EP2462486 - OBJECT INSPECTION SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2021 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASML Netherlands BV De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | [2020/16] |
Former [2012/24] | For all designated states ASML Netherlands BV De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IVANOV, Vitalii str. Sengera 9/9 PL-02-790 Warsaw / PL | 02 /
DEN BOEF, Arie Eikenlaan 18 NL-5581 NA Waalre / NL | 03 /
BANINE, Vadim Eendracht 21 NL-5751 SB Deurne / NL | 04 /
SCACCABAROZZI, Luigi De Meule 39 NL-5554 KD Valkenswaard / NL | 05 /
IOSAD, Nikolay Westernisse 9 NL-5663 RH Geldrop / NL | [2012/24] | Representative(s) | ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2020/16] | Slenders, Petrus Johannes Waltherus, et al ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property De Run 6501 P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2012/52] | Slenders, Petrus J. W., et al ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2012/24] | Slenders, Petrus J. W. ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 6504 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 10728666.8 | 02.07.2010 | [2020/16] | WO2010EP59460 | Priority number, date | US20090231161P | 04.08.2009 Original published format: US 231161 P | [2012/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011015412 | Date: | 10.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2462486 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2462486 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G03F1/00, G03F1/84, G01N21/65, G01N21/94, G01N21/956, G01N21/95, G01N21/64, G03F1/24 | [2019/48] | CPC: |
G03F1/84 (EP,KR,US);
G01N21/65 (EP,KR,US);
G01N21/6408 (EP,KR,US);
G01N21/6489 (EP,KR,US);
G01N21/94 (EP,KR,US);
G01N21/9501 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/24] | G03F1/00, G03F1/14, G01N21/64, G01N21/95 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR INSPEKTION VON GEGENSTÄNDEN | [2019/48] | English: | OBJECT INSPECTION SYSTEMS AND METHODS | [2012/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTEMES POUR L'INSPECTION D'OBJETS | [2019/48] |
Former [2012/24] | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR OBJEKTUNTERSUCHUNG | ||
Former [2012/24] | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'INSPECTION D'OBJET | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/24] | 15.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2019 | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.07.2010 | AL | 15.04.2020 | AT | 15.04.2020 | CY | 15.04.2020 | CZ | 15.04.2020 | DK | 15.04.2020 | EE | 15.04.2020 | ES | 15.04.2020 | FI | 15.04.2020 | HR | 15.04.2020 | IT | 15.04.2020 | LT | 15.04.2020 | LV | 15.04.2020 | MC | 15.04.2020 | MK | 15.04.2020 | MT | 15.04.2020 | NL | 15.04.2020 | PL | 15.04.2020 | RO | 15.04.2020 | SE | 15.04.2020 | SI | 15.04.2020 | SK | 15.04.2020 | SM | 15.04.2020 | TR | 15.04.2020 | IE | 02.07.2020 | LU | 02.07.2020 | BG | 15.07.2020 | GB | 15.07.2020 | NO | 15.07.2020 | GR | 16.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | IS | 15.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 02.07.2010 | |
AL | 15.04.2020 | ||
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CY | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
MT | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
TR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IE | 02.07.2020 | ||
LU | 02.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
GB | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
TR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IE | 02.07.2020 | ||
LU | 02.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
GB | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
IE | 02.07.2020 | ||
LU | 02.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
GB | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
IE | 02.07.2020 | ||
LU | 02.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
GB | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
IE | 02.07.2020 | ||
LU | 02.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 15.04.2020 | |
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 15.08.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO9811425 (BIO RAD MICROMEASUREMENTS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,5,10,18,19,22,26,35-37,40,45,53,54,57,61,70 * abstract * * page 3 - page 11 * [I] 3,4,6-8,20,21,23,24,34,38,39,41-43,55,56,58,59,69; | [XI]WO0229883 (AOTI OPERATING CO INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,10,18,19,22,26,35-37,40,45,53,54,57,61,70 * claims 1,6,15 * * page 3, line 25 - page 6, line 28 * * page 10, line 7 - line 13 * [I] 3,4,7,8,20,21,23,24,34,38,39,41-43,55,56,58,59,69; | [XI]WO02077621 (AOTI OPERATING CO INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,10,18,19,22,26,35-37,40,45,53,54,57,61,70 * page 4 - page 13 * [I] 3,4,7,8,20,21,23,24,34,38,39,41-43,55,56,58,59,69; | [XI]WO2004008125 (AOTI OPERATING CO INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,10,18,19,22,26,35-37,40,45,53,54,57,61,70 * the whole document * [I] 3,4,7,8,20,21,23,24,34,38,39,41-43,55,56,58,59,69; | [XI]US2008084555 (YOO WOO SIK [US]) [X] 1,2,5,10,18,19,22,26,35-37,40,45,53,54,57,61,70 * figures 7, 8A, 8B * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0080] * [I] 3,4,6-8,20,21,23,24,34,38,39,41-43,55,56,58,59,69; | [A] - WESTRATE S ET AL, "PHOTOLUMINESCENCE MAPPING DETECTS CU CONTAMINATION IN SI WAFERS", SOLID STATE TECHNOLOGY, PENNWELL CORPORATION, TULSA, OK, US, (20020201), vol. 45, no. 2, ISSN 0038-111X, page 57/58, XP001092608 [A] 1-70 * the whole document * | by applicant | JPH11304717 | JP2007258567 |