EP2816821 - PIEZOELECTRIC-TYPE ELECTROACOUSTIC CONVERSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2017 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.01.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/52] | For all designated states NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd. 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8666 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ONISHI, Yasuharu c/o NEC CASIO MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS LTD 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2118666 / JP | 02 /
MURATA, Yukio c/o NEC CASIO MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS LTD 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2118666 / JP | 03 /
KISHINAMI, Yuichiro c/o NEC CASIO MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS LTD 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2118666 / JP | 04 /
KOMODA, Motoyoshi c/o NEC CASIO MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS LTD 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2118666 / JP | [2017/03] |
Former [2014/52] | 01 /
ONISHI, Yasuharu c/o NEC CASIO MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS LTD 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP | ||
02 /
MURATA, Yukio c/o NEC CASIO MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS LTD 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP | |||
03 /
KISHINAMI, Yuichiro c/o NEC CASIO MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS LTD 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP | |||
04 /
KOMODA, Motoyoshi c/o NEC CASIO MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS LTD 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2017/08] |
Former [2014/52] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12868532.8 | 04.10.2012 | [2017/08] | WO2012JP06376 | Priority number, date | JP20120032890 | 17.02.2012 Original published format: JP 2012032890 | [2014/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013121477 | Date: | 22.08.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2816821 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2816821 | Date: | 22.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04R17/00, H01L41/09, H01L41/187, H04R31/00 | [2017/04] | CPC: |
H04R17/00 (EP,US);
H04R31/006 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/52] | H04R17/00, H01L41/09, H01L41/187 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PIEZOELEKTRISCHE ELEKTROAKUSTISCHE WANDLERVORRICHTUNG | [2014/52] | English: | PIEZOELECTRIC-TYPE ELECTROACOUSTIC CONVERSION DEVICE | [2014/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONVERSION ÉLECTROACOUSTIQUE DE TYPE PIÉZO-ÉLECTRIQUE | [2014/52] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2014 | Translation filed | 03.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 03.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/52] | 07.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.01.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 13.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.10.2012 | AL | 22.02.2017 | AT | 22.02.2017 | CY | 22.02.2017 | CZ | 22.02.2017 | DK | 22.02.2017 | EE | 22.02.2017 | ES | 22.02.2017 | FI | 22.02.2017 | HR | 22.02.2017 | IT | 22.02.2017 | LT | 22.02.2017 | LV | 22.02.2017 | MC | 22.02.2017 | MK | 22.02.2017 | NL | 22.02.2017 | PL | 22.02.2017 | RO | 22.02.2017 | RS | 22.02.2017 | SE | 22.02.2017 | SI | 22.02.2017 | SK | 22.02.2017 | SM | 22.02.2017 | TR | 22.02.2017 | BG | 22.05.2017 | NO | 22.05.2017 | GR | 23.05.2017 | IS | 22.06.2017 | PT | 22.06.2017 | IE | 04.10.2017 | LU | 04.10.2017 | MT | 04.10.2017 | BE | 31.10.2017 | CH | 31.10.2017 | LI | 31.10.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/33] | HU | 04.10.2012 | |
AL | 22.02.2017 | ||
AT | 22.02.2017 | ||
CY | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MK | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
TR | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
IS | 22.06.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
IE | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 04.10.2012 | |
AT | 22.02.2017 | ||
CY | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MK | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
TR | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
IE | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 04.10.2012 | |
AT | 22.02.2017 | ||
CY | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MK | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
IE | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 04.10.2012 | |
AT | 22.02.2017 | ||
CY | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
IE | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 04.10.2012 | |
AT | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
IE | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
IE | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
LU | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
LU | 04.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005020629 (TANDBERG TELECOM AS [NO], et al); | [A]EP1881735 (HOSIDEN CORP [JP]) | International search | [A]JP2004058668 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [A]JP2004364334 (TAIHEIYO CEMENT CORP); | [A]JP2007104318 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al) | by applicant | JPS5934800 |