blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3943485

EP3943485 - ARYL- OR HETEROARYL-SUBSTITUTED BENZENE COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.11.2024
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.11.2023
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.04.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.09.2022
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.07.2022
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  24.12.2021
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 25.12.2024  [2024/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Epizyme, Inc.
400 Technology Square, 4th Floor
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
[2022/04]
Inventor(s)01 / CHESWORTH, Richard
Concord, 01742 / US
02 / DUNCAN, Kenneth William
Westwood, 02090 / US
03 / KEILHACK, Heike
Belmont, 02478 / US
04 / WARHOLIC, Natalie
Auburndale, 02466 / US
05 / KLAUS, Christine
Weymouth, 02191 / US
06 / SEKI, Masashi
Tsukubashi, 300-2635 / JP
07 / SHIROTORI, Syuji
Tsukubashi, 300-2635 / JP
08 / KAWANO, Satoshi
Tsukubashi, 300-2635 / JP
09 / WIGLE, Timothy James Nelson
Waltham, 02451 / US
10 / KNUTSON, Sarah Kathleen
Cambridge, 02138 / US
11 / KUNTZ, Kevin Wayne
Woburn, 01801 / US
 [2022/04]
Representative(s)Russell, Tim, et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[2022/04]
Application number, filing date21175920.413.04.2012
[2022/04]
Priority number, dateUS201161474821P13.04.2011         Original published format: US 201161474821 P
US201161499595P21.06.2011         Original published format: US 201161499595 P
[2022/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3943485
Date:26.01.2022
Language:EN
[2022/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3943485
Date:27.12.2023
Language:EN
[2023/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.10.2021
ClassificationIPC:C07D213/64, C07D401/12, C07D405/12, C07D409/12, C07D413/12, C07D417/12, C07D491/08, C07D491/107, A61K31/4412, A61K31/444, A61P35/00
[2022/04]
CPC:
A61K31/5377 (EP,IL,US); C07D213/64 (CN,IL,KR,RU,US); C07D405/14 (CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/4412 (EP,KR,RU,US); A61K31/443 (EP,US); A61K31/4433 (EP,US);
A61K31/4436 (EP,US); A61K31/4439 (EP,US); A61K31/444 (EP,RU,US);
A61K31/4545 (EP,US); A61K31/4709 (EP,US); A61K31/496 (EP,US);
A61K31/506 (EP,US); A61K31/551 (EP,US); A61K31/553 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR); A61P35/02 (EP); A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D213/81 (CN); C07D401/12 (CN,IL,KR,RU,US); C07D401/14 (CN,KR);
C07D405/12 (CN,IL,KR,RU,US); C07D409/12 (CN,IL,KR,RU,US); C07D413/12 (CN,IL,RU,US);
C07D413/14 (KR); C07D417/12 (CN,IL,KR,RU,US); C07D491/08 (CN,IL,RU,US);
C07D491/107 (CN,IL,KR,US); C07D498/08 (IL,KR,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2022/35]
Former [2022/04]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:ARYL- ODER HETEROARYLSUBSTITUIERTE BENZOLVERBINDUNGEN[2022/04]
English:ARYL- OR HETEROARYL-SUBSTITUTED BENZENE COMPOUNDS[2022/04]
French:COMPOSÉS DE BENZÈNE HÉTÉROARYL- OU ARYL- SUBSTITUÉS[2022/04]
Examination procedure25.07.2022Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.07.2022Examination requested  [2022/35]
25.07.2022Date on which the examining division has become responsible
04.10.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.02.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.04.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.09.2023Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
17.11.2023Fee for grant paid
17.11.2023Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.11.2023Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12719529.5  / EP2697199
EP16172386.1  / EP3150580
EP18200713.8  / EP3486234
Divisional application(s)EP23217912.7  / EP4360712
Opposition(s)30.09.2024No opposition filed within time limit [2024/49]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
17.11.2023Request for further processing filed
17.11.2023Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
27.11.2023Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.05.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
26.05.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
26.05.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
26.05.2021Renewal fee patent year 06
26.05.2021Renewal fee patent year 07
26.05.2021Renewal fee patent year 08
26.05.2021Renewal fee patent year 09
26.05.2021Renewal fee patent year 10
27.04.2022Renewal fee patent year 11
27.04.2023Renewal fee patent year 12
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHR27.12.2023
MC27.12.2023
RS27.12.2023
SM27.12.2023
[2024/52]
Former [2024/33]HR27.12.2023
RS27.12.2023
SM27.12.2023
Former [2024/27]HR27.12.2023
RS27.12.2023
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2009006577  (UNIV MICHIGAN [US], et al);
 [YPA]WO2011140325  (GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC [US], et al);
 [YPA]WO2011140324  (GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC [US], et al)
by applicantUS4522811
 US5763263
 US7563589
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.