EP2690643 - An improved solid state switching device. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB S.p.A. Via Vittor Pisani 16 20124 Milano / IT | [2014/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Besana, Stefano Via Maratona, 1 24030 Terno d'Isola (BG) / IT | 02 /
Pasquale, Flavio Via San Lazzaro, 31 24124 Bergamo / IT | [2014/45] |
Former [2014/05] | 01 /
Besana, Stefano Via Maratona, 1 I-24030 Terno d'Isola (BG) / IT | ||
02 /
Pasquale, Flavio Via San Lazzaro, 31 I-24124 Bergamo / IT | Representative(s) | De Bortoli, Eros, et al Zanoli & Giavarini S.p.A. Via Melchiorre Gioia, 64 20125 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2015/10] | Giavarini, Francesco, et al Zanoli & Giavarini S.r.l. Via Melchiorre Gioia, 64 20125 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2014/05] | Giavarini, Francesco, et al Zanoli & Giavarini S.r.l. Via Melchiorre Gioia, 64 20125 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 12177668.6 | 24.07.2012 | [2014/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2690643 | Date: | 29.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2690643 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01H71/12, H01H71/02 | [2014/05] | CPC: |
H01H71/0207 (EP,US);
H01H21/18 (RU);
H01H89/00 (US);
H01H71/123 (EP,US);
H01Q9/06 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/05] | Title | German: | Verbesserte Festkörperschaltvorrichtung | [2014/05] | English: | An improved solid state switching device. | [2014/05] | French: | Dispositif amélioré de commutation à semi-conducteur. | [2014/05] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/35] | 07.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.07.2012 | AL | 04.03.2015 | AT | 04.03.2015 | BE | 04.03.2015 | BG | 04.03.2015 | CY | 04.03.2015 | CZ | 04.03.2015 | DK | 04.03.2015 | EE | 04.03.2015 | HR | 04.03.2015 | LT | 04.03.2015 | LV | 04.03.2015 | MC | 04.03.2015 | MK | 04.03.2015 | MT | 04.03.2015 | PL | 04.03.2015 | RO | 04.03.2015 | RS | 04.03.2015 | SI | 04.03.2015 | SK | 04.03.2015 | SM | 04.03.2015 | NO | 04.06.2015 | IS | 04.07.2015 | PT | 06.07.2015 | IE | 24.07.2015 | LU | 24.07.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 24.07.2012 | |
AT | 04.03.2015 | ||
BE | 04.03.2015 | ||
BG | 04.03.2015 | ||
CY | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MK | 04.03.2015 | ||
MT | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
SM | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
IE | 24.07.2015 | ||
LU | 24.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 24.07.2012 | |
AT | 04.03.2015 | ||
BE | 04.03.2015 | ||
BG | 04.03.2015 | ||
CY | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MT | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
SM | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
IE | 24.07.2015 | ||
LU | 24.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
BE | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MT | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
IE | 24.07.2015 | ||
LU | 24.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
BE | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
IE | 24.07.2015 | ||
LU | 24.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
IE | 24.07.2015 | ||
LU | 24.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/15] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
LU | 24.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/13] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | HR | 04.03.2015 | |
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 04.03.2015 | |
NO | 04.06.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2010026013 (ABB SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 1, line 1 - line 17 ** page 5, line 27 - page 6, line 18; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP2256884 (ABB SPA [IT]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046] * * figures 2-4 * |