EP3137635 - RAPID ACTING LACTOBACILLUS STRAINS AND THEIR USE TO IMPROVE AEROBIC STABILITY OF SILAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. 7100 N.W. 62nd Avenue Johnston, Iowa 50131-1014 / US | [2017/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARMAN, Elizabeth R.R.1 1099 NE 134th Avenue Alleman, Iowa 50007-9802 / US | 02 /
RUTHERFORD, William 612 N. 13th Street Grimes, Iowa 50111 / US | 03 /
SMILEY, Brenda Kay 10770 NW 103rd Court Granger, Iowa 50109 / US | [2017/10] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/51] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2017/10] | Bentham, Andrew J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15710983.6 | 25.02.2015 | [2017/10] | WO2015US17516 | Priority number, date | US201414200231 | 07.03.2014 Original published format: US201414200231 | [2017/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015134254 | Date: | 11.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3137635 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3137635 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12R1/24, C12N1/22, C12R1/225, A23K30/18 | [2017/10] | CPC: |
A23K30/18 (EP,EA,US);
C12N1/20 (EP,EA,US);
C12N1/205 (EP,EA,US);
A23V2400/121 (EA,US);
A23V2400/169 (EA,US);
C12R2001/225 (EP,EA,US);
C12R2001/24 (EP,EA,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNELL WIRKENDE LACTOBACILLUS-STÄMME UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER AEROBEN STABILITÄT EINER SILAGE | [2017/10] | English: | RAPID ACTING LACTOBACILLUS STRAINS AND THEIR USE TO IMPROVE AEROBIC STABILITY OF SILAGE | [2017/10] | French: | SOUCHES DE LACTOBACILLUS À ACTION RAPIDE ET LEUR UTILISATION POUR AMÉLIORER LA STABILITÉ AÉROBIE D'UN ENSILAGE | [2017/10] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2016 | Examination requested [2017/10] | 18.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.02.2015 | AL | 18.12.2019 | AT | 18.12.2019 | CY | 18.12.2019 | DK | 18.12.2019 | EE | 18.12.2019 | FI | 18.12.2019 | LT | 18.12.2019 | LV | 18.12.2019 | MC | 18.12.2019 | MK | 18.12.2019 | MT | 18.12.2019 | SE | 18.12.2019 | SI | 18.12.2019 | SM | 18.12.2019 | IE | 25.02.2020 | CH | 29.02.2020 | LI | 29.02.2020 | NO | 18.03.2020 | IS | 18.04.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 25.02.2015 | |
AL | 18.12.2019 | ||
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CY | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
MT | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
IE | 25.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
IE | 25.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 18.03.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6326037 (MANN STEPHEN PHILIP [GB], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 35 * * column 3, lines 7-13 *; | [I]US6337068 (HENDRICK CAROL A [US], et al) [I] 1-20 * column 3, lines 30-37 * * column 3, line 61 - column 5, line 63 * * claim - *; | [AD] - WEINBERG Z G ET AL, "NEW TRENDS AND OPPOTUNITIES IN THE DEVELOPMENT AND USE OF INOCULANTS FOR SILAGE", FEMS MICROBIOLOGY REVIEWS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM; NL, (19960101), vol. 19, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0168-6445(96)00025-3, ISSN 0168-6445, pages 53 - 68, XP000960647 [AD] 1-20 * Item 4; page 59, column r * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-6445(96)00025-3 | by applicant | US6403084 | US7799551 | - NILSON, ARCH MICROBIOL., (1956), vol. 24, pages 396 - 411 | - GIBSON, J. GEN. MICRO., (1958), vol. 24, pages 60 - 70 | - BECK, LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHE FORSCHUNG., (1972), vol. 27, pages 55 - 63 | - SZIGETI, ACTA ALMENTARIA, (1979), vol. 8, pages 25 - 40 | - GRAZIA; SUZZI, J. APPL. BACTERIOL., (1984), vol. 56, pages 373 - 379 | - WEINBERG, ZNG.; MUCK, RE., FMS MICROBIOLOGY REV., (1996), vol. 19, pages 53 - 68 | - WILKINSON, J.M.; DAVIES, D.R., GRASS AND FORAGE SCIENCE, (2012), vol. 68, pages 1 - 19 | - MUCK, RICHARD E., AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD SCIENCE, (2013), vol. 22, pages 3 - 15 | - "Aerobic Stability: The method of Honig", Proc. Of the Eurobac. Conf., SWED. UNIV. OF AGRIC. SCI. GRASS AND FORAGE REPORT NO. 3-1990, (19860812), pages 76 - 81 |