EP2172686 - CAMERA SUPPORT HEAD FOR A MOTION PICTURE CAMERA FOR CINEMATOGRAPHIC, TELEVISION AND LIKE SHOOTINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2013 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cartoni S.p.A. Via di Portonaccio, 33/B 00159 Roma / IT | [2010/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cartoni, Guido Cartoni S.p.A. Via di Portonaccio, 33/B 00159 Roma / IT | 02 /
Macchia, Domenico Cartoni S.p.A. Via di Portonaccio, 33/B 00159 Roma / IT | [2012/39] |
Former [2010/14] | 01 /
Cartoni, Guido Cartoni S.p.A. Via di Portonaccio, 33/B 00159 Roma / IT | ||
02 /
Macchia, Domenico Cartoni S.p.A. Via di Portonaccio, 33/B 00159 Roma / IT | Representative(s) | Iannone, Carlo Luigi, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 00187 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/14] | Iannone, Carlo Luigi, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 00187 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 09425384.6 | 30.09.2009 | [2010/14] | Priority number, date | IT2008RM00526 | 03.10.2008 Original published format: IT RM20080526 | [2010/14] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2172686 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2172686 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16M11/12, G03B17/56 | [2010/14] | CPC: |
G03B17/561 (EP,US);
F16M11/10 (EP,US);
F16M11/2014 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/14] | Title | German: | STATIVKOPF FÜR EINE FILMKAMERA FÜR KINO-, FERNSEH- UND ÄHNLICHE AUFNAHMEN | [2012/16] | English: | CAMERA SUPPORT HEAD FOR A MOTION PICTURE CAMERA FOR CINEMATOGRAPHIC, TELEVISION AND LIKE SHOOTINGS | [2010/14] | French: | TÊTE DE SUPPORT POUR TELECAMERA POUR REPRISES CINEMATOGRAPHIQUES, TELEVISIVES ET SIMILAIRES | [2010/14] |
Former [2010/14] | STATIFKOPF FÜR EINE FILMKAMERA FÜR KINO-, FERNSEH- UND ÄHNLICHE AUFNAHMEN | Examination procedure | 30.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/45] | 25.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.09.2009 | AT | 26.09.2012 | BE | 26.09.2012 | CY | 26.09.2012 | CZ | 26.09.2012 | DK | 26.09.2012 | EE | 26.09.2012 | FI | 26.09.2012 | HR | 26.09.2012 | LT | 26.09.2012 | LV | 26.09.2012 | MK | 26.09.2012 | MT | 26.09.2012 | NL | 26.09.2012 | PL | 26.09.2012 | RO | 26.09.2012 | SE | 26.09.2012 | SI | 26.09.2012 | SK | 26.09.2012 | SM | 26.09.2012 | TR | 26.09.2012 | IE | 30.09.2012 | LU | 30.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | FR | 26.11.2012 | BG | 26.12.2012 | NO | 26.12.2012 | GR | 27.12.2012 | ES | 06.01.2013 | IS | 26.01.2013 | PT | 28.01.2013 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 30.09.2009 | |
AT | 26.09.2012 | ||
BE | 26.09.2012 | ||
CY | 26.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
MT | 26.09.2012 | ||
NL | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
SM | 26.09.2012 | ||
TR | 26.09.2012 | ||
IE | 30.09.2012 | ||
LU | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 26.11.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 26.09.2012 | |
BE | 26.09.2012 | ||
CY | 26.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
MT | 26.09.2012 | ||
NL | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
SM | 26.09.2012 | ||
TR | 26.09.2012 | ||
IE | 30.09.2012 | ||
LU | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 26.11.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 26.09.2012 | |
BE | 26.09.2012 | ||
CY | 26.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
MT | 26.09.2012 | ||
NL | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
TR | 26.09.2012 | ||
IE | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 26.11.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 26.09.2012 | |
BE | 26.09.2012 | ||
CY | 26.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
MT | 26.09.2012 | ||
NL | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
IE | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 26.11.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 26.09.2012 | |
BE | 26.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
MT | 26.09.2012 | ||
NL | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
IE | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 26.11.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 26.09.2012 | |
BE | 26.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
NL | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
IE | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 26.11.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 26.09.2012 | |
BE | 26.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
NL | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
IE | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 26.09.2012 | |
BE | 26.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
NL | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
IE | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 26.09.2012 | |
BE | 26.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
NL | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 26.09.2012 | |
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
NL | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | BE | 26.09.2012 | |
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
NL | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | BE | 26.09.2012 | |
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
NL | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | BE | 26.09.2012 | |
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | FI | 26.09.2012 | |
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | FI | 26.09.2012 | |
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | FI | 26.09.2012 | |
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 26.09.2012 | |
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 26.09.2012 | |
NO | 26.12.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4249817 (BLAU ROBERT E [US]) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]DE4238900 (HARTIG E VIDEOR TECH [DE]) [A] 1-7* L-shaped camera support head; column 3, line 68 - column 6, line 5; figures 1-4 *; | [A]GB2291468 (MANFROTTO LINO & C SPA [IT]) [A] 1-7 * L-shaped camera support head; page 3, line 5 - page 8, line 29; figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE202005001542U (MOELLER THOMAS [DE]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE202005006620U (FRIEDRICH FRANK [DE]) [A] 1-7 * L-shaped camera support head; paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0068]; figures 1-22 *; | [A]US2006177215 (JOHNSON JOSEPH [US]) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0030] - [0032]; figures 7-11 *; | [X]US2007164176 (LIAO CHIN-HUI [TW]) [X] 1-7 * L-shaped camera support head; paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0035]; figures 1-10 *; | [X]GB2447258 (GEOSPATIAL RES LTD [GB]) [X] 1-7 * L-shaped camera support head; page 4, line 24 - page 16, line 15; figures 1-9 * |