blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4219508

EP4219508 - SUBSTITUTED POLYCYCLIC PYRIDONE DERIVATIVE AND PRODRUG THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.04.2025
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.03.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.09.2023
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  30.06.2023
Most recent event   Tooltip11.04.2025No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.05.2025 [2025/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shionogi & Co., Ltd
1-8, Doshomachi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP
[2023/31]
Inventor(s)01 / KAWAI, Makoto
Toyonaka-shi, 561-0825 / JP
02 / TOMITA, Kenji
Osaka-shi, 541-0045 / JP
03 / AKIYAMA, Toshiyuki
Toyonaka-shi, 561-0825 / JP
04 / OKANO, Azusa
Toyonaka-shi, 561-0825 / JP
05 / MIYAGAWA, Masayoshi
Toyonaka-shi, 561-0825 / JP
 [2024/22]
Former [2023/31]01 / KAWAI, Makoto
Toyonaka-shi, 561-0825 / JP
02 / TOMITA, Kenji
Osaka-shi, 541-0045 / JP
03 / AKIYAMA, Toshiyuki
Toyonaka-sh, 561-0825 / JP
04 / OKANO, Azusa
Toyonaka-sh, 561-0825 / JP
05 / MIYAGAWA, Masayoshi
Toyonaka-shi, 561-0825 / JP
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
Aurora Building
Counterslip
Bristol BS1 6BX / GB
[2023/31]
Application number, filing date23150186.727.04.2016
[2023/31]
Priority number, dateJP2015009090928.04.2015         Original published format: JP 2015090909
JP2015023684403.12.2015         Original published format: JP 2015236844
[2023/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4219508
Date:02.08.2023
Language:EN
[2023/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP4219508
Date:05.06.2024
Language:EN
[2024/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.06.2023
ClassificationIPC:C07D498/14, A61P31/16, A61K31/5383
[2023/31]
CPC:
C07D498/14 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US); A61K31/53 (RU,US); A61K31/5383 (KR,RU,US);
A61K31/542 (KR,RU,US); A61K31/553 (KR,US); A61K31/675 (RU,US);
A61K47/06 (EP); A61K47/26 (EP); A61K9/0014 (EP);
A61K9/0019 (EP); A61K9/0056 (EP); A61K9/0075 (EP);
A61K9/0095 (EP); A61K9/06 (EP); A61K9/1623 (EP);
A61K9/2018 (EP); A61K9/2054 (EP); A61K9/4858 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP); A61P31/16 (EP,CN,RU,US); C07D471/14 (CN,KR,RU,US);
C07D471/20 (CN,KR,RU,US); C07D491/22 (CN,KR,RU,US); C07D513/14 (CN,KR,RU,US);
C07D519/00 (CN,RU,US); C07F7/18 (RU); C07F7/1804 (EP,US);
C07F9/6561 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US); A61K9/1611 (EP); A61K9/485 (EP);
A61K9/7038 (EP); C07C2601/08 (US); C07C2601/16 (US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/43]
Former [2023/31]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:SUBSTITUIERTES POLYCYCLISCHES PYRIDONDERIVAT UND PRODRUG DAVON[2023/31]
English:SUBSTITUTED POLYCYCLIC PYRIDONE DERIVATIVE AND PRODRUG THEREOF[2023/31]
French:DÉRIVÉ DE PYRIDONE POLYCYCLIQUE SUBSTITUÉ ET PROMÉDICAMENT DE CELUI-CI[2023/31]
Examination procedure21.09.2023Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.09.2023Examination requested  [2023/43]
21.09.2023Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.03.2024Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.04.2024Fee for grant paid
25.04.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.04.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP16786500.5  / EP3290424
Divisional application(s)EP24172424.4  / EP4424314
Opposition(s)06.03.2025No opposition filed within time limit [2025/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.01.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
03.01.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
03.01.2023Renewal fee patent year 05
03.01.2023Renewal fee patent year 06
03.01.2023Renewal fee patent year 07
03.01.2023Renewal fee patent year 08
15.04.2024Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipEE05.06.2024
LV05.06.2024
SM05.06.2024
IS05.10.2024
[2025/11]
Former [2025/09]EE05.06.2024
LV05.06.2024
IS05.10.2024
Former [2024/50]LV05.06.2024
Documents cited:Search[ID]WO2010147068  (SHIONOGI & CO [JP], et al);
 [ID]WO2012039414  (SHIONOGI & CO [JP], et al);
 [E]WO2017104691  (SHIONOGI & CO [JP])
by applicantGB2280435
 US5475109
 WO2005016927
 WO2006066414
 WO2007049675
 WO2010147068
 WO2012039414
 US2013090300
 WO2013057251
 WO2013174930
 WO2014023691
 WO2014043252
 WO2014074926
 WO2014108406
 WO2014108407
 WO2014108408
 WO2015038655
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.