blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3929196

EP3929196 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION OF A NITROGEN-CONTAINING COMPOUND OR SALT THEREOF, OR METAL COMPLEX THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2021/52]NOVEL NITROGEN-CONTAINING COMPOUND OR SALT THEREOF, OR METAL COMPLEX THEREOF
[2022/26]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.06.2024
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.07.2023
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.03.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.02.2023
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.12.2022
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.11.2022
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.07.2022
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.11.2021
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2024No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 31.07.2024  [2024/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJIFILM Corporation
26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 106-8620 / JP
For all designated states
PDRadiopharma Inc.
14-1, Kyobashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-0031 / JP
[2022/29]
Former [2021/52]For all designated states
FUJIFILM Corporation
26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 106-8620 / JP
For all designated states
FUJIFILM Toyama Chemical Co., Ltd.
14-1, Kyobashi 2-Chome
Chuo-Ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Fukunaga, Hirofumi
Kanagawa, 258-8577 / JP
02 / Dozono, Hiroyuki
Chiba, 289-1592 / JP
03 / Hino, Akihiro
Chiba, 289-1592 / JP
04 / Oshikiri, Shinobu
Chiba, 289-1592 / JP
05 / Nagano, Akio
Chiba, 289-1592 / JP
 [2022/07]
Former [2021/52]01 / Fukunaga, Hirofumi
Kanagawa, 258-8577 / JP
02 / Dozono, Hiroyuki
Chiba, 289-1592 / JP
03 / Hino, Akihiro
Chiba, 289-1595 / JP
04 / Oshikiri, Shinobu
Chiba, 289-1592 / JP
05 / Nagano, Akio
Chiba, 289-1592 / JP
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2021/52]
Application number, filing date21187649.524.09.2014
[2021/52]
Priority number, dateJP2013019671224.09.2013         Original published format: JP 2013196712
[2021/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3929196
Date:29.12.2021
Language:EN
[2021/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3929196
Date:23.08.2023
Language:EN
[2023/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.08.2021
ClassificationIPC:C07D471/04, C07D401/12, C07D401/14, C07D519/00, C07K5/062, A61K31/555, A61K51/04, A61P35/00, A61P9/00, C07D213/73, C07D213/75
[2021/52]
CPC:
C07D401/12 (EP,US); A61K51/088 (US); A61K51/0455 (EP,US);
A61K51/0478 (EP,US); A61K51/0482 (EP,US); A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP); C07D213/73 (EP,US); C07D213/75 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US); C07D471/04 (EP,US); C07D519/00 (EP,US);
C07K5/08 (US); C07K5/10 (US); C07K5/0606 (EP,US);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/52]
TitleGerman:PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG VON STICKSTOFFHALTIGE VERBINDUNG ODER SALZ DAVON ODER METALLKOMPLEX DAVON[2022/26]
English:PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION OF A NITROGEN-CONTAINING COMPOUND OR SALT THEREOF, OR METAL COMPLEX THEREOF[2022/26]
French:COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE D'UN COMPOSÉ CONTENANT DE L'AZOTE OU SON SEL OU SON COMPLEXE MÉTALLIQUE[2022/26]
Former [2021/52]NEUARTIGE STICKSTOFFHALTIGE VERBINDUNG ODER SALZ DAVON ODER METALLKOMPLEX DAVON
Former [2021/52]NOVEL NITROGEN-CONTAINING COMPOUND OR SALT THEREOF, OR METAL COMPLEX THEREOF
Former [2021/52]NOUVEAU COMPOSÉ CONTENANT DE L'AZOTE OU SON SEL OU SON COMPLEXE MÉTALLIQUE
Examination procedure26.07.2021Examination requested  [2021/52]
19.05.2022Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.07.2022Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.11.2022Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
15.12.2022Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.02.2023Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
07.03.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.07.2023Fee for grant paid
14.07.2023Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.07.2023Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP14849898.3  / EP3050878
Divisional application(s)EP23188351.3  / EP4249471
Opposition(s)24.05.2024No opposition filed within time limit [2024/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
26.07.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
26.07.2021Renewal fee patent year 06
26.07.2021Renewal fee patent year 07
26.07.2021Renewal fee patent year 08
19.09.2022Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipMC23.08.2023
SM23.08.2023
[2024/28]
Former [2024/20]SM23.08.2023
Documents cited:Search[A]WO0035488  (DU PONT PHARM CO [US]);
 [A]WO0198294  (DU PONT PHARM CO [US]);
 [A]US2005154185  (RAJOPADHYE MILIND [US], et al)
by applicantUS6001961
 US6130231
 US2001053853
 JP2002532440
 US2002169200
 WO2011149250
 WO2013048996
 JP5388355B
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.