EP2542691 - GENE SETS FOR DETECTION ULTRAVIOLET A EXPOSURE AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2014 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The United States Of America, As Represented By The Secretary, Department Of Health And Human Services National Institutes Of Health Office Of Technology Transfer 6011 Executive Blvd. Suite 325 MSC 7660 Bethesda, MD 20892-7660 / US | [2013/41] |
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states The United States Of America, As Represented By The Secretary, Department Of Health And Human Services National Institutes Of Health Office Of Technology Transfer 6011 Executive Blvd. Suite 325 MSC 7660 Bethesda, MD 20892-7660 / US | ||
For all designated states Falloon, Elizabeth 8417 Westmont Terrace Befhesda, MD 20817 / US | |||
Former [2013/02] | For all designated states The U.S.A. as represented by the Secretary, Department of Health and Human Services Office of Technology Transfer National Institues of Health 6001 Executive Boulevard, Suite 325 Msc 7660 Bethesda, MD 20892-7660 / US | ||
For all designated states Falloon, Elizabeth 8417 Westmont Terrace Befhesda, MD 20817 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERUNUMA, Atsushi 261 Congressional Lane, no 514 Rockville, MD 20852 / US | 02 /
VOGEL, Jonathan (deceased) . / US | [2013/37] |
Former [2013/36] | 01 /
TERUNUMA, Atsushi 261 Congressional Lane, no 514 Rockville, MD 20852 / US | ||
02 /
VOGEL, Jonathan . . / US | |||
Former [2013/02] | 01 /
TERUNUMA, Atsushi 261 Congressional Lane, no 514 Rockville, MD 20852 / US | Representative(s) | Walton, Seán Malcolm, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/04] | Walton, Seán Malcolm, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2013/02] | Walton, Seán Malcolm, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 11706722.3 | 24.02.2011 | WO2011US26086 | Priority number, date | US20100309179P | 01.03.2010 Original published format: US 309179 P | [2013/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011109224 | Date: | 09.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2542691 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2542691 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2013/02] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/106 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/148 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GENSETS ZUM NACHWEIS DER ULTRAVIOLET A EXPOSITION UND VERFAHREN ZUR NUTZUNG DIESER GENSETS | [2013/33] | English: | GENE SETS FOR DETECTION ULTRAVIOLET A EXPOSURE AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2013/02] | French: | ENSEMBLES DE GENES SERVANT A LA DETECTION DE L'EXPOSITION A DE RADIATION ULTRAVIOLET A ET PROCEDE UTILISANT CES ENSEMBLES. | [2013/33] |
Former [2013/02] | GEN-SETS ZUR ERKENNUNG VON UV-A-EXPOSITION UND ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2013/02] | ENSEMBLES DE GÈNES POUR DÉTECTION D'EXPOSITION AUX ULTRAVIOLETS A ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION ASSOCIÉS | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2012 | Examination requested [2013/02] | 13.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.02.2011 | AL | 22.01.2014 | AT | 22.01.2014 | BE | 22.01.2014 | BG | 22.01.2014 | CY | 22.01.2014 | CZ | 22.01.2014 | DK | 22.01.2014 | EE | 22.01.2014 | ES | 22.01.2014 | FI | 22.01.2014 | HR | 22.01.2014 | IT | 22.01.2014 | LT | 22.01.2014 | LV | 22.01.2014 | MC | 22.01.2014 | MK | 22.01.2014 | MT | 22.01.2014 | NL | 22.01.2014 | PL | 22.01.2014 | RO | 22.01.2014 | RS | 22.01.2014 | SE | 22.01.2014 | SI | 22.01.2014 | SK | 22.01.2014 | SM | 22.01.2014 | TR | 22.01.2014 | IE | 24.02.2014 | LU | 24.02.2014 | CH | 28.02.2014 | LI | 28.02.2014 | NO | 22.04.2014 | GR | 23.04.2014 | IS | 22.05.2014 | PT | 22.05.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 24.02.2011 | |
AT | 22.01.2014 | ||
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
BG | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
IT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
MK | 22.01.2014 | ||
MT | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
SM | 22.01.2014 | ||
TR | 22.01.2014 | ||
IE | 24.02.2014 | ||
LU | 24.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
