EP3921327 - GLYCYRRHETINIC ACID DERIVATIVES FOR USE IN TREATING HYPERKALEMIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 18.12.2024 [2024/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ardelyx, Inc. 34175 Ardenwood Blvd., Suite 200 Fremont, California 94555 / US | [2021/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DRAGOLI, Dean c/o Ardelyx, Inc. 34175 Ardenwood Blvd Suite 200 Fremont, California 94555 / US | 02 /
LUEHR, Gary c/o Ardelyx, Inc. 34175 Ardenwood Blvd, Suite 200 Fremont, California 94555 / US | 03 /
CHEN, Tao c/o Ardelyx, Inc. 34175 Ardenwood Blvd, Suite 200 Fremont, California 94555 / US | 04 /
LEWIS, Jason c/o Ardelyx, Inc. 34175 Ardenwood Blvd, Suite 200 Fremont, California 94555 / US | 05 /
LEADBETTER, Michael c/o Ardelyx, Inc. 34175 Ardenwood Blvd, Suite 200 Fremont, California 94555 / US | [2023/14] |
Former [2021/50] | 01 /
DRAGOLI, Dean Fremont, California 94555 / US | ||
02 /
LUEHR, Gary Fremont, California 94555 / US | |||
03 /
CHEN, Tao Fremont, California 94555 / US | |||
04 /
LEWIS, Jason Fremont, California 94555 / US | |||
05 /
LEADBETTER, Michael Fremont, California 94555 / US | Representative(s) | Grund, Martin, et al Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwälte und Solicitor PartG mbB Steinsdorfstraße 2 80538 München / DE | [2023/14] |
Former [2021/50] | Grund, Martin, et al Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB Postfach 44 05 16 80754 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20709101.8 | 06.02.2020 | [2021/50] | WO2020US17077 | Priority number, date | US201962802210P | 07.02.2019 Original published format: US 201962802210 P | [2021/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020163642 | Date: | 13.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3921327 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3921327 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07J63/00, A61K31/56, A61P5/40 | [2021/50] | CPC: |
C07J63/008 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/56 (KR,US);
A61K31/58 (US);
A61P3/12 (US);
A61P5/40 (EP,KR,US);
A61P9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] | Extension states | BA | 02.09.2021 | ME | 02.09.2021 | Validation states | KH | 02.09.2021 | MA | 02.09.2021 | MD | 02.09.2021 | TN | 02.09.2021 | Title | German: | GLYCYRRHETINSÄUREDERIVATE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HYPERKALIÄMIE | [2021/50] | English: | GLYCYRRHETINIC ACID DERIVATIVES FOR USE IN TREATING HYPERKALEMIA | [2021/50] | French: | DÉRIVÉS D'ACIDE GLYCYRRHÉTINIQUE DESTINÉS À ÊTRE UTILISÉS DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE L'HYPERKALIÉMIE | [2021/50] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 02.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23164821.3 / EP4234016 | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 05.04.2023 | AT | 05.04.2023 | BG | 05.04.2023 | CZ | 05.04.2023 | DK | 05.04.2023 | EE | 05.04.2023 | FI | 05.04.2023 | HR | 05.04.2023 | LT | 05.04.2023 | LV | 05.04.2023 | MC | 05.04.2023 | NL | 05.04.2023 | PL | 05.04.2023 | RO | 05.04.2023 | RS | 05.04.2023 | SI | 05.04.2023 | SK | 05.04.2023 | SM | 05.04.2023 | GR | 06.07.2023 | IS | 05.08.2023 | PT | 07.08.2023 | [2024/51] |
Former [2024/45] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
MC | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SI | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SI | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | NL | 05.04.2023 | |
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 05.04.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2015218206 (YOON YEO-HONG [KR]); | by applicant | US4278793 | WO9426709 | CA2177007 | EP0744397 | WO9724113 | CA2241531 | US5824691 | US5866610 | US6005010 | WO0121582 | CA2387529 | WO0172742 | WO0220496 | WO0224637 | US6399824 | WO03051866 | WO03055490 | US2004039001 | US6703405 | US6736705 | US6737423 | US2004113396 | US2004224965 | US2005020612 | US2005054705 | US6887870 | US2005113396 | US6911453 | US2005244367 | US2007135383 | US2007135385 | US2007225323 | US2007270414 | US7326705 | US2008194621 | WO2010078449 | WO2014029983 | WO2014029984 | WO2016111855 |