EP3799607 - A JOINTLESS CONCRETE COMPOSITE PAVEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Primeteh, AS Gustava Zemgala gatve 76 1039 Riga / LV | [2021/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CEPURITIS, Rolands Gustava Zemgala gatve 78-14 1039 Riga / LV | 02 /
OSLEJS, Janis Baznicas iela 39A-5 1010 Riga / LV | 03 /
PEASE, Bradley Justin 256 Tamarack Rd. North Vancouver, BC, V7N 1S4 / CA | 04 /
ZEGELIS, Aldis Briezu gatve 7-12 4050 Vilkene Vilkenes pag. Limbazu nov. / LV | 05 /
KAMARS, Janis 'Likteni' 2164 Adazi, Adazu nov. / LV | [2022/23] |
Former [2022/12] | 01 /
CEPURITIS, Rolands Gustava Zemgala gatve 78-14 1039 Riga / LV | ||
02 /
OSLEJS, Janis Baznicas iela 39A-5 1010 Riga / LV | |||
03 /
PEASE, Bradley Justin Damgaardsvej 20 2990 Niverod, Niva / LV | |||
04 /
ZEGELIS, Aldis Briezu gatve 7-12 4050 Vilkene Vilkenes pag. Limbazu nov. / LV | |||
05 /
KAMARS, Janis 'Likteni' 2164 Adazi, Adazu nov. / LV | |||
Former [2021/27] | 01 /
CEPURITIS, Rolands Gustava Zemgala gatve 78-14 1039 Riga / LV | ||
02 /
OSLEJS, Janis Baznicas iela 39A-5 1010 Riga / LV | |||
03 /
PEASE, Bradley Justin Damgaardsvej 20 2990 Niverod Niva / LV | |||
04 /
ZEGELIS, Aldis Briezu gatve 7-12 4050 Vilkene Vilkenes pag. Limbazu nov. / LV | |||
05 /
KAMARS, Janis 'Likteni' 2164 Adazi Adazu nov. / LV | Representative(s) | Fortuna, Jevgenijs Foral Patent Law Offices Kaleju iela 14-7 1050 Riga / LV | [N/P] |
Former [2021/14] | Fortuna, Jevgenijs Foral Patent Law Office Kaleju iela 14-7 1050 Riga / LV | Application number, filing date | 20775734.5 | 14.09.2020 | [2021/14] | WO2020LV50004 | Priority number, date | LV20190000062 | 19.11.2019 Original published format: LV 190062 | [2021/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021025548 | Date: | 11.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3799607 | Date: | 07.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3799607 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E01C11/12, E01C7/12, E01C7/14 | [2021/14] | CPC: |
E01C7/12 (EP,IL,US);
E01C7/142 (US);
C04B16/0633 (US);
C04B28/04 (US);
C04B28/065 (US);
C04B28/08 (US);
E01C11/22 (IL);
E01C7/14 (EP,IL);
E01C7/30 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STRASSENBELAG AUS FUGENLOSEM BETONVERBUND | [2021/14] | English: | A JOINTLESS CONCRETE COMPOSITE PAVEMENT | [2021/14] | French: | CHAUSSÉE COMPOSITE EN BÉTON SANS JOINT | [2021/14] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/14] | 29.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 23.03.2022 | CY | 23.03.2022 | HR | 23.03.2022 | MC | 23.03.2022 | MK | 23.03.2022 | MT | 23.03.2022 | RS | 23.03.2022 | SK | 23.03.2022 | SM | 23.03.2022 | TR | 23.03.2022 | BG | 23.06.2022 | GR | 24.06.2022 | IS | 23.07.2022 | LU | 14.09.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/29] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
CY | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
MK | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
TR | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
LU | 14.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
CY | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
MK | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
LU | 14.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
CY | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
LU | 14.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
LU | 14.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | HR | 23.03.2022 | |
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | HR | 23.03.2022 | |
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | HR | 23.03.2022 | |
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/37] | HR | 23.03.2022 | |
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 23.03.2022 | |
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]CN2730921Y (SUN XUEGAO [CN]) [A] 1-12 * page 3, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph last - page 5, paragraph last * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE102005054235 (FITR GES FUER INNOVATION IM TI [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0004] , [0012] - [0035] ** claims 1,5,10 *; | [A]JP2017133255 (TAIHEIYO CEMENT CORP, et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] - [0038] * * figures 1,2; tables 1-3 * | by applicant | CN2730921Y | DE102005054235 | JP2017133255 | - "Guide for Construction of Concrete Pavements", ACI, 325.9R-15, American Concrete Institute Committee, (20150000), vol. 325, page 62 | - "Guide for Design of Jointed Concrete Pavements for Streets and Local Roads", ACI, 325.12R-02, American Concrete Institute Committee, (20020000), vol. 325, page 32 | - "Guide for the Design and Construction of Concrete Parking Lots", ACI, 330R-08, American Concrete Institute Committee, (20080000), vol. 330, page 36 | - "Report on Pervious Concrete", ACI, 522R-10, American Concrete Institute Committee, (20100000), vol. 522, page 40 | - "Guide to Roller-Compacted Concrete Pavements", ACI, 327R-14, American Concrete Institute Committee, (20150000), vol. 327, page 51 | - NATIONAL CONCRETE PAVEMENT TECHNOLOGY CENTER, Guide to Concrete Overlay Solutions, (20070000), page 29 | - THE CONCRETE SOCIETY, Technical Report 34 - Concrete Industrial Ground Floors - A Guide to Design and Construction, (20160000), page 104 |