blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Geplante Wartungsarbeiten

Regelmäßige Unterbrechungen:
zwischen 5.00 und 5.15 Uhr MEZ (Montag bis Sonntag).

Andere Unterbrechungen
Verfügbarkeit

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

Kurzmeldungen

Lettland beteiligt sich am Vereinigten Register
Nähere Informationen zum Vereinigten Register finden Sie hier.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3850946

EP3850946 - NICHTHUMANE TIERE MIT HUMANISIERTEM CLUSTER DES DIFFERENZIERUNGS-47-GENS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2024
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.08.2023
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.04.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.07.2022
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.01.2022
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  18.06.2021
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2024No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.09.2024  [2024/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591-6707 / US
[2021/29]
Inventor(s)01 / GURER, Cagan
c/o Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591-6707 / US
02 / IOFFE, Ella
c/o Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591-6707 / US
03 / MUJICA, Alexander
c/o Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591-6707 / US
04 / THURSTON, Gavin
c/o Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591-6707 / US
 [2021/29]
Representative(s)J A Kemp LLP
80 Turnmill Street
London EC1M 5QU / GB
[2023/39]
Former [2021/29]J A Kemp LLP
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date20215046.225.11.2015
[2021/29]
Priority number, dateUS201462087992P05.12.2014         Original published format: US 201462087992 P
[2021/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3850946
Date:21.07.2021
Language:EN
[2021/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3850946
Date:27.09.2023
Language:EN
[2023/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.06.2021
ClassificationIPC:A01K67/027, G01N33/50, C07K14/705, C07K16/28, A61P35/00, C07K14/47
[2021/29]
CPC:
A01K67/0278 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US); A61K49/0008 (CN,IL,RU); A61P35/00 (EP,IL);
C07K14/4703 (EP,IL,US); C07K14/705 (IL,US); C07K14/70503 (CN,IL,US);
C07K14/70596 (EP,IL,KR,US); C07K16/2803 (EP,IL,US); C12N15/63 (US);
C12N15/8509 (IL,KR,RU,US); G01N33/5011 (EP,IL,RU,US); G01N33/5014 (EP,IL,RU,US);
G01N33/5055 (EP,IL,RU,US); G01N33/5088 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US); A01K2207/12 (IL,US);
A01K2207/15 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US); A01K2217/05 (CN,IL); A01K2217/052 (IL,KR,US);
A01K2217/072 (EP,IL,KR,US); A01K2217/15 (EP,IL,KR,US); A01K2227/105 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A01K2267/03 (CN,IL); A01K2267/0331 (EP,IL,KR,US); A01K2267/0381 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,IL,US); C07K2319/02 (EP,IL,US); G01N2333/70596 (EP,IL,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2022/09]
Former [2021/29]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:NICHTHUMANE TIERE MIT HUMANISIERTEM CLUSTER DES DIFFERENZIERUNGS-47-GENS[2021/29]
English:NON-HUMAN ANIMALS HAVING A HUMANIZED CLUSTER OF DIFFERENTIATION 47 GENE[2021/29]
French:ANIMAUX NON HUMAINS AYANT UN GROUPE HUMANISÉ DE GÈNE DE DIFFÉRENCIATION 47[2021/29]
Examination procedure20.01.2022Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.01.2022Examination requested  [2022/09]
20.01.2022Date on which the examining division has become responsible
01.07.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.10.2022Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.08.2023Fee for grant paid
18.08.2023Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.08.2023Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP15813960.0  / EP3086637
EP18207075.5  / EP3466255
Divisional application(s)EP23192469.7  / EP4296278
Opposition(s)28.06.2024No opposition filed within time limit [2024/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
17.12.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
17.12.2020Renewal fee patent year 05
17.12.2020Renewal fee patent year 06
18.11.2021Renewal fee patent year 07
22.11.2022Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2007033221  (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US], et al);
 [A]WO2013063556  (REGENERON PHARMA [US]);
by applicantUS5670356
 US5874304
 US6586251
 US7294754
 US2010051339
 US8354389
 US8518392
 US8697851
 WO2012US25040
 WO2012US62379
 WO2013US45788
 WO2013US58448
 WO2014US56910
 WO2014US60568
 WO2014US64806
 WO2014US64810
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.