EP2766370 - COMPOUNDS FOR THE TREATMENT AND PROPHYLAXIS OF RESPIRATORY SYNCYTIAL VIRUS DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2017 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | For all designated states F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIANG, Chungen Lane 825 Chenhui Road Building 5, Room 1202 Pudong Shanghai, 201203 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Lisha Lane 1950 Siping Road No. 20, Room 101 Shanghai, 200433 / CN | 03 /
YUN, Hongying Yun 802 Yinghua Road Building 1 Apartment 202 Pudong Shanghai, 201204 / CN | 04 /
ZHENG, Xiufang Room 504, No. 2 Lane 1728 Chengshan Road Shanghai, 200128 / CN | [2014/34] | Representative(s) | Zhuang Plodeck, Jianping F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG CLP - Patent Department Grenzacherstrasse 124 675 / 3. OG 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | Zhuang Plodeck, Jianping F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG CLP - Patent Department Grenzacherstrasse 124 675 / 3. OG 4070 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 12772299.9 | 08.10.2012 | [2016/31] | WO2012EP69813 | Priority number, date | WO2011CN80627 | 11.10.2011 Original published format: PCT/CN2011/080627 | [2014/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013053658 | Date: | 18.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2766370 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2766370 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07D495/04, A61K31/519, A61P31/12 | [2014/34] | CPC: |
C07D495/04 (EP,US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG UND PROPHYLAXE VON ERKRANKUNGEN DURCH DAS RESPIRATORISCHE SYNZYTIAL-VIRUS | [2014/34] | English: | COMPOUNDS FOR THE TREATMENT AND PROPHYLAXIS OF RESPIRATORY SYNCYTIAL VIRUS DISEASE | [2014/34] | French: | COMPOSÉS DESTINÉS À TRAITER ET À PRÉVENIR LA MALADIE PROVOQUÉE PAR LE VIRUS RESPIRATOIRE SYNCYTIAL | [2014/34] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/34] | 10.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.10.2012 | AL | 03.08.2016 | AT | 03.08.2016 | BE | 03.08.2016 | CY | 03.08.2016 | CZ | 03.08.2016 | DK | 03.08.2016 | EE | 03.08.2016 | FI | 03.08.2016 | HR | 03.08.2016 | LT | 03.08.2016 | LV | 03.08.2016 | MC | 03.08.2016 | MK | 03.08.2016 | NL | 03.08.2016 | PL | 03.08.2016 | RO | 03.08.2016 | RS | 03.08.2016 | SE | 03.08.2016 | SI | 03.08.2016 | SK | 03.08.2016 | SM | 03.08.2016 | IE | 08.10.2016 | LU | 08.10.2016 | MT | 31.10.2016 | BG | 03.11.2016 | NO | 03.11.2016 | GR | 04.11.2016 | IS | 03.12.2016 | PT | 05.12.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/34] | HU | 08.10.2012 | |
AT | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CY | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
MK | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
IE | 08.10.2016 | ||
LU | 08.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 08.10.2012 | |
AT | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CY | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
MK | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
IE | 08.10.2016 | ||
LU | 08.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 08.10.2012 | |
AT | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CY | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
MK | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
IE | 08.10.2016 | ||
LU | 08.10.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
IE | 08.10.2016 | ||
LU | 08.10.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/45] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
LU | 08.10.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 03.08.2016 | |
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 03.08.2016 | |
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 03.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002099208 (YU KUO-LONG [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO2005061513 (BIOTA SCIENT MANAGEMENT [AU], et al) [A] 1-15 * claim 1 * | by applicant | - WANDSTRAT TL, ANN PHARMACOTHER., (199701), vol. 31, no. 1, pages 83 - 8 | - PEDIATRICS., (199809), vol. 102, no. 3, pages 531 - 7 | - FELTES TF ET AL., J PEDIATR., (200310), vol. 143, no. 4, pages 532 - 40 | - DEVINCENZO J. ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A., (20100511), vol. 107, no. 19, pages 8800 - 5 | - ZAMORA MR ET AL., AM J RESPIR CRIT CARE MED., (20110215), vol. 183, no. 4, pages 531 - 8 | - BASTIN R.J., ORGANIC PROCESS RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, (2000), vol. 4, pages 427 - 435 | - ANSEL, H., Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms and Drug Delivery Systems, (1995), pages 196,1456 - 1457 |