EP2978382 - STEP-DOWN COAXIAL MICROWAVE ABLATION APPLICATORS AND METHODS FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2019 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2016/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRANNAN, Joseph, D. 3045 Blue Sky Circle 18-201 Erie, CO 80516 / US | [2016/05] | Representative(s) | Maschio, Antonio, et al Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/18] | Pratt, Richard Wilson Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | ||
Former [2016/05] | Pratt, Richard Wilson Maschio & Soames IP Limited 20 Carlton Crescent Southampton, Hampshire SO15 2ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 14774216.7 | 28.03.2014 | [2016/05] | WO2014US32164 | Priority number, date | US201361806605P | 29.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361806605 P | US201461969545P | 24.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461969545 P | [2016/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014160931 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2978382 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2978382 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/18, A61B18/12 | [2016/05] | CPC: |
A61B18/1815 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00526 (US);
A61B2018/00577 (US);
A61B2018/1861 (US);
A61B2018/1892 (EP,US);
Y10T156/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOAXIALE ABWÄRTSMIKROWELLENABLATIONSAPPLIKATOREN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2016/05] | English: | STEP-DOWN COAXIAL MICROWAVE ABLATION APPLICATORS AND METHODS FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2016/05] | French: | APPLICATEURS D'ABLATION À MICRO-ONDES COAXIAUX À ABAISSEMENT ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LEUR FABRICATION | [2016/05] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2015 | Search fee paid | 28.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2015 | Examination requested [2016/05] | 03.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18170192.1 / EP3378429 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.11.2017 | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.03.2014 | AL | 02.05.2018 | AT | 02.05.2018 | CY | 02.05.2018 | CZ | 02.05.2018 | DK | 02.05.2018 | EE | 02.05.2018 | ES | 02.05.2018 | FI | 02.05.2018 | HR | 02.05.2018 | IT | 02.05.2018 | LT | 02.05.2018 | LV | 02.05.2018 | MC | 02.05.2018 | MK | 02.05.2018 | NL | 02.05.2018 | PL | 02.05.2018 | RO | 02.05.2018 | RS | 02.05.2018 | SE | 02.05.2018 | SI | 02.05.2018 | SK | 02.05.2018 | SM | 02.05.2018 | TR | 02.05.2018 | BG | 02.08.2018 | NO | 02.08.2018 | GR | 03.08.2018 | IS | 02.09.2018 | PT | 03.09.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 28.03.2014 | |
AL | 02.05.2018 | ||
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CY | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IS | 02.09.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CY | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IS | 02.09.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CY | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 02.05.2018 | |
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 02.05.2018 | |
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 02.05.2018 | |
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 02.05.2018 | |
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 02.05.2018 | |
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 02.05.2018 | |
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 02.05.2018 | |
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006282069 (PRAKASH MANI [US], et al) [A] 1-15* figures 10, 17 *; | [A]US2011319880 (PRAKASH MANI N [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 4 * | International search | [A]US2005015081 (TUROVSKIY ROMAN [US], et al); | [A]US2009005766 (BRANNAN JOSEPH [US]); | [A]US2009222002 (BONN KENLYN S [US], et al); | [A]US2010305559 (BRANNAN JOSEPH D [US], et al); | [A]US2011066144 (BONN KENLYN S [US], et al); | [A]US2011196362 (ROSSETTO FRANCESCA [US]) |