GR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 24.02.2011 | |
AT | 22.01.2014 | ||
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
BG | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
IT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
MT | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
SM | 22.01.2014 | ||
TR | 22.01.2014 | ||
IE | 24.02.2014 | ||
LU | 24.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
GR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 24.02.2011 | |
AT | 22.01.2014 | ||
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
BG | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
IT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
MT | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
SM | 22.01.2014 | ||
IE | 24.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
GR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
BG | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
IT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
MT | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
SM | 22.01.2014 | ||
IE | 24.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
GR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
BG | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
MT | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
SM | 22.01.2014 | ||
IE | 24.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
GR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
MT | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
SM | 22.01.2014 | ||
IE | 24.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
MT | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
IE | 24.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
IE | 24.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
IE | 24.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BE | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 22.01.2014 | |
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0220849 (UNIV NEW YORK SCHOOL MEDICINE [US]) [A] 1-40 * example 2 * * claims 1-19 *; | [A]FR2879747 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-40 * claims 1-6 *; | [A]US2007031356 (BUCHWALD HUNZIKER PETRA [CH], et al) [A] 1-40 * claims 1-6 *; | [A]US2007148106 (WERTZ KARIN [DE], et al) [A] 1-40 * claims 21-36 *; | [AD] - ENK CLAES D ET AL, "Gene expression profiling of in vivo UVB-irradiated human epidermis", PHOTODERMATOLOGY, PHOTOIMMUNOLOGY & PHOTOMEDICINE, WILEY-BLACKWELL PUBLISHING, INC, UNITED STATES, UNITED KINGDOM, vol. 20, no. 3, doi:DOI:10.1111/J.1600-0781.2004.00097.X, ISSN 0905-4383, (20040601), pages 129 - 137, URL: http://www3.interscience.wiley.com/cgi-bin/issn?DESCRIPTOR=PRINTISSN& VALUE=0905-4383, (20110328), XP009119931 [AD] 1-40 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1600-0781.2004.00097.x | [A] - HAZANE F ET AL, "Ageing effects on the expression of cell defence genes after UVA irradiation in human male cutaneous fibroblasts using cDNA arrays", JOURNAL OF PHOTOCHEMISTRY AND PHOTOBIOLOGY B: BIOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE S.A., BASEL, CH, vol. 79, no. 3, doi:DOI:10.1016/J.JPHOTOBIOL.2005.02.001, ISSN 1011-1344, (20050601), pages 171 - 190, (20050601), XP025302102 [A] 1-40 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jphotobiol.2005.02.001 | [A] - JEAN S ET AL, "The expression of genes induced in melanocytes by exposure to 365-nm UVA: study by cDNA arrays and real-time quantitative RT-PCR", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA . GENE STRUCTURE AND EXPRESSION, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20011203), vol. 1522, no. 2, doi:DOI:10.1016/S0167-4781(01)00326-8, ISSN 0167-4781, pages 89 - 96, XP004326971 [A] 1-40 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-4781(01)00326-8 | by applicant | WO8501051 | WO8910977 | US5554501 | US5981185 | US5985567 | US6013789 | US7363165 | - YAAR, GILCHREST, BR J DERMATOL, (2007), vol. 157, pages 874 - 887 | - KULMS, SCHWARZ, J INVESTIG DERMATOL SYMP PROC, (2002), vol. 7, pages 46 - 50 | - MATSUMURA, ANANTHASWAMY, TOXICOL APPL PHARMACOL, (2004), vol. 195, pages 298 - 308 | - GILCHREST ET AL., N ENGL J MED, (1999), vol. 340, pages 1341 - 1348 | - MILLER ET AL., PHOTOCHEM