EP2396269 - DEVICE FOR FILLING CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamba Filltec GmbH & Co. KG Kurt-Schumacher-Straße 28-30 66130 Saarbrücken / DE | [2011/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNK, Martin Turmstrasse 2 66636 Tholey / DE | [2011/51] | Representative(s) | Ostriga Sonnet Wirths & Vorwerk Patentanwälte Friedrich-Engels-Allee 432 42283 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | Ostriga Sonnet Wirths & Vorwerk Patentanwälte Friedrich-Engels-Allee 430-432 42283 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [2012/28] | Roche, von Westernhagen & Ehresmann Patentanwaltskanzlei Friedrich-Engels-Allee 430-432 42283 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [2012/19] | Ostriga Sonnet Wirths & Vorwerk Patentanwälte Friedrich-Engels-Allee 430-432 42283 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [2011/51] | Ostriga, Sonnet, Wirths & Roche Patentanwaltskanzlei Friedrich-Engels-Allee 430-432 42283 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 09807436.2 | 14.12.2009 | WO2009DE01752 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011072628 | Date: | 23.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2396269 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2396269 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B67C7/00, B65B43/52, B65G35/08 | [2011/51] | CPC: |
B65B43/52 (EP,US);
B67C7/00 (US);
B65G35/06 (US);
B65G35/08 (EP,US);
B67C7/0033 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/51] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM BEFÜLLEN VON BEHÄLTERN | [2011/51] | English: | DEVICE FOR FILLING CONTAINERS | [2011/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR REMPLIR DES RÉCIPIENTS | [2011/51] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/51] | 13.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12000072.4 / EP2450306 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.12.2009 | CY | 05.12.2012 | CZ | 05.12.2012 | DK | 05.12.2012 | EE | 05.12.2012 | FI | 05.12.2012 | HR | 05.12.2012 | LT | 05.12.2012 | LV | 05.12.2012 | MK | 05.12.2012 | MT | 05.12.2012 | RO | 05.12.2012 | SE | 05.12.2012 | SI | 05.12.2012 | SK | 05.12.2012 | SM | 05.12.2012 | TR | 05.12.2012 | IE | 14.12.2012 | LU | 14.12.2012 | BE | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | BG | 05.03.2013 | NO | 05.03.2013 | GR | 06.03.2013 | IS | 05.04.2013 | PT | 05.04.2013 | [2022/26] |
Former [2019/29] | HU | 14.12.2009 | |
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
MK | 05.12.2012 | ||
MT | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
SM | 05.12.2012 | ||
IE | 14.12.2012 | ||
LU | 14.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2016/45] | HU | 14.12.2009 | |
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
MK | 05.12.2012 | ||
MT | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
SM | 05.12.2012 | ||
TR | 05.12.2012 | ||
IE | 14.12.2012 | ||
LU | 14.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | HU | 14.12.2009 | |
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
MK | 05.12.2012 | ||
MT | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
SM | 05.12.2012 | ||
TR | 05.12.2012 | ||
IE | 14.12.2012 | ||
LU | 14.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | HU | 14.12.2009 | |
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
MT | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
SM | 05.12.2012 | ||
IE | 14.12.2012 | ||
LU | 14.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/27] | CY | 05.12.2012 | |
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
MT | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
SM | 05.12.2012 | ||
IE | 14.12.2012 | ||
LU | 14.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 05.12.2012 | |
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
MT | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
IE | 14.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CZ | 05.12.2012 | |
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
MT | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
IE | 14.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CZ | 05.12.2012 | |
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
IE | 14.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | CZ | 05.12.2012 | |
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
IE | 14.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/44] | CZ | 05.12.2012 | |
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | CZ | 05.12.2012 | |
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CZ | 05.12.2012 | |
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 05.12.2012 | |
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 05.12.2012 | |
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 05.12.2012 | |
NO | 05.03.2013 | Cited in | International search | [YA]DE151457 (FRIEDLÄNDER LOUIS UND PRASZKIER J. CHAIM) [Y] 10-15 * page 2, lines 43-49 * * page 2, lines 87-99; figures 1,2 * [A] 1,16,24; | [A]EP0286514 (DARDAINE IND [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO9830491 (GEA FINNAH GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,10,16-18,24* page 4, paragraphs 2,3; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO0174691 (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE [CH], et al) [A] 1,2 * page 10, line 30 - line 35; figures 1-7 *; | [A]WO03051760 (STORK FOOD & DAIRY SYSTEMS BV [NL], et al) [A] 1,2 * page 10, line 10 - page 11, line 1; figures 3-7 *; | [YA]US2003159753 (MARIA JEAN-PIERRE [FR]) [Y] 16-18 * paragraphs [0033] , [0034] , [0052]; figures 1-5 * [A] 1,10,24; | [YD]EP1495997 (SHIKOKU KAKOKI CO LTD [JP]) [YD] 1,2,10-15 * paragraphs [0017] , [0038] , [0039]; figures 1-12 *; | [Y]US2005097863 (TAGGART THOMAS D [US]) [Y] 1,2 * paragraph [0056]; figure 8 *; | [YA]DE102006015842 (FINNAH ENGINEERING UND PACKAGI [DE]) [Y] 16-18 * paragraphs [0024] , [0025]; figures 1-9 * [A] 1,10,24 |