EP2565692 - Hardened fiber optic connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2016 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADC Telecommunications, Inc. 13625 Technology Drive Eden Prairie, MN 55344-2252 / US | [2013/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lu, Yu 12251 Princeton Avenue Eden Prairie, MN 55347 / US | 02 /
Reagan, Randy P.O. Box 752 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2013/10] | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/50] | Bohnenberger, Johannes Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/10] | Bohnenberger, Johannes Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12194278.3 | 23.01.2008 | [2013/10] | Priority number, date | US20070657402 | 24.01.2007 Original published format: US 657402 | [2013/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2565692 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2565692 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/38 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
G02B6/3879 (EP,BR,US);
G02B6/3816 (EP,BR,US);
G02B6/38 (KR);
G02B6/3821 (BR,US);
G02B6/3825 (EP,BR,US);
G02B6/3869 (EP,BR,US);
G02B6/3877 (BR,US);
G02B6/3887 (US);
G02B6/3888 (EP,BR,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/50] |
Former [2013/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gehärteter Glasfaserverbinder | [2015/29] | English: | Hardened fiber optic connector | [2013/10] | French: | Connecteur de fibres optiques durci | [2015/29] |
Former [2013/10] | Gehärteter Glasfaserverbinder | ||
Former [2013/10] | Connecteur de fibres optiques durci | Examination procedure | 09.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/39] | 04.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08728121.8 / EP2109792 | Divisional application(s) | EP15190694.8 / EP3012674 | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.01.2008 | AT | 09.12.2015 | BE | 09.12.2015 | BG | 09.12.2015 | CY | 09.12.2015 | CZ | 09.12.2015 | DK | 09.12.2015 | EE | 09.12.2015 | FI | 09.12.2015 | HR | 09.12.2015 | LT | 09.12.2015 | LV | 09.12.2015 | MC | 09.12.2015 | NL | 09.12.2015 | PL | 09.12.2015 | RO | 09.12.2015 | SE | 09.12.2015 | SI | 09.12.2015 | SK | 09.12.2015 | TR | 09.12.2015 | IE | 23.01.2016 | LU | 23.01.2016 | CH | 31.01.2016 | LI | 31.01.2016 | MT | 31.01.2016 | NO | 09.03.2016 | GR | 10.03.2016 | IS | 09.04.2016 | PT | 11.04.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 23.01.2008 | |
AT | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
TR | 09.12.2015 | ||
IE | 23.01.2016 | ||
LU | 23.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
MT | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 23.01.2008 | |
AT | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MT | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
TR | 09.12.2015 | ||
IE | 23.01.2016 | ||
LU | 23.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 23.01.2008 | |
AT | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MT | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
IE | 23.01.2016 | ||
LU | 23.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MT | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
IE | 23.01.2016 | ||
LU | 23.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
IE | 23.01.2016 | ||
LU | 23.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
LU | 23.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
LU | 23.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
LU | 23.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
LU | 23.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
LU | 23.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/31] | FI | 09.12.2015 | |
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/26] | FI | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | LT | 09.12.2015 | |
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 09.12.2015 | |
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 09.12.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2004228589 (MELTON STUART R [US], et al) [I] 1-4,8-11 * paragraphs [0032] - [0044]; figures 5-7 *; | [A]US2005064752 (SERINO DONALD A [US]) [A] 1-11* paragraphs [0027] - [0053]; figures 1-10 *; | [A]US2006088248 (TRAN HIEU V [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5317663 | US6579014 | US6648520 | US6899467 | US20050075847 | US20060491336 | US20060607676 |