EP3878495 - WEGWERFBARER, MEHRFACH VERWENDBARER INJEKTIONSSTIFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2025 | New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton, Dickinson and Company 1 Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1880 / US | [2021/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRONENBERG, Richard 108 Kohout Drive Mahwah, NJ 07430 / US | 02 /
QUINN, Michael 42 Tiffany Drive East Hanover, NJ 07936 / US | [2021/37] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2021/37] | Application number, filing date | 21167306.6 | 15.03.2012 | [2021/37] | Priority number, date | US201161457391P | 16.03.2011 Original published format: US 201161457391 P | [2021/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3878495 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3878495 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/315, A61M5/20, A61M5/24 | [2021/37] | CPC: |
A61M5/31541 (EP,CN,RU,US);
A61M5/178 (CN);
A61M3/00 (RU);
A61M5/31501 (CN);
A61M5/31511 (CN);
A61M5/31525 (CN);
A61M5/31528 (EP,US);
A61M5/31533 (RU);
A61M5/31535 (EP,US);
A61M5/31548 (CN);
A61M5/31551 (EP,RU,US);
A61M5/31566 (CN);
A61M5/31575 (EP,US);
A61M5/31576 (CN);
A61M5/31585 (EP,RU,US);
A61M2005/2407 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3126 (CN);
A61M2005/3152 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] |
Former [2021/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | WEGWERFBARER, MEHRFACH VERWENDBARER INJEKTIONSSTIFT | [2021/37] | English: | MULTIPLE USE DISPOSABLE INJECTION PEN | [2021/37] | French: | STYLO D'INJECTION JETABLE À USAGE MULTIPLE | [2021/37] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 15.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12757996.9 / EP2686041 | EP17210309.5 / EP3323449 | EP19173304.7 / EP3542843 | Divisional application(s) | EP24181357.5 / EP4410330 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.03.2025
13.03.2025
ADMISSIBLE Inspicos P/S Agern Allé 24 2970 Hørsholm / DK Opponent's representative Inspicos P/S Agern Allé 24 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [2025/16] | 24.03.2025 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 12.06.2024 | EE | 12.06.2024 | HR | 12.06.2024 | LV | 12.06.2024 | RO | 12.06.2024 | SK | 12.06.2024 | SM | 12.06.2024 | RS | 12.09.2024 | GR | 13.09.2024 | IS | 12.10.2024 | PT | 14.10.2024 | [2025/10] |
Former [2025/09] | BG | 12.06.2024 | |
EE | 12.06.2024 | ||
HR | 12.06.2024 | ||
LV | 12.06.2024 | ||
RS | 12.09.2024 | ||
GR | 13.09.2024 | ||
IS | 12.10.2024 | ||
PT | 14.10.2024 | ||
Former [2025/03] | BG | 12.06.2024 | |
HR | 12.06.2024 | ||
LV | 12.06.2024 | ||
RS | 12.09.2024 | ||
GR | 13.09.2024 | ||
PT | 14.10.2024 | ||
Former [2024/49] | BG | 12.06.2024 | |
HR | 12.06.2024 | ||
LV | 12.06.2024 | ||
RS | 12.09.2024 | ||
GR | 13.09.2024 | ||
Former [2024/47] | BG | 12.06.2024 | |
HR | 12.06.2024 | ||
GR | 13.09.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0110484 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US], et al); | [Y]US2005113765 (VEASEY ROBERT F [GB], et al); | [Y]US2007244436 (SAIKI MASARU [JP]); | [Y]US2008027397 (DERUNTZ OTTO D [US], et al); | [Y]US2008195057 (GRAF RONEY [CH], et al) | Examination | WO2013116951 | Opposition | US2005177116 | US2007016143 | WO2011068531 | WO2012017036 |