EP2303357 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PROCESSING A TIME-DEPENDENT MEASUREMENT SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2016 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gambro Lundia AB P.O. Box 10101 220 10 Lund / SE | [2011/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOLEM, Kristian Lantmannagatan 3 S-244 31 KÄVLINGE / SE | 02 /
OLDE, Bo Läsvägen 20 S-223 67 Lund / SE | [2011/18] |
Former [2011/14] | 01 /
SOLEM, Kristian Klaragatan 7 S-214 34 Malmö / SE | ||
02 /
OLDE, Bo Läsvägen 20 S-223 67 Lund / SE | Application number, filing date | 09769024.2 | 26.06.2009 | [2011/14] | WO2009EP04641 | Priority number, date | SE20080001517 | 26.06.2008 Original published format: SE 0801517 | US20080075774P | 26.06.2008 Original published format: US 75774 P | [2011/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009156175 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/53] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2303357 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2303357 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01M3/28, G01L27/00, G01N33/49, A61M1/36 | [2015/31] | CPC: |
A61M1/3653 (EP,CN,US);
A61M1/3413 (KR);
A61M1/3444 (KR);
A61M1/3448 (KR);
A61M1/3601 (KR);
A61M1/3656 (EP,KR,US);
A61M1/3659 (EP,US);
A61M1/3661 (EP,KR,US);
A61M1/38 (KR);
G01L27/002 (KR,US);
G01M3/2815 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G01M3/2846 (KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/14] | A61M1/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/44] |
Former [2011/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUFBEREITUNG EINES ZEITABHÄNGIGEN MESSSIGNALS | [2011/14] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PROCESSING A TIME-DEPENDENT MEASUREMENT SIGNAL | [2011/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR TRAITER UN SIGNAL DE MESURE DÉPENDANT DU TEMPS | [2011/14] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/14] | 04.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 29.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.06.2009 | AT | 28.10.2015 | BE | 28.10.2015 | BG | 28.10.2015 | CY | 28.10.2015 | CZ | 28.10.2015 | DK | 28.10.2015 | EE | 28.10.2015 | FI | 28.10.2015 | HR | 28.10.2015 | LT | 28.10.2015 | LV | 28.10.2015 | MC | 28.10.2015 | MK | 28.10.2015 | NL | 28.10.2015 | RO | 28.10.2015 | SE | 28.10.2015 | SI | 28.10.2015 | SK | 28.10.2015 | NO | 28.01.2016 | GR | 29.01.2016 | IS | 28.02.2016 | PT | 29.02.2016 | IE | 26.06.2016 | LU | 26.06.2016 | CH | 30.06.2016 | LI | 30.06.2016 | MT | 30.06.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 26.06.2009 | |
AT | 28.10.2015 | ||
BE | 28.10.2015 | ||
CY | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
MK | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
IE | 26.06.2016 | ||
LU | 26.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 26.06.2009 | |
AT | 28.10.2015 | ||
BE | 28.10.2015 | ||
CY | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
MK | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
IE | 26.06.2016 | ||
LU | 26.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 26.06.2009 | |
AT | 28.10.2015 | ||
BE | 28.10.2015 | ||
CY | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
MK | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
IE | 26.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/24] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
BE | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
IE | 26.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
BE | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
BE | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 28.10.2015 | |
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | LT | 28.10.2015 | |
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 28.10.2015 | |
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 28.10.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9710013 (GAMBRO AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-12,14,15,20-32 * page 4, line 22 - page 5, line 30 * * page 6, line 29 - page 13, line 22 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]WO9820918 (COBE LAB [US]) [X] 1,4,5,7,8,20-32 * page 6, line 5 - line 31 * * page 9, line 14 - page 18, line 10 * * figures 1,4,5 *; | [DA]US2005010118 (TOYODA MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [DA] 1,25-32 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0078] ** figures 1-3b * |