EP3037493 - ADHESIVE TAPE, BASED ON A SEWING NON-WOVEN FABRIC WITH BICOMPONENT FIBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.04.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | Change - French title | published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] | 15.12.2023 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coroplast Fritz Müller GmbH & Co. KG Wittener Strasse 271 42279 Wuppertal / DE | [2016/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WITTIG, Gülay Am Langen Seil 125 B 44799 Bochum / DE | 02 /
VORWERK, Guido Immenkamp 12 48231 Warendorf / DE | 03 /
LODDE, Christoph Beethovenweg 26 59439 Holzwickede / DE | [2016/26] | Representative(s) | Dr. Solf & Zapf Patent- und Rechtsanwalts PartG mbB Schlossbleiche 20 42103 Wuppertal / DE | [2024/03] |
Former [2016/26] | Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Schlossbleiche 20 42103 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 15198561.1 | 09.12.2015 | [2016/26] | Priority number, date | DE201410119524 | 23.12.2014 Original published format: DE102014119524 | [2016/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3037493 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3037493 | Date: | 14.03.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/11] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP3037493 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/21 | [2020/14] | CPC: |
C09J7/21 (EP,CN,US);
C09J7/255 (US);
C09J7/38 (CN);
D04H1/435 (CN);
D04H1/4382 (CN);
C09J2203/302 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/26] | C09J7/02, C09J7/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/06] |
Former [2016/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLEBEBAND, BASIEREND AUF EINEM NÄHVLIES-TRÄGER MIT BIKOMPONENTENFASERN | [2016/26] | English: | ADHESIVE TAPE, BASED ON A SEWING NON-WOVEN FABRIC WITH BICOMPONENT FIBERS | [2016/26] | French: | BANDE ADHÉSIVE, À BASE D'UN SUPPORT NON-TISSÉ COMPRENANT DES FIBRES À DEUX COMPOSANTS | [2024/03] |
Former [2016/26] | BANDE ADHESIVE, A BASE D'UN SUPPORT NON-TISSE COMPRENANT DES FIBRES A DEUX COMPOSANTS | Examination procedure | 09.12.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/06] | 13.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2017 | Observations by third parties | 11.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.12.2018
18.12.2018
ADMISSIBLE certoplast Technische Klebebänder GmbH Müngstener Strasse 10 42285 Wuppertal / DE Opponent's representative Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.12.2018
18.12.2018
ADMISSIBLE certoplast Technische Klebebänder GmbH Müngstener Strasse 10 42285 Wuppertal / DE Opponent's representative Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte GbR An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2019/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.12.2018
certoplast Technische Klebebänder GmbH Müngstener Strasse 10 42285 Wuppertal / DE Opponent's representative Nunnenkamp, Jörg Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | 04.01.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.04.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.02.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.05.2020 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.05.2020 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.07.2023 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 13.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 13.12.2023 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 29.05.2020 | Appeal received No. T1298/20 | 07.09.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.07.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 18.10.2023 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 20.07.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.12.2015 | AL | 14.03.2018 | CY | 14.03.2018 | DK | 14.03.2018 | EE | 14.03.2018 | FI | 14.03.2018 | HR | 14.03.2018 | LT | 14.03.2018 | LV | 14.03.2018 | MC | 14.03.2018 | MK | 14.03.2018 | MT | 14.03.2018 | RO | 14.03.2018 | RS | 14.03.2018 | SE | 14.03.2018 | SI | 14.03.2018 | SK | 14.03.2018 | SM | 14.03.2018 | TR | 14.03.2018 | BG | 14.06.2018 | NO | 14.06.2018 | GR | 15.06.2018 | IS | 14.07.2018 | PT | 16.07.2018 | IE | 09.12.2018 | LU | 09.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | AT | 09.12.2020 | CZ | 09.12.2021 | GB | 09.12.2021 | PL | 09.12.2021 | ES | 10.12.2021 | FR | 31.12.2021 | NL | 01.01.2022 | [2023/26] |
Former [2023/22] | HU | 09.12.2015 | |
AL | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MK | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
IS | 14.07.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
IE | 09.12.2018 | ||
LU | 09.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2021 | ||
GB | 09.12.2021 | ||
ES | 10.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | HU | 09.12.2015 | |
AL | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MK | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
IS | 14.07.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
IE | 09.12.2018 | ||
LU | 09.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2021 | ||
GB | 09.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | HU | 09.12.2015 | |
AL | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MK | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
IS | 14.07.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
IE | 09.12.2018 | ||
LU | 09.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2021 | ||
GB | 09.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | HU | 09.12.2015 | |
AL | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MK | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
IS | 14.07.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
IE | 09.12.2018 | ||
LU | 09.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HU | 09.12.2015 | |
AL | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MK | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
IS | 14.07.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
IE | 09.12.2018 | ||
LU | 09.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | HU | 09.12.2015 | |
AL | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MK | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
IS | 14.07.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
IE | 09.12.2018 | ||
LU | 09.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | HU | 09.12.2015 | |
AL | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MK | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
IS | 14.07.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
IE | 09.12.2018 | ||
LU | 09.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/31] | HU | 09.12.2015 | |
AL | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MK | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
IE | 09.12.2018 | ||
LU | 09.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
IE | 09.12.2018 | ||
LU | 09.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
IE | 09.12.2018 | ||
LU | 09.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
IE | 09.12.2018 | ||
LU | 09.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
IE | 09.12.2018 | ||
LU | 09.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
LU | 09.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
LU | 09.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0995782 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [X] 1-15 * claim - *; | [X]WO2006105836 (FREUDENBERG CARL KG [DE], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 3, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * claims 1-5 *; | [X]EP1990393 (COROPLAST FRITZ MUELLER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-15* paragraph [0039]; claim - * | by applicant | EP0668336 | other | EP0995782 | WO2006105836 | - Kraftfahrtechnischen Taschenbuch, Firma Bosch, (20020000), page 256,257 | Opposition | EP0995782 | US6451146 | EP1990393 | US2012227894 | DE69930667T | - 1.2.2 chemiefasern aus synthetischen polymeren, 1.2.2 chemiefasern aus synthetischen polymeren, WILHELM ALBRECHT et al, Vliesstoffe, Stuttgart New York, (19820000), pages 26 - 40, XP055540152 |