EP2618010 - A method for the attachment of the bolt element to a component of composite material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/30] | A bolt element and a method for the attachment of the bolt element to a component of composite material | ||
[2016/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.04.2017 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Profil Verbindungstechnik GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Strasse 22-24 61381 Friedrichsdorf / DE | [2013/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Diehl, Oliver Lohrbachstr. 7 61350 Bad Homburg v.d.H. / DE | 02 /
Humpert, Dr. Richard Am Welschgraben 6 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | 03 /
Lembach, Andreas Haardtring 377 64295 Darmstadt / DE | 04 /
Sowa, Christian An der roten Warte 7 63075 Offenbach / DE | [2013/30] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13151948.0 | 18.01.2013 | [2013/30] | Priority number, date | DE20121001086 | 20.01.2012 Original published format: DE102012001086 | [2013/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2618010 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2618010 | Date: | 22.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F16B25/10, F16B37/06, F16B19/08 | [2013/30] | CPC: |
F16B39/282 (EP,US);
B23P19/00 (US);
B23P19/064 (US);
F16B19/14 (EP,US);
F16B25/106 (EP,US);
F16B35/06 (US);
F16B37/068 (EP,US);
B23P19/001 (US);
B23P19/06 (US);
Y10T29/49881 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/25] |
Former [2013/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren für die Befestigung des Bolzenelements an einer Komponente aus Verbundstoffmaterial | [2016/03] | English: | A method for the attachment of the bolt element to a component of composite material | [2016/03] | French: | Procédé pour la fixation dudit élément sur un composant de matériau composite | [2016/03] |
Former [2013/30] | Bolzenelement und Verfahren für die Befestigung des Bolzenelements an einer Komponente aus Verbundstoffmaterial | ||
Former [2013/30] | A bolt element and a method for the attachment of the bolt element to a component of composite material | ||
Former [2013/30] | Élément de boulon et procédé pour la fixation dudit élément sur un composant de matériau composite | Examination procedure | 24.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/13] | 23.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.01.2016 | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.01.2013 | AL | 22.06.2016 | AT | 22.06.2016 | BE | 22.06.2016 | BG | 22.06.2016 | CY | 22.06.2016 | CZ | 22.06.2016 | DK | 22.06.2016 | EE | 22.06.2016 | FI | 22.06.2016 | HR | 22.06.2016 | LT | 22.06.2016 | LV | 22.06.2016 | MC | 22.06.2016 | MK | 22.06.2016 | NL | 22.06.2016 | PL | 22.06.2016 | RO | 22.06.2016 | RS | 22.06.2016 | SE | 22.06.2016 | SI | 22.06.2016 | SK | 22.06.2016 | SM | 22.06.2016 | NO | 22.09.2016 | GR | 23.09.2016 | IS | 22.10.2016 | PT | 24.10.2016 | IE | 18.01.2017 | LU | 18.01.2017 | MT | 18.01.2017 | CH | 31.01.2017 | LI | 31.01.2017 | [2019/51] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 18.01.2013 | |
AL | 22.06.2016 | ||
AT | 22.06.2016 | ||
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
BG | 22.06.2016 | ||
CY | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
IE | 18.01.2017 | ||
LU | 18.01.2017 | ||
MT | 18.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 18.01.2013 | |
AL | 22.06.2016 | ||
AT | 22.06.2016 | ||
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
BG | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
IE | 18.01.2017 | ||
LU | 18.01.2017 | ||
MT | 18.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 18.01.2013 | |
AL | 22.06.2016 | ||
AT | 22.06.2016 | ||
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
IE | 18.01.2017 | ||
LU | 18.01.2017 | ||
MT | 18.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 22.06.2016 | |
AT | 22.06.2016 | ||
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
IE | 18.01.2017 | ||
LU | 18.01.2017 | ||
MT | 18.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 22.06.2016 | |
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
IE | 18.01.2017 | ||
LU | 18.01.2017 | ||
MT | 18.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 22.06.2016 | |
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
IE | 18.01.2017 | ||
LU | 18.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 22.06.2016 | |
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
LU | 18.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/45] | AT | 22.06.2016 | |
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 22.06.2016 | |
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 22.06.2016 | |
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 22.06.2016 | |
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 22.06.2016 | |
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 22.06.2016 | |
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 22.06.2016 | |
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 22.06.2016 | |
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 22.06.2016 | |
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 22.06.2016 | |
NO | 22.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102011009599 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-6,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0016] * * claims 1,2 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]US6125524 (MUELLER RUDOLF R M [DE]) [X] 11-13 * figures 1-19 *; | [X]EP0718509 (FORMER [FR]) [X] 14 * abstract * * figures 1-5 *; | [XA]EP2019214 (PROFIL VERBINDUNGSTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 14 * abstract * * figure 3 * [A] 1-13; | [A]US2003210970 (BECHTEL FRANK W [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102011010053 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |