EP2289220 - Network helper for authentication between a token and verifiers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/09] | NETWORK HELPER FOR AUTHENTICATION BETWEEN A TOKEN AND VERIFIERS | ||
[2011/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2011/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSE, Gregory, Gordon 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 02 /
GANTMAN, Alexander 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 03 /
WIGGERS DE VRIES, Miriam 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 04 /
PADDON, Michael 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 05 /
HAWKES, Philip, Michael 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / AU | [2011/09] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/03] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/09] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09743607.5 | 06.05.2009 | [2011/09] | WO2009US43040 | Priority number, date | US20080118593 | 09.05.2008 Original published format: US 118593 | [2011/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009137621 | Date: | 12.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2289220 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2289220 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2011/09] | CPC: |
H04L63/0435 (EP,US);
H04L9/14 (KR);
H04L63/0853 (EP,US);
H04L9/0662 (KR);
H04L9/0869 (EP);
H04L9/0897 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/09] | Title | German: | Netzwerkhilfseinrichtung zur Authentifikation zwischen einem Token und Verifizierern | [2011/26] | English: | Network helper for authentication between a token and verifiers | [2011/26] | French: | Auxiliaire de réseau pour authentification entre un jeton et des vérificateurs | [2011/26] |
Former [2011/09] | NETZWERKHILFSEINRICHTUNG ZUR AUTHENTIFIKATION ZWISCHEN EINEM TOKEN UND VERIFIZIERERN | ||
Former [2011/09] | NETWORK HELPER FOR AUTHENTICATION BETWEEN A TOKEN AND VERIFIERS | ||
Former [2011/09] | AUXILIAIRE DE RÉSEAU POUR AUTHENTIFICATION ENTRE UN JETON ET DES VÉRIFICATEURS | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/09] | 07.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.05.2009 | AT | 18.01.2012 | BE | 18.01.2012 | CY | 18.01.2012 | CZ | 18.01.2012 | DK | 18.01.2012 | EE | 18.01.2012 | FI | 18.01.2012 | HR | 18.01.2012 | IT | 18.01.2012 | LT | 18.01.2012 | LV | 18.01.2012 | MK | 18.01.2012 | MT | 18.01.2012 | NL | 18.01.2012 | PL | 18.01.2012 | RO | 18.01.2012 | SE | 18.01.2012 | SI | 18.01.2012 | SK | 18.01.2012 | TR | 18.01.2012 | BG | 18.04.2012 | NO | 18.04.2012 | GR | 19.04.2012 | ES | 29.04.2012 | IE | 06.05.2012 | LU | 06.05.2012 | IS | 18.05.2012 | PT | 18.05.2012 | FR | 31.05.2012 | MC | 31.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
MK | 18.01.2012 | ||
MT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
TR | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
ES | 29.04.2012 | ||
IE | 06.05.2012 | ||
LU | 06.05.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
MK | 18.01.2012 | ||
MT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
TR | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
ES | 29.04.2012 | ||
IE | 06.05.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
MK | 18.01.2012 | ||
MT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
ES | 29.04.2012 | ||
IE | 06.05.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
MK | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
ES | 29.04.2012 | ||
IE | 06.05.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
MK | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
ES | 29.04.2012 | ||
IE | 06.05.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
MK | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IE | 06.05.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
MK | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/03] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2382281 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB]) [A] 1-57 * page 25, line 13 - line 17 ** page 31, line 13 - page 33, line 33 *; | [A]US2003217269 (GANTMAN ALEXANDER [US], et al) [A] 1-57 * column A * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020] *; | [A] - BRENT WATERS, ARI JUELS, J. ALEX HALDERMAN, AND EDWARD W. FELTEN, "New Client Puzzle Outsourcing Techniques for DoS Resistance", CCS'04, Washington, DC, USA, (20041029), pages 1 - 11, XP002538930 [A] 1-57 * abstract * * paragraph [01.2] * * paragraph [02.1] * | [A] - ARI JUELS AND JOHN BRAINARD, "Client Puzzles: A Cryptographic Countermeasure Against Connection Depletion Attacks", PROCEEDINGS OF NDSS. NETWORKS AND DISTRIBUTED SECURITY SYSTEMS, XX, XX, (19990203), pages 151 - 165, XP002340691 [A] 1-57 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0003] * |