EP3041345 - PLANT RESISTANT TO HELMINTHOSPORIUM TURCICUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KWS SAAT SE & Co. KGaA Grimsehlstraße 31 37574 Einbeck / DE | For all designated states Universität Zürich Rämistrasse 71 8006 Zürich / CH | [2024/18] |
Former [2019/37] | For all designated states KWS SAAT SE & Co. KGaA Grimsehlstraße 31 37574 Einbeck / DE | ||
For all designated states Universität Zürich Rämistrasse 71 8006 Zürich / CH | |||
Former [2016/28] | For all designated states KWS SAAT SE Grimsehlstr. 31 37555 Einbeck / DE | ||
For all designated states Universität Zürich Rämistrasse 71 8006 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OUZUNOVA, Milena 37075 Göttingen / DE | 02 /
SCHEUERMANN, Daniela 37574 Einbeck / DE | 03 /
KELLER, Beat Scheuchzerstrasse 24 CH-8006 Zürich / CH | 04 /
KRATTINGER, Simon Heumattstrasse 24 CH-8906 Bonstetten / CH | 05 /
WICKER, Thomas Betburgerweg 7 CH-8536 Hüttwilen / CH | 06 /
HERREN, Gerhard Moosstrasse 2c CH-8625 Gossau / CH | 07 /
BENDER, Severine Friedenstrasse 9 CH-6004 Luzern / CH | 08 /
KESSEL, Bettina Koppelweg 1a 37574 Einbeck / DE | 09 /
PRESTERL, Thomas Magdebrink 7a 37574 Einbeck / DE | 10 /
KNAAK, Carsten Agnes-von-Plesse-Hof 13 37079 Göttingen / DE | [2024/16] |
Former [2024/13] | 01 /
OUZUNOVA, Milena 37075 Göttingen / DE | ||
02 /
SCHEUERMANN, Daniela 37574 Einbeck / DE | |||
03 /
KELLER, Beat Scheuchzerstrasse 24 CH-8006 Zürich / CH | |||
04 /
KRATTINGER, Simon Heumattstrasse 24 CH-8906 Bonstetten / CH | |||
05 /
WICKER, Thomas Betburgerweg 7 CH-8536 Hüttwilen / CH | |||
06 /
HERREN, Gerhard Moosstrasse 2c CH-8625 Gossau / CH | |||
07 /
HURNI, Severine Friedenstrasse 9 CH-6004 Luzern / CH | |||
08 /
KESSEL, Bettina Koppelweg 1a 37574 Einbeck / DE | |||
09 /
PRESTERL, Thomas Magdebrink 7a 37574 Einbeck / DE | |||
10 /
KNAAK, Carsten Agnes-von-Plesse-Hof 13 37079 Göttingen / DE | |||
Former [2016/28] | 01 /
OUZUNOVA, Milena Max-Born-Ring 2C 37077 Göttingen / DE | ||
02 /
SCHEUERMANN, Daniela Andershäuser Strasse 1 37574 Einbeck / DE | |||
03 /
KELLER, Beat Scheuchzerstrasse 24 CH-8006 Zürich / CH | |||
04 /
KRATTINGER, Simon Heumattstrasse 24 CH-8906 Bonstetten / CH | |||
05 /
WICKER, Thomas Betburgerweg 7 CH-8536 Hüttwilen / CH | |||
06 /
HERREN, Gerhard Moosstrasse 2c CH-8625 Gossau / CH | |||
07 /
HURNI, Severine Friedenstrasse 9 CH-6004 Luzern / CH | |||
08 /
KESSEL, Bettina Koppelweg 1a 37574 Einbeck / DE | |||
09 /
PRESTERL, Thomas Magdebrink 7a 37574 Einbeck / DE | |||
10 /
KNAAK, Carsten Agnes-von-Plesse-Hof 13 37079 Göttingen / DE | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2024/18] | Application number, filing date | 14761579.3 | 03.09.2014 | [2016/28] | WO2014EP02386 | Priority number, date | DE20131014637 | 04.09.2013 Original published format: DE102013014637 | DE20141005823 | 24.04.2014 Original published format: DE102014005823 | [2016/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015032494 | Date: | 12.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3041345 | Date: | 13.07.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3041345 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A01H1/04, C12Q1/68, C12N15/82, A01H5/00 | [2016/28] | CPC: |
C12N15/8282 (EP,US);
C07K14/415 (US);
C12Q1/6895 (US);
C12Q2600/13 (US);
C12Q2600/156 (US);
C12Q2600/158 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HELMINTHOSPORIUM TURCICUM-RESISTENTE PFLANZE | [2016/28] | English: | PLANT RESISTANT TO HELMINTHOSPORIUM TURCICUM | [2016/28] | French: | PLANTE RÉSISTANTE À HELMINTHOSPORIUM TURCIUM | [2016/28] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/28] | 04.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24159022.3 / EP4353078 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2008034648 (METANOMICS GMBH [DE], et al); | [AD]WO2011163590 (DU PONT [US], et al); |