EP3009149 - CARRIER FOR TRANSPORTING SUBSTANCE TO MACROPHAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.05.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states House Wellness Foods Corporation 20, Imoji 3-chome Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0011 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2016/16] | For all designated states House Wellness Foods Corporation 20, Imoji 3-chome Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0011 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIROSE, Yoshitaka 15-6 Yamatedainishi 4-chome Takarazuka-shi Hyogo 665-0886 / JP | 02 /
MUROSAKI, Shinji 6-27-208 Shibatsujicho 3-chome Nara-shi Nara 630-8114 / JP | 03 /
YAMAMOTO, Yoshihiro 7-2 Ogino 7-chome Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0002 / JP | [2016/16] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [2021/42] |
Former [2016/16] | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Rued Langgaards Vej 8 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | Application number, filing date | 13886888.0 | 11.06.2013 | [2016/16] | WO2013JP66108 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014199448 | Date: | 18.12.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3009149 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3009149 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61P9/10, A61K47/69, A61K47/46 | [2021/12] | CPC: |
A61K47/46 (EP,US);
A61K47/6901 (EP,US);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C12N1/20 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/12] | A61K47/69, A61K47/46 | ||
Former IPC [2017/07] | A61K47/46, C12N1/20 | ||
Former IPC [2016/16] | A61K47/46, A61K47/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRÄGER FÜR DEN TRANSPORT EINER SUBSTANZ AUF MAKROPHAGEN | [2016/16] | English: | CARRIER FOR TRANSPORTING SUBSTANCE TO MACROPHAGES | [2016/16] | French: | SUPPORT POUR ASSURER LE TRANSPORT D'UNE SUBSTANCE JUSQU'À DES MACROPHAGES | [2016/16] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2016 | Translation filed | 07.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 07.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/16] | 10.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.12.2018 | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.06.2013 | AL | 20.10.2021 | AT | 20.10.2021 | CY | 20.10.2021 | CZ | 20.10.2021 | DK | 20.10.2021 | EE | 20.10.2021 | ES | 20.10.2021 | FI | 20.10.2021 | HR | 20.10.2021 | LT | 20.10.2021 | LV | 20.10.2021 | MC | 20.10.2021 | MK | 20.10.2021 | MT | 20.10.2021 | NL | 20.10.2021 | PL | 20.10.2021 | RO | 20.10.2021 | RS | 20.10.2021 | SE | 20.10.2021 | SI | 20.10.2021 | SK | 20.10.2021 | SM | 20.10.2021 | TR | 20.10.2021 | BG | 20.01.2022 | NO | 20.01.2022 | GR | 21.01.2022 | IS | 20.02.2022 | PT | 21.02.2022 | IE | 11.06.2022 | LU | 11.06.2022 | BE | 30.06.2022 | FR | 30.06.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 11.06.2013 | |
AL | 20.10.2021 | ||
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CY | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
MK | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
TR | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
IE | 11.06.2022 | ||
LU | 11.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 11.06.2013 | |
AL | 20.10.2021 | ||
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CY | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
MK | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
IE | 11.06.2022 | ||
LU | 11.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 11.06.2013 | |
AL | 20.10.2021 | ||
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CY | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
IE | 11.06.2022 | ||
LU | 11.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 11.06.2013 | |
AL | 20.10.2021 | ||
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
IE | 11.06.2022 | ||
LU | 11.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
IE | 11.06.2022 | ||
LU | 11.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
IE | 11.06.2022 | ||
LU | 11.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
IE | 11.06.2022 | ||
LU | 11.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
IE | 11.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 20.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005079854 (ENGENEIC MOLECULAR DELIVERY PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1,6-11 * page 5, paragraphs 2-5 * * page 23, paragraph 2 - page 24, paragraph 1 *; | [XI]EP1084709 (TNO [NL]) [X] 1-3,6-9 * paragraph [0077]; claims 1-8 * [I] 4; | [XI]WO2011150127 (UNIV ILLINOIS [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6-11 * figures 13,16; example 8; claims 1-11 * [I] 3,4; | [A]US2011217368 (PRAKASH SATYA [CA], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | [X] - DETMER ANN ET AL, "Live bacterial vaccines - a review and identification of potential hazards", MICROBIAL CELL FACTORIES, BIOMED CENTRAL, GB, (20060623), vol. 5, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1475-2859-5-23, ISSN 1475-2859, page 23, XP021017784 [X] 1-11 * page 3, column l, paragraph 2 - page 5, column l, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1475-2859-5-23 | International search | [X]JP2006519014 (BIOGAIA AB); | [X]JP2005068092 (ALA KK); | [X]JP2000508162 (CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY TECHNICAL SERVICES LTD.); | [Y]JP2010523144 (BIOGAIA AB); | [Y]JP2001064174 (TAKEDA FOOD PRODUCTS LTD); | [Y]JP2010095465 (HOUSE WELLNESS FOODS KK); | [X] - TOSHIFUMI HIBI ET AL., "Bio Iyaku ni yoru Targeting Chiryo Enshosei Cho Shikkan ni Okeru DDS", DRUG DELIV SYST, (20040310), vol. 19, no. 2, pages 84 - 89, XP008180975 | [A] - TAKAHIRO OKUNO ET AL., "cholera tokin B Bunpitsu Nyusankin o Mochiita 2 Step Chokan Nai DDS no Kaihatsu", ABSTRACTS OF ANNUAL MEETING OF PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, (20090305), vol. 129 TH, no. 3, page 172, XP008180982 | Examination | JP2002080364 | - MUROSAKI ET AL, "Heat-killed Lactobacillus plantarum L-137 suppresses naturally fed antigen-specific IgE production by stimulation of IL-12 production in mice", JOURNAL OF ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNO, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19980701), vol. 102, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0091-6749(98)70055-7, ISSN 0091-6749, pages 57 - 64, XP005687498 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0091-6749(98)70055-7 | by applicant | - NATURE, (19970320), vol. 386, no. 6622, pages 292 - 6 | - CELL MICROBIOL., (200908), vol. 11, no. 8, pages 1160 - 9 | - J BIOL CHEM., (20110211), vol. 286, no. 6, pages 4854 - 70 | - ARTERIOSCLER THROMB VASC BIOL, (200711), vol. 27, no. 11, pages 2400 - 6 | - NAT MED., (2001), vol. 7, no. L, pages 48 - 52 | - ATHEROSCLEROSIS, (2013), vol. 228, no. 1, pages 124 - 35 | - JAPANESE JOURNAL OF LACTIC ACID BACTERIA, (2003), vol. 14, no. 2, pages 72 - 79 | - J BIOSCI BIOENG., (2001), vol. 92, no. 5, pages 459 - 65 | - CLIN VACCINE IMMUNOL., (2010), vol. 17, no. 1, pages 43 - 8 |