EP2551940 - Secondary battery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2018 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 428-5, Gongse-dong, Giheung-gu, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2013/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Dukjung SBLiMotive Co., Ltd., Legal & IP Team 428-5, Gongse-dong, Giheung-gu, Gyeonggi-do 446-711 Yongin-si / KR | 02 /
Kim, In SB LiMotive Co., Ltd., Legal & IP Team 428-5, Gongse-dong, Giheung-gu, Gyeonggi-do 446-711 Yongin-si / KR | [2013/05] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2018/07] |
Former [2013/05] | Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 12161635.3 | 28.03.2012 | [2013/05] | Priority number, date | US201161511264P | 25.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161511264 P | US201213344892 | 06.01.2012 Original published format: US201213344892 | [2013/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2551940 | Date: | 30.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2551940 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2551940 | Date: | 14.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/34, H01M2/02, H01M2/18, H01M2/06, // H01M10/04, H01M10/0587, H01M2/26, H01M2/16, H01M2/12 | [2017/35] | CPC: |
H01M50/103 (EP,US);
H01M50/147 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/579 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0431 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0587 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/119 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/176 (EP,US);
H01M50/342 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/417 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/463 (KR);
H01M50/50 (EP,US);
H01M50/571 (US);
|
Former IPC [2014/04] | H01M2/34, H01M2/12, H01M2/02, H01M2/18, // H01M10/04, H01M10/0587, H01M2/26 | ||
Former IPC [2013/05] | H01M2/34, H01M2/12, H01M2/02, H01M2/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/05] | Title | German: | Sekundärbatterie | [2013/05] | English: | Secondary battery | [2013/05] | French: | Batterie secondaire | [2013/05] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2012 | Examination requested [2013/05] | 22.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.03.2012 | AL | 14.02.2018 | AT | 14.02.2018 | CY | 14.02.2018 | CZ | 14.02.2018 | DK | 14.02.2018 | EE | 14.02.2018 | ES | 14.02.2018 | FI | 14.02.2018 | HR | 14.02.2018 | IT | 14.02.2018 | LT | 14.02.2018 | LV | 14.02.2018 | MC | 14.02.2018 | MK | 14.02.2018 | NL | 14.02.2018 | PL | 14.02.2018 | PT | 14.02.2018 | RO | 14.02.2018 | RS | 14.02.2018 | SE | 14.02.2018 | SI | 14.02.2018 | SK | 14.02.2018 | SM | 14.02.2018 | TR | 14.02.2018 | IE | 28.03.2018 | LU | 28.03.2018 | MT | 28.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | CH | 31.03.2018 | LI | 31.03.2018 | BG | 14.05.2018 | NO | 14.05.2018 | GR | 15.05.2018 | IS | 14.06.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 28.03.2012 | |
AL | 14.02.2018 | ||
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
MK | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
TR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IE | 28.03.2018 | ||
LU | 28.03.2018 | ||
MT | 28.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 28.03.2012 | |
AL | 14.02.2018 | ||
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
TR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IE | 28.03.2018 | ||
LU | 28.03.2018 | ||
MT | 28.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
TR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IE | 28.03.2018 | ||
LU | 28.03.2018 | ||
MT | 28.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
IE | 28.03.2018 | ||
LU | 28.03.2018 | ||
MT | 28.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
IE | 28.03.2018 | ||
LU | 28.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
IE | 28.03.2018 | ||
LU | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
LU | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006024568 (LEE SANG-WON [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0016] , [0040] , [0041] * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US2006024578 (LEE SANG-WON [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0029] - [0030] * * figure 1 *; | [A]JP2009170137 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [A] 15 * abstract * * paragraph [0027] *; | [XI]US2011086265 (SUZUKI SATOSHI [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0003] - [0007] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraphs [0034] - [0036] * * claim 1 * * figures 2,3 * [I] 2-15; | [A]EP2333866 (SB LIMOTIVE CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15* the whole document * | Examination | US2009186269 | EP2317588 |