blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Geplante Wartungsarbeiten

Regelmäßige Unterbrechungen:
zwischen 5.00 und 5.15 Uhr MEZ (Montag bis Sonntag).

Andere Unterbrechungen
Verfügbarkeit

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

Kurzmeldungen

Lettland beteiligt sich am Vereinigten Register
Nähere Informationen zum Vereinigten Register finden Sie hier.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3805268

EP3805268 - ANTIBODY THAT BINDS ERBB-2 AND ERBB-3 [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.11.2024
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.07.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.05.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.03.2021
Most recent event   Tooltip06.12.2024Change - divisional application(s)published on 08.01.2025  [2025/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merus N.V.
Uppsalalaan 17
3e en 4e verdieping
3584 CT Utrecht / NL
[2023/06]
Former [2021/15]For all designated states
Merus N.V.
Yalelaan 62
3584 CM Utrecht / NL
Inventor(s)01 / GEUIJEN, Cecilia Anna Wilhelmina
3584 CT Utrecht / NL
02 / DE KRUIF, Cornelis Adriaan
3584 CT Utrecht / NL
03 / THROSBY, Mark
3584 CT Utrecht / NL
04 / LOGTENBERG, Ton
3584 CT Utrecht / NL
05 / BAKKER, Alexander Berthold Hendrik
3584 CT Utrecht / NL
 [2023/06]
Former [2021/15]01 / GEUIJEN, Cecilia Anna Wilhelmina
c/o Yalelaan 62
3584 CM Utrecht / NL
02 / DE KRUIF, Cornelis Adriaan
c/o Yalelaan 62
3584 CM Utrecht / NL
03 / THROSBY, Mark
c/o Yalelaan 62
3584 CM Utrecht / NL
04 / LOGTENBERG, Ton
c/o Yalelaan 62
3584 CM Utrecht / NL
05 / BAKKER, Alexander Berthold Hendrik
c/o Yalelaan 62
3584 CM Utrecht / NL
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2021/15]
Application number, filing date20191815.827.02.2015
[2021/15]
Priority number, dateEP2014015736028.02.2014         Original published format: EP 14157360
EP2014016706605.05.2014         Original published format: EP 14167066
[2021/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3805268
Date:14.04.2021
Language:EN
[2021/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3805268
Date:04.12.2024
Language:EN
[2024/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.03.2021
ClassificationIPC:C07K16/32, A61P9/04, A61P35/00, A61P35/04, A61P43/00
[2021/15]
CPC:
C07K16/32 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US); A61K31/185 (IL,US); A61K31/337 (IL,US);
A61K31/436 (IL,US); A61K31/4375 (IL,US); A61K31/4439 (IL,US);
A61K31/519 (IL,US); A61K39/3955 (IL); A61K39/39558 (IL,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR); A61P35/04 (EP,IL); A61P43/00 (EP,IL);
A61P9/04 (EP,IL); C07K16/30 (IL,US); A61K2039/505 (IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/24 (IL,US); C07K2317/31 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US); C07K2317/526 (IL,US);
C07K2317/55 (EP,CN,IL,US); C07K2317/565 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US); C07K2317/732 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US); C07K2317/92 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/15]
Extension statesBA19.08.2020
ME19.08.2020
TitleGerman:ERBB-2- UND ERBB-3-BINDENDER ANTIKÖRPER[2021/15]
English:ANTIBODY THAT BINDS ERBB-2 AND ERBB-3[2021/15]
French:ANTICORPS LIANT ERBB-2 ET ERBB-3[2021/15]
Examination procedure19.08.2020Examination requested  [2021/15]
14.10.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.05.2023Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.10.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.12.2023Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.04.2024Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.07.2024Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.10.2024Fee for grant paid
28.10.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.10.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP15708907.9  / EP3110849
Divisional application(s)EP24216946.4
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.08.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
19.08.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
19.08.2020Renewal fee patent year 05
19.08.2020Renewal fee patent year 06
19.01.2021Renewal fee patent year 07
18.01.2022Renewal fee patent year 08
17.01.2023Renewal fee patent year 09
23.01.2024Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2012125864  (MERRIMACK PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al);
 [XP]WO2014060365  (UNIVERSITÄT ZÜRICH PROREKTORAT MNW [CH]);
by applicantUS2003078385
 WO2004009618
 US2006212956
 WO2008027236
 WO2008100624
 WO2009157771
 US7705103
 WO2010108127
 US2011077163
 US2012107306
 US8349574
 US2013071859
 WO2013134686
 WO2013157954
 US19350616359
 US20080340436
 WO2013NL50294
 WO2014US33208
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.