PHOTOBIOL, (1998), vol. 68, pages 63 - 70 | - FISHER ET AL., N. ENGL J MED, (1997), vol. 337, pages 1419 - 1428 | - KRAEMER, PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 11 - 14 | - GILCHREST ET AL., N ENGL J MED, (1998), vol. 340, pages 1341 - 8 | - ZHAO ET AL., INT J CANCER, (2002), vol. 98, pages 331 - 4 | - NOONAN ET AL., PIGMENT CELL RES, (2003), vol. 16, pages 16 - 25 | - WANG ET AL., J AM ACAD DERMATOL, (2001), vol. 44, pages 837 - 846 | - MOURET ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2006), vol. 103, pages 13765 - 13770 | - GASPARRO, ENVIRON HEALTH PERSPECT, (2000), vol. 108, no. 1, pages 71 - 78 | - SETLOW, J INVESTIG DERMATOL SYMP PROC, (1999), vol. 4, pages 46 - 49 | - GARLAND ET AL., ANN EPIDEMIOL, (1993), vol. 3, pages 103 - 110 | - NGHIEM ET AL., J INVEST DERMATOL, (2001), vol. 117, pages 1193 - 1199 | - BESTAK, HALLIDAY, PHOTOCHEM PHOTOBIOL, (1996), vol. 64, pages 969 - 974 | - LOWE, DERMATOL CLIN, (2006), vol. 24, pages 9 - 17 | - ROSENSTEIN ET AL., PHOTODERMATOL PHOTOIMMUNOL PHOTOMED, (1999), vol. 15, pages 75 - 80 | - BECKER ET AL., J INVEST DERMATOL, (2001), vol. 116, pages 983 - 988 | - DAZARD ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2003), vol. 22, pages 2993 - 3006 | - LEE ET AL., BR J DERMATOL, (2005), vol. 152, pages 52 - 59 | - LI ET AL., FASEB J, (2001), vol. 15, pages 2533 - 2535 | - MURAKAMI ET AL., J DERMATOL SCI, (2001), vol. 27, pages 121 - 129 | - PISARCHIK ET AL., GENE, (2004), vol. 341, pages 199 - 207 | - SESTO ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2002), vol. 99, pages 2965 - 2970 | - TAKAO ET AL., PHOTODERMATOL PHOTOIMMUNOL PHOTOMED, (2002), vol. 18 | - ADACHI ET AL., DNA CELL BIOL, (2003), vol. 22, pages 665 - 677 | - ENK ET AL., PHOTODERMATOL PHOTOIMMUNOL PHOTOMED, (2004), vol. 20, pages 129 - 137 | - BLUMENBERG, OMICS, (2006), vol. 10, pages 243 - 260 | - BELTZ ET AL., METHODS ENZYMOL., (1983), vol. 100, pages 266 - 85 | - Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1989), vol. 1-3 | - SUBRAMANIAN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2002), vol. 102, no. 43, pages 15545 - 15550 | - SMITH, WATERMAN, ADV. APPL. MATH., (1981), vol. 2, page 482 | - NEEDLEMAN, WUNSCH, J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, page 443 | - PEARSON, LIPMAN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, page 2444 | - HIGGINS, SHARP, GENE, (1988), vol. 73, pages 237 - 44 | - HIGGINS, SHARP, CABIOS, (1989), vol. 5, pages 151 - 3 | - CORPET ET AL., NUC. ACIDS RES., (1988), vol. 16, pages 10881 - 90 | - HUANG ET AL., COMPUTER APPLS. IN THE BIOSCIENCES, (1992), vol. 8, pages 155 - 65 | - PEARSON ET AL., METH. MOL. BIO., (1994), vol. 24, pages 307 - 31 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 10 | - SUBRAMANIAN ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2005), vol. 102, pages 15545 - 15550 | - ARMSTRONG ET AL., NAT GENET, (2002), vol. 30, pages 41 - 47 | - BEER ET AL., NAT MED, (2002), vol. 8, pages 816 - 824 | - BHATTACHARJEE ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2001), vol. 98, pages 13790 - 13795 | - MOOTHA ET AL., NAT GENET, (2003), vol. 34, pages 267 - 273 | - WEIS ET AL., TRENDS IN GENETICS, (1987), vol. 8, pages 263 - 264 | - SCHENA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1996), vol. 93, no. 2, pages 10614 - 10619 | - MATSON ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1994), vol. 217, pages 306 - 310 | - SUBRAMANIAN, PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2005), vol. 102, pages 15545 - 15550 | - ARRNSTRONG ET AL., NAT GENET, (2002), vol. 30, pages 41 - 47 | - BECKER ET AL., J INVEST DERMATOL, (2001), vol. 116, pages 983 - 8 | - LEE ET AL., BR J DERMATOL, (2005), vol. 152, pages 52 - 9 | - LI ET AL., FASEB J, (2001), pages 15 - 2533,5 | - MURAKAMI ET AL., J DERMATOL SCI, (2001), vol. 27, pages 121 - 9 | - SESTO ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2002), vol. 99, pages 2965 - 70 | - TAKAO ET AL., PHOTODERMATOL PHOTOIMMUNOL PHOTOMED, (2002), vol. 18, pages 5 - 13 | - ENK ET AL., PHOTODERMATOL PHOTOIMMUNOL PHOTOMED, (2004), vol. 20, pages 129 - 37 | - RIDKY, KHAVARI, CELL CYCLE, (2004), vol. 3, pages 621 - 4 | - CHOI, J INVEST DERMATOL, (2010), vol. 130, pages 1685 - 1696 | US19790613091 |