EP2337518 - TOOTH IMPLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.2014 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mehrhof Implant Technologies GmbH Reuchlinstrasse 10-11 10553 Berlin / DE | [2011/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEHRHOF, Jürgen Schlickweg 7 14129 Berlin / DE | [2011/26] | Representative(s) | Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB (Muc) Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/12] | Müller Schupfner & Partner Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/26] | Bauer, Clemens, et al Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09799308.3 | 11.12.2009 | [2011/26] | WO2009EP66899 | Priority number, date | DE20081054588 | 12.12.2008 Original published format: DE102008054588 | DE20091002947 | 08.05.2009 Original published format: DE102009002947 | [2011/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010066871 | Date: | 17.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2337518 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2337518 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61C8/00 | [2011/26] | CPC: |
A61C8/0086 (EP,US);
A61C8/005 (EP,US);
A61C8/0059 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZAHNIMPLANTAT | [2011/26] | English: | TOOTH IMPLANT | [2011/26] | French: | IMPLANT DENTAIRE | [2011/26] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/26] | 07.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.03.2013 | DK | 27.03.2013 | EE | 27.03.2013 | FI | 27.03.2013 | HR | 27.03.2013 | LT | 27.03.2013 | LV | 27.03.2013 | MC | 27.03.2013 | MK | 27.03.2013 | MT | 27.03.2013 | RO | 27.03.2013 | SI | 27.03.2013 | SK | 27.03.2013 | SM | 27.03.2013 | BG | 27.06.2013 | NO | 27.06.2013 | GR | 28.06.2013 | IS | 27.07.2013 | IE | 11.12.2013 | LU | 11.12.2013 | BE | 31.12.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 27.03.2013 | |
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
MK | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
SM | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
IE | 11.12.2013 | ||
LU | 11.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 27.03.2013 | |
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
SM | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
IE | 11.12.2013 | ||
LU | 11.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 27.03.2013 | |
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
IE | 11.12.2013 | ||
LU | 11.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/46] | CY | 27.03.2013 | |
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
LU | 11.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | CY | 27.03.2013 | |
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
LU | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 27.03.2013 | |
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 27.03.2013 | |
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | EE | 27.03.2013 | |
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | EE | 27.03.2013 | |
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | FI | 27.03.2013 | |
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 27.03.2013 | |
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 27.03.2013 | |
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 27.03.2013 | |
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 27.03.2013 | |
NO | 27.06.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE19509118 (HANEL MICHAEL [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-7 * column 2, lines 58-61 * * column 3, lines 53-58 * * column 4, lines 32-35 * [Y] 3; | [Y]US5040982 (STEFAN-DOGAR SORIN [US]) [Y] 3 * figure 1 *; | [XD]US4756689 (LUNDGREN DAN [SE], et al) [XD] 1 * figure 1 * | by applicant | DE19509118 |