blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4008359

EP4008359 - PSMA LIGANDS FOR IMAGING AND ENDORADIOTHERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.08.2024
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.04.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.03.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.11.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.12.2022
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  06.05.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2024Change - divisional application(s)published on 16.10.2024  [2024/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Technische Universität München
Arcisstr. 21
80333 München / DE
[2022/23]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHMIDT, Alexander
81825 München / DE
02 / WESTER, Hand-Jürgen
85301 Schweitenkirchen / DE
03 / PARZINGER, Mara Katharina
80637 München / DE
 [2024/37]
Former [2022/23]01 / SCHMIDT, Alexander
85748 Garching bei München / DE
02 / WESTER, Hand-Jürgen
85301 Schweitenkirchen / DE
03 / PARZINGER, Mara Katharina
80637 München / DE
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstraße 3
81675 München / DE
[2022/23]
Application number, filing date21218180.411.12.2018
[2022/23]
Priority number, dateEP2017020651011.12.2017         Original published format: EP 17206510
[2022/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4008359
Date:08.06.2022
Language:EN
[2022/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP4008359
Date:11.09.2024
Language:EN
[2024/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.04.2022
ClassificationIPC:A61K51/04
[2022/23]
CPC:
A61K51/0497 (EP,IL); A61K51/0482 (CN,IL,KR,US); C07D257/02 (CN,IL,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US); A61K2121/00 (IL,KR,US); A61K2123/00 (IL,KR,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/02]
Former [2022/23]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:PSMA-LIGANDEN ZUR BILDGEBUNG UND ENDORADIOTHERAPIE[2022/23]
English:PSMA LIGANDS FOR IMAGING AND ENDORADIOTHERAPY[2022/23]
French:LIGANDS PSMA POUR IMAGERIE ET ENDORADIOTHÉRAPIE[2022/23]
Examination procedure07.12.2022Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.12.2022Examination requested  [2023/02]
07.12.2022Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.11.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.03.2024Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
18.03.2024Fee for grant paid
18.03.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.04.2024Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.08.2024Fee for grant paid
07.08.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.08.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP18812215.4  / EP3723815
Divisional application(s)EP24198677.7
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.2022Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.2022Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2022Renewal fee patent year 05
21.12.2023Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2017165473  (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US]);
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.