blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3795177

EP3795177 - CLAUDIN-18.2-SPECIFIC IMMUNORECEPTORS AND T CELL EPITOPES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.02.2023
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.03.2022
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.11.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.06.2021
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  19.02.2021
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2023No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.03.2023  [2023/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BioNTech Cell & Gene Therapies GmbH
An der Goldgrube 12
55131 Mainz / DE
For all designated states
TRON - Translationale Onkologie an der Universitätsmedizin der Johannes Gutenberg- Universität Mainz gemeinnützige GmbH
Freiligrathstrasse 12
55131 Mainz / DE
[2021/12]
Inventor(s)01 / SAHIN, Ugur
Philipp-von-Zabern-Platz 1
55116 Mainz / DE
02 / TÜRECI, Özlem
Philipp-von-Zabern-Platz 1
55116 Mainz / DE
03 / SIMON, Petra
Silvanerstraße 33
55129 Mainz / DE
04 / OMOKOKO, Tana
Franz-Werfel-Straße 20
55122 Mainz / DE
05 / BREITKREUZ, Andrea
Trifelsstraße 47
67551 Worms / DE
06 / MROZ, Karolina Anna
Zietenring 3
65195 Wiesbaden / DE
07 / HEBICH, Lisa
Steinäckersiedlung 3
67304 Kerzenheim / DE
 [2022/15]
Former [2021/12]01 / SAHIN, Ugur
Philipp-von-Zabern-Platz 1
55116 Mainz / DE
02 / TÜRECI, Özlem
Philipp-von-Zabern-Platz 1
55116 Mainz / DE
03 / SIMON, Petra
Silvanerstrasse 33
55129 Mainz / DE
04 / OMOKOKO, Tana
Franz-Werfel-Strasse 20
55122 Mainz / DE
05 / BREITKREUZ, Andrea
Trifelsstrasse 47
67551 Worms / DE
06 / MROZ, Karolina Anna
Zietenring 3
65195 Wiesbaden / DE
07 / HEBICH, Lisa
Steinäckersiedlung 3
67304 Kerzenheim / DE
Representative(s)Müller, Christian Stefan Gerd
ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Hansastraße 32
80686 München / DE
[2021/12]
Application number, filing date20193185.409.05.2016
[2021/12]
Priority number, dateWO2015EP6035711.05.2015         Original published format: PCT/EP2015/060357
[2021/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3795177
Date:24.03.2021
Language:EN
[2021/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3795177
Date:13.04.2022
Language:EN
[2022/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.02.2021
ClassificationIPC:A61K39/395, C07K14/725, C07K7/06, C07K14/47, A61P35/00
[2021/12]
CPC:
C07K14/7051 (EP,CN,KR,US); C07K14/70539 (CN,US); A61K39/0011 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K40/11 (EP,CN,KR,US); A61K40/31 (EP,CN,KR,US); A61K40/32 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K40/4202 (EP,CN,KR,US); A61P35/00 (EP,CN,KR); A61P37/04 (EP,CN);
C07K14/705 (US); C07K14/70521 (EP,US); C07K16/18 (KR);
C07K16/28 (EP,CN,US); C07K7/06 (EP,US); C12N5/0636 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K2039/572 (CN,US); A61K2039/575 (CN,US); C07K2317/34 (CN,US);
C07K2317/56 (CN,US); C07K2317/565 (CN,US); C07K2317/622 (CN,US);
C07K2317/73 (CN,US); C07K2317/76 (CN,US); C07K2319/02 (CN,KR,US);
C07K2319/03 (EP,CN,KR,US); C07K2319/035 (CN,US); C07K2319/30 (CN,US);
C07K2319/33 (EP,CN,KR) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/29]
Former [2021/12]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBA16.06.2021
ME16.06.2021
TitleGerman:CLAUDIN-18.2-SPEZIFISCHE IMMUNREZEPTOREN UND T-ZELL-EPITOPE[2021/12]
English:CLAUDIN-18.2-SPECIFIC IMMUNORECEPTORS AND T CELL EPITOPES[2021/12]
French:IMMUNORÉCEPTEURS ET ÉPITOPES DE LYMPHOCYTES T SPÉCIFIQUES DE LA CLAUDINE-18.2[2021/12]
Examination procedure16.06.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.06.2021Examination requested  [2021/29]
16.06.2021Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.11.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.03.2022Fee for grant paid
03.03.2022Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.03.2022Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP16721176.2  / EP3294333
Divisional application(s)EP22166898.1  / EP4082565
Opposition(s)16.01.2023No opposition filed within time limit [2023/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
27.08.2020Renewal fee patent year 05
17.05.2021Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2005113587  (GANYMED PHARMACEUTICALS AG [DE], et al);
 [A]WO2008145338  (GANYMED PHARMACEUTICALS AG [DE], et al);
 [A]WO2012038055  (UNICELL GMBH [DE], et al);
 [A]WO2014146672  (GANYMED PHARMACEUTICALS AG [DE], et al);
by applicantWO9633265
 WO9724447
 US2003118592
 US2003133939
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.