Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.08.2022Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
24.08.2022Fee for grant paid
24.08.2022Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.11.2022Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.03.2023Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12753675.3  / EP2741763
EP14184409.2  / EP2821080
EP18167552.1  / EP3395357
EP19164277.6  / EP3566712
Divisional application(s)EP21207717.6  / EP4005588
EP23208228.9  / EP4306174
Opposition(s)06.02.2024No opposition filed within time limit [2024/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
21.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
21.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 05
21.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 06
21.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 07
21.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 08
21.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 09
26.08.2021Renewal fee patent year 10
25.08.2022Renewal fee patent year 11
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipMC03.05.2023
SM03.05.2023
[2024/16]
Former [2024/08]SM03.05.2023
Documents cited:Search[A]US2008108571  (FILICORI MARCO [IT]);
 [AD]WO2009127826  (FERRING INT CT SA [CH], et al);
by applicantWO2009127826
 WO2012017058
 WO2009GB00978
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.