EP2152088 - HYDROLYZED, SPRAY DRIED, AGGLOMERATED GRAIN POWDER AND DRINKABLE FOOD PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2019 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.02.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Quaker Oats Company 555 West Monroe Street Chicago, IL 60661 / US | [2010/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHUNG, Yongsoo 125 N. Wilson Court Palatine, IL 60067 / US | 02 /
SMITH, John, J. 1475 Teal Court Hoffman Estates, IL 60192 / US | [2010/07] | Representative(s) | Duxbury, Stephen, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bavariaring 17 80336 München / DE | [2018/09] |
Former [2010/07] | Duxbury, Stephen, et al Arnold & Siedsma Pettenkoferstrasse 37 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08745845.1 | 15.04.2008 | [2010/07] | WO2008US60323 | Priority number, date | US20070912965P | 20.04.2007 Original published format: US 912965 P | US20080056598 | 27.03.2008 Original published format: US 56598 | [2010/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008130914 | Date: | 30.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2152088 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2152088 | Date: | 28.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A23C9/154, A23L2/02, A23L2/52, A23L19/00, A23L2/39, A23L7/10 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
A23L2/395 (EP,US);
A23C9/1544 (EP,US);
A23L19/01 (EP,US);
A23L2/02 (EP,US);
A23L7/198 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/07] | A23C9/154, A23L2/02, A23L2/52 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/09] |
Former [2010/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HYDROLYSIERTES, SPRÜHGETROCKNETES UND AGGLOMERIERTES GETREIDEKORNPULVER UND TRINKBARE NAHRUNGSMITTELPRODUKTE DARAUS | [2010/07] | English: | HYDROLYZED, SPRAY DRIED, AGGLOMERATED GRAIN POWDER AND DRINKABLE FOOD PRODUCTS | [2010/07] | French: | POUDRE HYDROLYSÉE, SÉCHÉE PAR PULVÉRISATION ET AGGLOMÉRÉE, ET PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES À BOIRE | [2010/07] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2009 | Examination requested [2010/07] | 14.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.12.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.01.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 22.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17206986.6 / EP3320782 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.04.2008 | AT | 28.02.2018 | CY | 28.02.2018 | CZ | 28.02.2018 | EE | 28.02.2018 | FI | 28.02.2018 | HR | 28.02.2018 | LT | 28.02.2018 | LV | 28.02.2018 | MC | 28.02.2018 | PT | 28.02.2018 | RO | 28.02.2018 | SI | 28.02.2018 | SK | 28.02.2018 | LU | 15.04.2018 | MT | 15.04.2018 | CH | 30.04.2018 | LI | 30.04.2018 | BG | 28.05.2018 | NO | 28.05.2018 | GR | 29.05.2018 | IS | 28.06.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 15.04.2008 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
PT | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
LU | 15.04.2018 | ||
MT | 15.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
LU | 15.04.2018 | ||
MT | 15.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
LU | 15.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
LU | 15.04.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2620906 (NABISCO BRANDS INC [US]) [A] 1-19* the whole document *; | [X]EP0634106 (QUAKER OATS CO [US]) [X] 1,2,5-12,15-19 * examples 1-8; claims 1,5,18 *; | [PX]EP1782699 (QUAKER OATS CO [US]) [PX] 1,2,5-12,15-19 * examples 1-4; claims 1-24 * |