EP2813106 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ENABLING STATIONS TO CONNECT TO WIRELESS HOTSPOTS USING NON-UNICODE SERVICE SET IDENTIFICATION INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.2019 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2014/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAHUL, Jammula 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
KUMAR, Deepak Jindal 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2015/14] |
Former [2014/51] | 01 /
RAHUL, Jammula 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | ||
02 /
KUMAR, Jindal Deepak 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | Representative(s) | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2014/51] | Application number, filing date | 13705669.3 | 06.02.2013 | [2018/41] | WO2013US24833 | Priority number, date | US201261595291P | 06.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261595291 P | US201313750915 | 25.01.2013 Original published format: US201313750915 | [2014/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013119599 | Date: | 15.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2813106 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2813106 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/08, G06F17/22, H04W84/12 | [2014/51] | CPC: |
H04W48/12 (EP,US);
H04W88/08 (US);
G06F40/129 (EP,US);
H04W48/08 (EP,US);
H04W84/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR AKTIVIERUNG VON STATIONEN ZUR VERBINDUNG DRAHTLOSER HOTSPOTS MITHILFE VON NICHT-UNICODE-SERVICESATZ-IDENTIFIKATIONSINFORMATIONEN | [2014/51] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ENABLING STATIONS TO CONNECT TO WIRELESS HOTSPOTS USING NON-UNICODE SERVICE SET IDENTIFICATION INFORMATION | [2014/51] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR PERMETTRE À DES STATIONS DE SE CONNECTER À DES POINTS D'ACCÈS SANS FIL AU MOYEN DE DONNÉES D'IDENTIFICATION D'UN ENSEMBLE DE SERVICES À UN FORMAT NON UNICODE | [2014/51] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/51] | 06.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.07.2017 | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.02.2013 | AL | 10.10.2018 | AT | 10.10.2018 | CY | 10.10.2018 | CZ | 10.10.2018 | DK | 10.10.2018 | EE | 10.10.2018 | ES | 10.10.2018 | FI | 10.10.2018 | HR | 10.10.2018 | IT | 10.10.2018 | LT | 10.10.2018 | LV | 10.10.2018 | MC | 10.10.2018 | MK | 10.10.2018 | NL | 10.10.2018 | PL | 10.10.2018 | RO | 10.10.2018 | RS | 10.10.2018 | SE | 10.10.2018 | SI | 10.10.2018 | SK | 10.10.2018 | SM | 10.10.2018 | TR | 10.10.2018 | BG | 10.01.2019 | NO | 10.01.2019 | GR | 11.01.2019 | GB | 06.02.2019 | IE | 06.02.2019 | LU | 06.02.2019 | MT | 06.02.2019 | IS | 10.02.2019 | PT | 10.02.2019 | BE | 28.02.2019 | CH | 28.02.2019 | FR | 28.02.2019 | LI | 28.02.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 06.02.2013 | |
AL | 10.10.2018 | ||
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CY | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
TR | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
GB | 06.02.2019 | ||
IE | 06.02.2019 | ||
LU | 06.02.2019 | ||
MT | 06.02.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CY | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
TR | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
GB | 06.02.2019 | ||
IE | 06.02.2019 | ||
LU | 06.02.2019 | ||
MT | 06.02.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
TR | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
GB | 06.02.2019 | ||
IE | 06.02.2019 | ||
LU | 06.02.2019 | ||
MT | 06.02.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
TR | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
GB | 06.02.2019 | ||
IE | 06.02.2019 | ||
LU | 06.02.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
GB | 06.02.2019 | ||
IE | 06.02.2019 | ||
LU | 06.02.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IE | 06.02.2019 | ||
LU | 06.02.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
LU | 06.02.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
LU | 06.02.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
LU | 06.02.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 10.10.2018 | |
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 10.10.2018 | |
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 10.10.2018 | |
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 10.10.2018 | Cited in | International search | [I]US2003215074 (WROBEL CHARLES C [US]) [I] 1-80 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0035]; figure 2 *; | [I] - RESEARCH IN MOTION, "Clarifying the requirements for the CJKV language ambiguity with the NITZ feature", 3GPP DRAFT; C1-102429, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100705), vol. CT WG1, no. Dublin; 20100702, XP050443156 [I] 1-80 * the whole document * | [A] - "chromium - Issue 190935 - non-ASCII Wifi SSID is not displayed correctly", (20101102), URL: http://code.google.com/p/chromium/issues/detail?id=190935&can=1&q=unicode%20SSID&colspec=ID%20Pri%20M%20Iteration%20ReleaseBlock%20Cr%20Status%20Owner%20Summary%20OS%20Modified, (20130515), XP055063103 [A] 1-80 * the whole document * | [A] - "android - Issue 8035 - WiFi association fails for SSIDs with spaces in them", (20100429), URL: http://code.google.com/p/android/issues/detail?id=8035&can=1&q=ssid%20utf&colspec=ID%20Type%20Status%20Owner%20Summary%20Stars, (20130515), XP055063104 [A] 1-80 * the whole document * |