EP2444454 - PRE-EXPANDED POLYPROPYLENE RESIN BEADS AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.2015 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kaneka Corporation 2-3-18, Nakanoshima Kita-ku Osaka / JP | [2014/30] |
Former [2013/12] | For all designated states Kaneka Corporation 2-3-18, Nakanoshima, Kita-ku Osaka / JP | ||
Former [2012/17] | For all designated states Kaneka Corporation 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIGUCHI, Taro c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-1 Torikainishi 5-chome Settsu-shi Osaka 566-0072 / JP | [2012/17] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/30] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/17] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10789250.7 | 17.06.2010 | WO2010JP04065 | Priority number, date | JP20090144973 | 18.06.2009 Original published format: JP 2009144973 | [2012/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010146871 | Date: | 23.12.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2444454 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2444454 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.12.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/18 | [2012/17] | CPC: |
C08J9/0023 (EP,US);
C08J9/18 (EP,US);
C08J9/232 (EP,US);
C08J2203/06 (EP,US);
C08J2323/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORGEDEHNTE POLYPROPYLENHARZKÜGELCHEN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2012/17] | English: | PRE-EXPANDED POLYPROPYLENE RESIN BEADS AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2012/17] | French: | BILLES PRÉEXPANSÉES DE RÉSINE DE POLYPROPYLÈNE ET LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2012/17] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2011 | Translation filed | 20.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/17] | 17.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 24.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.06.2010 | AL | 23.07.2014 | AT | 23.07.2014 | CY | 23.07.2014 | CZ | 23.07.2014 | DK | 23.07.2014 | EE | 23.07.2014 | ES | 23.07.2014 | HR | 23.07.2014 | LT | 23.07.2014 | LV | 23.07.2014 | MC | 23.07.2014 | MK | 23.07.2014 | MT | 23.07.2014 | NL | 23.07.2014 | PL | 23.07.2014 | RO | 23.07.2014 | SI | 23.07.2014 | SK | 23.07.2014 | SM | 23.07.2014 | TR | 23.07.2014 | BG | 23.10.2014 | NO | 23.10.2014 | GR | 24.10.2014 | IS | 23.11.2014 | PT | 24.11.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 17.06.2010 | |
AT | 23.07.2014 | ||
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
MK | 23.07.2014 | ||
MT | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
SM | 23.07.2014 | ||
TR | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 17.06.2010 | |
AT | 23.07.2014 | ||
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
MT | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
SM | 23.07.2014 | ||
TR | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
MT | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 23.07.2014 | |
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 23.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP3530333B (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2008189707 (DAICEL NOVAFOAM LTD); | [A]JP2007182500 (DAICEL NOVAFOAM LTD); | [A]JP2005272542 (DAICEL CHEM, et al); | [A]JPH07304895 (JSP CORP) | by applicant | JPH0328239 | JPH07304895 | JPH0892408 | JPH0423840 | JP2002146082 | JP2009209334 | WO02100929 |