blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3972603

EP3972603 - METHODS OF TREATING SJÖGREN'S SYNDROME USING A BRUTON'S TYROSINE KINASE INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.08.2024
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.04.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.02.2022
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  27.11.2020
Formerunknown
Status updated on  08.06.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.04.2025Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 21.05.2025 [2025/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
[2022/13]
Inventor(s)01 / BHATTACHARYA, Souvik
Novartis Institutes for BioMedical Research, Inc.
250 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US
02 / BIETH, Bruno
Novartis Pharma AG Postfach
4002 Basel / CH
03 / CABANSKI, Maciej
Novartis Pharma AG Postfach
4002 Basel / CH
04 / CENNI, Bruno
Novartis Pharma AG Postfach Novartis Institutes
for Biomed. Research
4002 Basel / CH
05 / DE BUCK, Stefan
Novartis Pharma AG Postfach
4002 Basel / CH
06 / KAUL, Martin
Novartis Pharma AG Postfach Novartis Institutes
for Biomed. Research
4002 Basel / CH
07 / KINHIKAR, Arvind
Novartis Institutes for BioMedical Research, Inc.
250 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US
08 / RADIVOJEVIC, Andrijana
Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation 1 Health
Plaza
East Hanover, New Jersey 07936 / US
09 / VITALITI GARAMI, Alessandra
Novartis Pharma AG Postfach
4002 Basel / CH
 [2022/13]
Representative(s)Thompson, Sarah Louise
Novartis Pharma AG
Patent Department
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2022/13]Thompson, Sarah Louise
Novartis Pharma AG
Postfach
4002 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date20729203.820.05.2020
[2022/13]
WO2020IB54754
Priority number, dateUS201962851994P23.05.2019         Original published format: US 201962851994 P
[2022/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2020234781
Date:26.11.2020
Language:EN
[2020/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3972603
Date:30.03.2022
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2022/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3972603
Date:04.09.2024
Language:EN
[2024/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.11.2020
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/505, A61P37/00
[2022/13]
CPC:
A61K31/505 (EP,IL,US); A61K31/513 (KR); A61P1/02 (US);
A61P37/00 (EP,KR); A61P37/06 (US); C07D239/47 (KR)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2022/13]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:METHODEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON SJÖGREN-SYNDROM MIT EINEM HEMMER VON BRUTON-KINASE[2024/16]
English:METHODS OF TREATING SJÖGREN'S SYNDROME USING A BRUTON'S TYROSINE KINASE INHIBITOR[2022/13]
French:MÉTHODES DE TRAITEMENT DU SYNDROME DE SJÖGREN UTILISANT UN INHIBITEUR DE LA KINASE DE BRUTON[2024/16]
Former [2022/13]VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON SJÖGREN-SYNDROM UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES BRUTON-TYROSIN-KINASE-INHIBITORS
Former [2022/13]MÉTHODES DE TRAITEMENT DU SYNDROME DE SJÖGREN À L'AIDE D'UN INHIBITEUR DE LA TYROSINE KINASE DE BRUTON
Entry into regional phase23.12.2021National basic fee paid 
23.12.2021Designation fee(s) paid 
23.12.2021Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.12.2021Examination requested  [2022/13]
23.12.2021Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.07.2022Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.04.2024Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.07.2024Fee for grant paid
26.07.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.07.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP24191253.4  / EP4442321
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2022Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
26.04.2024Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSM04.09.2024
[2025/21]
Cited inInternational search[YD]WO2015079417  (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al);
 [Y]WO2017106429  (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al);
 [Y]WO2017123695  (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al);
 [Y]WO2019089512  (LILLY CO ELI [US])
by applicantWO2015079417
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.