EP2419559 - CONDENSATION DRYER HAVING A FILTER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2013 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2012/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRUNERT, Klaus Donnersmarckallee 11a 13465 Berlin / DE | [2012/08] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/08] | Application number, filing date | 10710335.0 | 25.03.2010 | WO2010EP53882 | Priority number, date | DE20091002389 | 15.04.2009 Original published format: DE102009002389 | [2012/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010118939 | Date: | 21.10.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2419559 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2419559 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | D06F58/22 | [2012/08] | CPC: |
D06F58/22 (EP,US);
D06F58/24 (EP,US);
D06F2103/58 (EP,US);
D06F2105/34 (EP,US);
D06F58/45 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/08] | Title | German: | KONDENSATIONSTROCKNER MIT EINER FILTERVORRICHTUNG | [2012/08] | English: | CONDENSATION DRYER HAVING A FILTER DEVICE | [2012/08] | French: | SÈCHE-LINGE À CONDENSATION DOTÉ D'UN DISPOSITIF FILTRANT | [2012/08] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/08] | 23.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.03.2010 | CY | 21.11.2012 | CZ | 21.11.2012 | DK | 21.11.2012 | EE | 21.11.2012 | FI | 21.11.2012 | HR | 21.11.2012 | IS | 21.11.2012 | LT | 21.11.2012 | LV | 21.11.2012 | MK | 21.11.2012 | MT | 21.11.2012 | NL | 21.11.2012 | RO | 21.11.2012 | SE | 21.11.2012 | SI | 21.11.2012 | SK | 21.11.2012 | SM | 21.11.2012 | BG | 21.02.2013 | NO | 21.02.2013 | GR | 22.02.2013 | ES | 04.03.2013 | PT | 21.03.2013 | IE | 25.03.2013 | LU | 25.03.2013 | BE | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | FR | 02.04.2013 | [2016/31] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 25.03.2010 | |
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MK | 21.11.2012 | ||
MT | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
SM | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
IE | 25.03.2013 | ||
LU | 25.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 21.11.2012 | |
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MK | 21.11.2012 | ||
MT | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
SM | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
IE | 25.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 21.11.2012 | |
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MT | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
SM | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
IE | 25.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CZ | 21.11.2012 | |
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MT | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
SM | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
IE | 25.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | CZ | 21.11.2012 | |
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MT | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
IE | 25.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CZ | 21.11.2012 | |
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
IE | 25.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | CZ | 21.11.2012 | |
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
IE | 25.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CZ | 21.11.2012 | |
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | CZ | 21.11.2012 | |
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CZ | 21.11.2012 | |
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 21.11.2012 | |
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | DK | 21.11.2012 | |
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 21.11.2012 | |
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 21.11.2012 | |
NO | 21.02.2013 | Cited in | International search | [AP]DE102008041998 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [AP] 1-11 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0021]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1936022 (ELECTROLUX HOME PROD CORP [BE]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0050]; figure 3 *; | [AD]US2007107251 (GOLDBERG ROMAN [DE], et al) [AD] 1-11 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2753952 (ANTHONY ENGEL J) [A] 1-11 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 30; figures 2-4 * | by applicant | EP1788140 | EP1788141 |